Abrams v. BP Exploration & Production, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Gilford Germaine Abrams
Defendant: BP Exploration & Production Inc and BP America Production Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv00381
Filed: July 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: William E Cassady
Referring Judge: Terry F Moorer
2 Judge: P Bradley Murray
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Omnibus Order Modifying BELO Case Management Order re: (1 in 1:19-cv-05000-KD-MU-C). Signed by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 9/4/2019. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-05000-KD-MU-C et al. (jlr)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 TEXT-ONLY ORDER GRANTING (25) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christine Elizabeth Gwinn-Ross terminated in case 1:19-cv-00170-TFM-MU-C; GRANTING (13) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christine Elizabeth Gwinn-Ross terminated in case 1:19-cv-00298-TFM-MU-C; GRANTING (13) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christine Elizabeth Gwinn-Ross terminated in case 1:19-cv-00330-TFM-MU-C; GRANTING (13) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christine Elizabeth Gwinn-Ross terminated in case 1:19-cv-00382-TFM-MU-C; GRANTING (13) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christine Elizabeth Gwinn-Ross terminated in case 1:19-cv-00396-TFM-MU-C. Signed by District Judge Terry F. Moorer on 8/28/19. (tot)
August 28, 2019 Notice of Appearance Pro Hac Vice by Howard L. Nations. Pursuant to the Case Management Order entered in 19-cv-5000-KD-MU-C only the pro hac vice fee is being paid. I certify that documentation has been previously filed in 1:19-cv-00169. ( Filing fee $ 75, Receipt number AALSDC-2466387, Online Credit Card Payment.) (Nations, Howard)
August 21, 2019 Filing 15 Notice of Filing Defendants' First Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents to Plaintiff filed by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production Inc. (Morrow, William)
August 19, 2019 REFERRAL OF (13 in 1:19-cv-00382-TFM-MU-C) MOTION for Christine Gwinn to Withdraw as Attorney, (13 in 1:19-cv-00381-TFM-MU-C) MOTION for Christine Gwinn to Withdraw as Attorney, (13 in 1:19-cv-00298-TFM-MU-C) MOTION for Christine E. Gwinn to Withdraw as Attorney, (13 in 1:19-cv-00396-TFM-MU-C) MOTION for Christine Gwinn to Withdraw as Attorney, (13 in 1:19-cv-00330-TFM-MU-C) MOTION for Christine E. Gwinn to Withdraw as Attorney, (14 in 1:19-cv-00393-TFM-MU-C) MOTION for Christine Gwinn to Withdraw as Attorney to Judge Moorer. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00298-TFM-MU-C et al. (tot)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ENDORSED ORDER granting #13 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney for Defendants filed by Christine E. Gwinn. Attorney Christine Elizabeth Gwinn-Ross terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 8/19/19. (lto)
August 18, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Christine Gwinn to Withdraw as Attorney filed by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production Inc. (Gwinn-Ross, Christine)
July 19, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Christine Elizabeth Gwinn-Ross on behalf of BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production Inc (Gwinn-Ross, Christine)
July 19, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by William H. Morrow on behalf of BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production Inc (Morrow, William)
July 19, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Harlan I. Prater, IV on behalf of BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production Inc (Prater, Harlan)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 BELO Case Management Order. Signed by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 05/29/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Protective Order, # 2 HIPAA Protective Order, # 3 Authorization) (skb)
July 17, 2019 Filing 8 Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:18-cv-12165. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Case transferred to District of Southern District of Alabama: IT IS ORDERED that the instant matter is hereby TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Alabama. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 7/16/2019.(mmv) (NEF: HON. CARL J. BARBIER) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 7/17/2019.]
July 1, 2019 Filing 6 Statement by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc. Regarding Venue (Seiler, Scott) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 7/17/2019.]
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED THAT, no later than May 1, 2019, plaintiffs in the attached lists must provide full and complete initial disclosures. Failure to provide the disclosures by the above date will result in an order that plaintiffs and their counsel must appear in person before Judge Barbier to show cause why their cases should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute and/or pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.37(b)(2)(A)(v). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT, as to all of the listed cases in which plaintiffs produce full and complete disclosures in compliance with this order, the deadline by which the parties must submit their venue filing is extended to no later than June 1, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 4/4/2019.(mmv) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 7/17/2019.]
January 2, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc..Attorney Don Keller Haycraft added to party BP America Production Company(pty:dft), Attorney Don Keller Haycraft added to party BP Exploration & Production, Inc.(pty:dft).(Haycraft, Don) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 7/17/2019.]
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL PROCEEDINGS CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 1/30/2015. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 BELO Settlement Agreement)(cg) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 7/17/2019.]
December 3, 2018 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Carl Barbier and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (gk) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 7/17/2019.]
December 3, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7275242) filed by Gilford Germaine Abrams. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Howard L. Nations added to party Gilford Germaine Abrams(pty:pla).(Nations, Howard) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 7/17/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Abrams v. BP Exploration & Production, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP Exploration & Production Inc
Represented By: Harlan I. Prater, IV
Represented By: William H. Morrow
Represented By: Christine Elizabeth Gwinn-Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP America Production Company
Represented By: Harlan I. Prater, IV
Represented By: William H. Morrow
Represented By: Christine Elizabeth Gwinn-Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gilford Germaine Abrams
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?