Boothe et al v. Dauphins, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Tara Boothe and Jutta Mayland
Defendant: Robert Baumhower, Dauphins, LLC and Aloha Hospitality International, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00408
Filed: July 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey U Beaverstock
Referring Judge: Bert W Milling
2 Judge: Katherine P Nelson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2019 Filing 26 Document endorsed NOTED by District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock: Amended Corporate Disclosure Statement #24 filed by Dauphins, LLC. A review does not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require recusal in this action. (jil)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 TEXT-ORDER on #21 Disclosure Statement, as amended #24 , filed by Dauphins, LLC. A review does not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require recusal in this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 9/6/2019. (ctn)
September 6, 2019 REFERRAL OF #24 Amended Disclosure Statement to Judge Nelson. (cmj)
September 5, 2019 Filing 24 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Dauphins, LLC. Amendment to #21 Corporate Disclosure Statement . (Reese, Kelly)
September 3, 2019 Filing 23 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tara Boothe, Jutta Mayland. Aloha Hospitality International, Inc. served on 8/30/2019, answer due 9/20/2019 (Smith, Sam)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 TEXT-ONLY ORDER re: #21 Disclosure Statement filed by Dauphins, LLC. The statement fails to identify all of Dauphins, LLC's members, as required by S.D. Ala. CivLR 7.1(b) ("The Disclosure Statement...shall identify all parents, subsidiaries, partners, members, managers, trustees, affiliates, and similarly related persons and entities."). Dauphins, LLC is ORDERED to file an amended disclosure statement that fully complies with S.D. Ala. CivLR 7.1 no later than Thurs. 9/5/2019 (form available at: https://www.alsd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms). Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 8/29/2019. (ctn)
August 28, 2019 Filing 21 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendants Robert Baumhower, Dauphins, LLC. (Reese, Kelly)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ENDORSED ORDER granting #19 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Deadlines in the Preliminary Scheduling Order for FLSA Cases (Doc. 17) , as follows: The deadlines in paragraphs 2, 3, 4, 5, and 6 of the Preliminary Scheduling Order for FLSA Cases #17 are STAYED until otherwise ordered. The Court will enter an amended preliminary scheduling order with new deadlines as requested by the parties after the Court sets an opt-in deadline pursuant to the parties' joint motion to conditionally certify and facilitate notice #12 , or denies said motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 8/27/2019. (ctn)
August 27, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #19 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Deadlines in the Preliminary Scheduling Order for FLSA Cases (Doc. 17) Referred to Judge Katherine P. Nelson. (cmj)
August 26, 2019 Filing 19 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Deadlines in the Preliminary Scheduling Order for FLSA Cases (Doc. 17) filed by Tara Boothe, Jutta Mayland. (Smith, Sam)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 TEXT-ONLY ORDER: The "Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order" #16 is hereby VACATED. The "Preliminary Scheduling Order for FLSA Cases" #17 is currently the operative scheduling order in this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 8/26/2019. (ctn)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 AMENDED FLSA SCHEDULING ORDER: The provisions of Rule 26(a)(1) are WAIVED. All discovery in this case is STAYED, except as provided in this Order. Court Interrogatories due by 9/13/2019. Verified Summary due by 10/4/2019. Position Regarding Settlement due by 11/15/2019.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 8/23/19. (Attachments: #1 Consent and Report of Parties form) (cmj)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 FLSA SCHEDULING ORDER: The provisions of Rule 26(a)(1) are WAIVED. All discovery in this case is STAYED, except as provided in this Order. Court Interrogatories due by 9/13/2019. Verified Summary due by 10/4/2019. Position Regarding Settlement due by 11/8/2019.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 8/23/19. (Attachments: #1 Consent) (cmj)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 TEXT-ONLY ORDER vacating #11 Preliminary Scheduling Order. A new Preliminary Scheduling Order is forthcoming. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 8/22/19. (cmj)
August 22, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #12 Consent MOTION to Certify Class Agreed to Motion and Stipulation Regarding Conditional Certification and Notice to the Putative Class Members to Judge Beaverstock (tgw)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT-ONLY ORDER: Dauphins, LLC is ORDERED to file a disclosure statement in accordance with S.D. Ala. CivLR 7.1 (applicable to "[a]ll non-governmental artificial entities appearing as parties") no later than Thurs. 8/29/2019 (form available at: https://www.alsd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms). Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 8/22/2019. (ctn)
August 22, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #12 Consent MOTION to Certify Class Agreed to Motion and Stipulation Regarding Conditional Certification and Notice to the Putative Class Members referred to Judge Katherine P. Nelson. (clr)
August 22, 2019 Filing 13 This action has been transferred from the docket of Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr and is now assigned to the docket of Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson. To ensure that your pleadings are referred to the proper Judge and Magistrate Judge with as little delay as possible, please use the letter suffix JB-N after the case number on all future pleadings. (clr)
August 20, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #12 Consent MOTION to Certify Class Agreed to Motion and Stipulation Regarding Conditional Certification and Notice to the Putative Class Members Referred to Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr. (srd)
August 20, 2019 Filing 12 Consent MOTION to Certify Class Agreed to Motion and Stipulation Regarding Conditional Certification and Notice to the Putative Class Members filed by Tara Boothe, Jutta Mayland. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice) (Smith, Sam)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER entered Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/4/2019. Signed by District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock on 08/20/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (srd)
August 19, 2019 Filing 10 Defendants ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Robert Baumhower, Dauphins, LLC. (Reese, Kelly)
July 31, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Dauphins, LLC by Tara Boothe, Jutta Mayland. Dauphins, LLC served on 7/29/2019, answer due 8/19/2019 (Smith, Sam)
July 31, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Robert Baumhower by Tara Boothe, Jutta Mayland. Robert Baumhower served on 7/29/2019, answer due 8/19/2019 (Smith, Sam)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion for Sam J. Smith to Appear Pro Hac Vice; GRANTING #3 Motion for Loren B. Donnell to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr on 7/25/2019. (clr)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Service Order entered 7/22/2019. Plaintiff to notify the Court the action taken to effect service and the results thereof. Service order deadline set to 9/2/2019. Signed by District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock on 07/22/2019. (nah)
July 22, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Aloha Hospitality International, Inc., Robert Baumhower, Dauphins, LLC. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (nah)
July 22, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #2 MOTION for Sam J. Smith to Appear Pro Hac Vice and #3 MOTION for Loren B. Donnell to Appear Pro Hac Vice - Referred to Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr. (nah)
July 19, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by Tara Boothe, Jutta Mayland (Smith, Sam)
July 19, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Loren B. Donnell to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 75, Receipt number AALSDC-2434744, Online Credit Card Payment.) by Tara Boothe, Jutta Mayland. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Cert of Good Standing) (Donnell, Loren)
July 19, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Sam J. Smith to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 75, Receipt number AALSDC-2434736, Online Credit Card Payment.) by Tara Boothe, Jutta Mayland. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Cert of Good Standing) (Smith, Sam)
July 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Dauphins, LLC, et al. ( Filing fee $400 receipt number AALSDC-2434475, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Boothe, et al. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Epperson, Robert) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/22/2019: #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (nah).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boothe et al v. Dauphins, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Baumhower
Represented By: Kelly D. Reese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dauphins, LLC
Represented By: Kelly D. Reese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aloha Hospitality International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tara Boothe
Represented By: Loren B Donnell
Represented By: Robert C. Epperson
Represented By: Sam Jones Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jutta Mayland
Represented By: Loren B Donnell
Represented By: Robert C. Epperson
Represented By: Sam Jones Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?