Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois v. Estate of Concepcion Matute et al
Plaintiff: Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois
Defendant: GPCH-GP, Inc., Julita Perez, Forrest General Health Services, Inc., West Claims Recovery Services, LLC, Progressive Gulf Insurance Company, George Regional Helath & Rehab Center, Estate of Rosalinda Matute, Alfredo Matute, Memorial Hospital at Gulfport, Brenda Winburn, Clifford Winburn, Alicia Brown, Soila Matute, Catasha Evans, Revclaims, LLC, Mississippi Division of Medicaid, American Family Insurance Company, Mississippi Orthopaedic Institute, PLLC, Estate of Julisa Matute, University of South Alabama, South Mississippi Emergency Physicians, P.A., Medical Reimbursements of America, Inc., SMB Radiology, P.A., Lacey Snow, Estate of Concepcion Matute, MHA Solutions, Inc., X.D.B., M.G., A.J., Wellmark, Inc., R.Q., ACS Emergency Services of Mississippi, P.A., Optum Services, Inc., United Healthcare Services,Inc., Georgia-Pacific LLC, GEICO General Insurance Company, Adrianna Matute, Mississippi Farm Bureau Casualty Insurance Company, D.A.A.M., Stone County Hospital, Inc., Daryl Bobinger, American Medical Response, Inc., Kelly J. Tucker, Accelerated Claims, Inc., MHA Solutions, Inc. doing business as Forrest General Hospital Systems, Wellmark, Inc. doing business as Wellmark Blue Cross and Blue Shield, GPCH-GP, Inc. doing business as Garden Park Medical Center and West Claims Recovery Services, LLC doing business as Accent Cost Containment Solutions
3Rd Party Defendant: Arthur W Campbell and Sandra Campbell
Case Number: 1:2019cv00411
Filed: July 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Office: Mobile Office
Presiding Judge: P Bradley Murray
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 281 TEXT-ONLY ORDER: The Court has been advised that the parties have agreed to a settlement of the above-referenced case. The parties have also advised that it may take ninety (90) days to finalize the settlement. Accordingly, the parties are ORDERED to file a joint status report apprising the Court of the status of finalization of the settlement on or before February 1, 2022, if a stipulation of dismissal is not filed prior to that date. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 11/3/21. (lto)
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 280 ENDORSED ORDER finding as moot #270 Interpleader Claimant USA Health's Motion for Exercise of Jurisdiction and Joinder of Claims in light of the settlement of this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 11/1/21. (lto)
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins: Settlement Conference held on 10/1/2021. (mpp)
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins: Telephone Conference held on 10/1/2021. DCR Digital Audio Recording. (mpp)
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 278 Order re: #272 Order, ( Settlement Conference set, by video conferencing, for 10/1/2021 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins.). Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 9/10/2021. (eec)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins: Telephone Status Conference held on 9/10/2021. DCR Digital Audio Recording. (srd)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER: Status Conference set, VIA TELEPHONE, for 9/10/2021 at 12:30 PM (CST) before Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins. Judge Bivins' Docket Clerk will provide call-in instructions via email. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 09/08/2021. (ktw)
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 276 ORDER granting #275 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. USA's motion (see Doc. #270 ) is ABATED until Judge Bivins has both conducted a settlement conference and the parties are unable to settle this matter. If there is no resolution at the settlement conference, upon receiving information from Judge Bivins that a negotiated settlement of this action could not be reached, the Court will reinstate briefing on USA's motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 9/3/2021. (eec)
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 275 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply filed by GEICO General Insurance Company. (Savarese, Steven)
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 274 ENDORSED ORDER granting #271 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to #270 USA's Motion for Exercise of Jurisdiction and Joinder of Claims. Responses due by 9/15/2021, and Replies due by 9/22/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 9/1/21. (lto)
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 273 TEXT-ONLY ORDER: On August 27, 2021, Defendant University of South Alabama, etc. (USA) filed a Motion for Exercise of Jurisdiction and Joinder of Claims. (Doc. 270). Any party who opposes USAs motion is ORDERED to file its response on or before September 15, 2021. USA is ORDERED to file its reply, if any, on or before September 22, 2021, at which time the Court will take the motion under submission. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 9/1/21. (lto)
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 272 Order entered. The Court refers this case to Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins to set and conduct a settlement conference. All parties and their counsel are ORDERED to participate. Judge Bivins will provide the details for the settlement conference by separate order or other instruction. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 8/27/2021. (eec)
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 271 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #270 MOTION Exercise supplemental jurisdiction over USA's claim for impairment filed by Estate of Julisa Matute, Estate of Rosalinda Matute, Adrianna Matute, Alfredo Matute, Soila Matute, Julita Perez. (Davis, James)
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 270 MOTION Exercise supplemental jurisdiction over USA's claim for impairment filed by University of South Alabama. (Boller, Thomas)
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 269 ORDER denying #246 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 8/11/2021. (eec)
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray: Motion Hearing held on 8/10/2021 re #246 MOTION to Dismiss Claim Without Prejudice filed by Soila Matute, Estate of Rosalinda Matute, Estate of Julisa Matute, Julita Perez, Adrianna Matute, Alfredo Matute. (Digital Court Recording; Courtroom 5A) (eec)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Hearings: Motion Hearing RESCHEDULED for 8/10/2021 02:00 PM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 5A, 155 St. Joseph Street, Mobile, AL 36602 before Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray. (eec)
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 267 ENDORSED ORDER granting #266 Motion for Continuance of oral argument. The oral argument that was scheduled for July 21, 2021 is hereby CONTINUED to August 10, 2021, at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 5A. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 7/13/21. (lto)
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 266 MOTION to Continue filed by Estate of Julisa Matute, Estate of Rosalinda Matute, Adrianna Matute, Alfredo Matute, Soila Matute, Julita Perez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Minute Entry entered 6/22/2021 in USA v. Abreu) (Davis, James)
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Hearings: Motion Hearing set for 7/21/2021 02:00 PM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 5A, 155 St. Joseph Street, Mobile, AL 36602 before Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray. (See Doc. 265) (eec)
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 265 TEXT ONLY ORDER: On April 5, 2021, the Estate and Wrongful Death Beneficiaries of Julisa Matute and Rosalinda Matute filed a Motion to Dismiss Claim without Prejudice. (Doc. 246). Various responses, replies, and objections have been filed. (Docs. 250, 251, 252, 253, 254, 255, 257, 260, 261, 262, 263). Because the Court believes it will be instructive in this case, the Matutes' motion to dismiss will come before the Court for oral argument on July 21, 2021, at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 5A. Because the Court also intends to discuss setting this matter for trial, Counsel for ALL parties are hereby ORDERED to attend this motion setting. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 7/7/21. (lto)
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 264 ORDER denying #247 Motion for Reconsideration of Magistrate Judge Order re #247 MOTION for Reconsideration of Magistrate Judge Order re #245 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by University of South Alabama. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 7/2/2021. (eec)
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 263 REPLY to #261 Response in Opposition to Motion filed by Estate of Julisa Matute, Estate of Rosalinda Matute, Adrianna Matute, Alfredo Matute, Soila Matute, Julita Perez. (Davis, James)
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 262 REPLY to #260 Objection filed by Estate of Julisa Matute, Estate of Rosalinda Matute, Adrianna Matute, Alfredo Matute, Soila Matute, Julita Perez. (Davis, James)
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 261 RESPONSE in Opposition re #246 MOTION to Dismiss Claim Without Prejudice filed by Sandra Campbell. (Norton, Mark)
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 260 Objection re: #246 MOTION to Dismiss Claim Without Prejudice filed by University of South Alabama. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit "1") (Boller, Thomas)
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 259 TEXT-ONLY ORDER: In their reply to the response in opposition filed by Plaintiff Safeco to their Motion to Dismiss without Prejudice, the Estate of Julisa Matute and the wrongful death heirs of Julissa Matute have stated that they will dismiss their claims against Safeco with prejudice. The Court has interpreted this as an amendment to their pending motion to dismiss. Any party who objects to the Estate of Julissa Matute and the wrongful death heirs of Julissa Matute relinquishing any and all claims to the interplead funds and being dismissed with prejudice from this interpleader action must file their objection thereto and the grounds for such objection on or before June 1, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 5/24/21. (lto)
April 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 258 RESPONSE to Motion re: #247 MOTION for Reconsideration of Magistrate Judge Order re #245 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois. (Rogers, Kevin)
April 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 257 RESPONSE to #246 MOTION to Dismiss Claim Without Prejudice, #251 Response in Opposition to Motion, #255 Response filed by Estate of Julisa Matute, Adrianna Matute, Alfredo Matute, Soila Matute, Julita Perez. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, CP 492-493 (with court reporter's face sheet and certificate)) (Davis, James)
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 256 RESPONSE in Opposition re #247 MOTION for Reconsideration of Magistrate Judge Order re #245 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by Estate of Julisa Matute, Adrianna Matute, Alfredo Matute, Soila Matute, Julita Perez. (Davis, James)
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 255 RESPONSE to #251 Response in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss #246 filed by Estate of Julisa Matute, Adrianna Matute, Alfredo Matute, Soila Matute, Julita Perez. (Davis, James)
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 254 REPLY to Response to Motion #246 Sandra Campbell's Joinder to Safeco's Response filed by Estate of Julisa Matute, Adrianna Matute, Alfredo Matute, Soila Matute, Julita Perez. (Davis, James)
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 253 REPLY to Response to Motion #246 filed by Estate of Julisa Matute, Adrianna Matute, Alfredo Matute, Soila Matute, Julita Perez. (Davis, James)
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 252 RESPONSE in Opposition re #246 MOTION to Dismiss Claim Without Prejudice filed by Sandra Campbell. (Norton, Mark)
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 251 RESPONSE in Opposition re #246 MOTION to Dismiss Claim Without Prejudice filed by University of South Alabama. (Boller, Thomas)
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 250 RESPONSE in Opposition re #246 MOTION to Dismiss Claim Without Prejudice filed by Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois. (Rogers, Kevin)
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 249 TEXT-ONLY ORDER: On April 15, 2021, the University of South Alabama filed a #247 Motion to Alter or Amend the Court's March 17, 2021 Order #245 . Any and all responses to this motion must be filed on or before April 29, 2021, and USA's reply must be filed on or before May 6, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 4/16/21. (lto)
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 248 TEXT-ONLY ORDER: On April 5, 2021, the Estates and Wrongful Death Beneficiaries of Julisa Matute and Rosalinda Matute filed a #246 Motion to Dismiss Without Prejudice. Any objection to this motion must be filed on or before April 23, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 4/16/21. (lto)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 247 MOTION for Reconsideration of Magistrate Judge Order re #245 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by University of South Alabama. (Boller, Mary Allie)
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 246 MOTION to Dismiss Claim Without Prejudice filed by Estate of Julisa Matute, Estate of Rosalinda Matute, Adrianna Matute, Alfredo Matute, Soila Matute, Julita Perez. (Davis, James)
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 245 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #220 Motion for Summary Judgment. The Court finds that USA's Motion for Summary Judgment is hereby GRANTED as to the enforceability of its lien against interplead proceeds that are attributed to the medical expenses incurred in the treatment of Julisa Matute but DENIED as to a determination of the amount of the lien. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 3/16/2021. (eec)
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 244 ORDER denying #216 Motion for Summary Judgment. The Court finds that the Matute and Rivera Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment is hereby DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 3/16/2021. (eec)
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 243 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this case be referred to the United States Magistrate Judge, to conduct all proceedings and order the entry of judgment in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P.73. Signed by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 10/23/2020. (srd)
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 242 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois.. (Rogers, Kevin)
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order REFERRAL OF #242 Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge to Judge Kristi K. DuBose. (eec)
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order REFERRAL OF #241 Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge to Judge Kristi K. DuBose. (eec)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 241 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois.. (Rogers, Kevin)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray: Motion Hearing held on 10/7/2020 re #220 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by University of South Alabama, #216 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Soila Matute, Estate of Rosalinda Matute, Estate of Julisa Matute, Julita Perez, Adrianna Matute, Alfredo Matute. (Digital Court Recording; Courtroom 5A) (eec)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 239 TEXT-ONLY ORDER: Counsel please note that the time of the telephonic hearing on the pending motions for summary judgment that is currently set for October 7, 2020 has changed. The hearing will now be conducted via telephone on October 7, 2020 at 10:30 a.m., rather than at 10:00. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 10/1/20. (lto)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Hearings: Motion Hearing, by telephone, set for 10/7/2020 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray. (See Doc. 238) (eec)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Hearings: TIME CHANGED. Motion Hearing set for 10/7/2020 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray. (See Doc. 239) (eec)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 238 ENDORSED ORDER granting #236 Motion to Continue the trial filed by the Estate of Concepcion Mautute and D.A.A.M. by and through his mother, Amanda Dianne Rivera, on the grounds set forth in the motion. Due to the continuance of the trial, the pretrial conference will also be rescheduled. In lieu of the pretrial conference, the Court will conduct oral argument on the pending motions for summary judgment (Docs. 216 & 220) on October 7, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. by telephone. All counsel should use the following numbers to call in for the telephonic hearing: Phone number 877-873-8018 and Access code 3291819. A new date for the pretrial conference and trial will be set after a ruling on the motions for summary judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 9/30/20. (lto)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 237 Proposed Pretrial Order by University of South Alabama. (Boller, Thomas)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 236 MOTION to Continue Trial filed by D.A.A.M., Estate of Concepcion Matute. (Guild, Patrick)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 235 NOTICE by A.J., Alicia Brown, M.G. of Filing Pre-Trial Disclosures (Miner, John)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 234 Notice of Filing Pre-Trial Disclosures filed by Estate of Julisa Matute, Estate of Rosalinda Matute, Adrianna Matute, Alfredo Matute, Soila Matute, Julita Perez. (Davis, James)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 233 NOTICE by GEICO General Insurance Company Notice of Service of Pretrial Disclosures by Geico General Insurance Company (Savarese, Steven)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 232 NOTICE by D.A.A.M., Estate of Concepcion Matute (Guild, Patrick)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 231 Notice of Filing Pretrial Disclosures filed by Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois. (Rogers, Kevin)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 230 NOTICE by University of South Alabama (Boller, Thomas)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 229 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Allie Elizabeth Boller on behalf of University of South Alabama (Boller, Mary Allie)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 228 REPLY to #225 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by University of South Alabama. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit "1", #2 Exhibit Exhibit "2") (Boller, Thomas)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 227 NOTICE by Estate of Julisa Matute, Estate of Rosalinda Matute, Adrianna Matute, Alfredo Matute, Soila Matute, Julita Perez re #191 Notice (Other) Supplemental Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures (Davis, James)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 226 NOTICE by Estate of Concepcion Matute, Estate of Julisa Matute, Estate of Rosalinda Matute, Adrianna Matute, Alfredo Matute, Soila Matute, Julita Perez OF INTENT TO SERVE SUBPOENAS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Subpoena to Produce, United Healthcare Insurance Company, #2 Exhibit B, Subpoena to Testify and Produce, Darris Echols, K20) (Davis, James)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 225 RESPONSE in Opposition re #220 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Estate of Julisa Matute, Estate of Rosalinda Matute, Adrianna Matute, Alfredo Matute, Soila Matute, Julita Perez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Julisa Matute Death Certificate, #2 Exhibit B, Discovery Responses of USA with attachments) (Davis, James)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 224 REPLY to Response to Motion #216 Reply to USA's Response #218 to Motion #216 for Summary Judgment filed by Estate of Julisa Matute, Estate of Rosalinda Matute, Adrianna Matute, Alfredo Matute, Soila Matute, Julita Perez. (Davis, James)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 223 REPLY to Response to Motion #216 for Summary Judgment (to Safeco's Response) filed by Estate of Julisa Matute, Estate of Rosalinda Matute, Adrianna Matute, Alfredo Matute, Soila Matute, Julita Perez. (Davis, James)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 222 RESPONSE in Opposition re #216 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - proposed General Release) (Rogers, Kevin)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 221 Order on re #220 MOTION for Summary Judgment setting response time as follows: Response to S/J due by 8/24/2020. Replies to Response to S/J due by 9/8/2020. Motion to be taken under submission on 9/9/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 7/30/20. (srr)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 220 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by University of South Alabama. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits "A" - "B") (Boller, Thomas)
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 219 Order re: #216 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Soila Matute, Estate of Rosalinda Matute, Estate of Julisa Matute, Julita Perez, Adrianna Matute, Alfredo Matute, ( Response to Motion due by 8/4/2020, Replies due by 8/18/2020., Motion to be taken under submission on 8/19/2020.). Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 7/14/2020. (eec)
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 218 RESPONSE to Motion re: #216 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by University of South Alabama. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits) (Boller, Thomas)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 217 Joinder in MOTION re #216 MOTION for Summary Judgment . (Guild, Patrick)
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 216 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Estate of Julisa Matute, Estate of Rosalinda Matute, Adrianna Matute, Alfredo Matute, Soila Matute, Julita Perez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Judgment of 12/6/18 certified under Acts of Congress, #2 Exhibit B, Notice of Appeal, #3 Exhibit C, Settlement Hearing Transcript) (Davis, James)
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 215 Position Regarding Mediation Or Alternative Dispute Resolution filed by Alfredo Matute, Soila Matute, Estate of Julisa Matute, Julita Perez, Adrianna Matute, Estate of Rosalinda Matute. (Davis, James)
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 214 Position Regarding Mediation filed by M.G., A.J., Alicia Brown. (Miner, John)
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 213 Position Regarding Mediation filed by Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois. (Baker, Joshua)
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 212 Position Regarding Mediation filed by Estate of Concepcion Matute. (Guild, Patrick)
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 211 Position Regarding Mediation /Alternative Dispute Resolution filed by Sandra Campbell. (Norton, Mark)
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 210 Position Regarding Mediation filed by GEICO General Insurance Company. (Savarese, Steven)
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 209 Position Regarding Mediation filed by University of South Alabama. (Boller, Thomas)
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 208 ENDORSED ORDER granting #206 Amended Motion to Substitute a Proper Party filed by the Estates and Wrongful Death Beneficiaries of Julisa Matute and Rosalinda Matute. The Estate of Arthur Campbell having no objection thereto, Sandra Campbell, as Executrix of the Estate of Arthur Campbell, is hereby substituted as the Third Party Defendant in place of Arthur Campbell, who is deceased, pursuant to Rule 25(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. See Doc. 192. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 6/29/20. (lto)
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 207 ENDORSED ORDER finding as moot #205 Motion to Substitute a Proper Party due to the filing of the #206 Amended Motion to Substitute a Proper Party. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 6/29/20. (lto)
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 206 Amended MOTION to Substitute Party filed by Estate of Julisa Matute, Estate of Rosalinda Matute, Adrianna Matute, Alfredo Matute, Soila Matute, Julita Perez. (Davis, James)
June 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 205 MOTION to Substitute Party filed by Estate of Concepcion Matute, Estate of Julisa Matute, Estate of Rosalinda Matute, Adrianna Matute, Alfredo Matute, Soila Matute, Julita Perez. (Davis, James)
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 204 Notice of Filing Responses to Interrogatories and Requests for Production filed by University of South Alabama. (Boller, Thomas)
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 203 ENDORSED ORDER denying #196 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for Defendants Alicia Brown, Individually, and Alicia Brown, on behalf of minors M.G. and A.D.J. filed by John Miner and the law firm of Alexander Shunnarah Gulf Coast, LLP due to the fact that there has been no showing that Alicia Brown has consented to the motion and because no other attorney has made an appearance of behalf of these Defendants. Unless she is a licensed attorney, Alicia Brown cannot represent her minor children pro se in this action. Whitehurst v. Wal-Mart, 306 F. Appx 446, 449 (11th Cir. 2008); Devine v. Indian River Co. Sch. Bd., 121 F.3d 576, 582 (11th Cir. 1997), overruled on other grounds by Winkelman v. Parma Sch. Dist., 550 U.S. 516 (2007); see also Mack v. Delta Air Lines, Inc., Civ. A. File No. 1:13-cv-01162-SCJ-AJB, 2014 WL 12629940, *12 (N.D. Ga. Jan. 16, 2014) (holding that although Rule 17(c) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure allows a guardian to bring or defend a suit on behalf of a minor, a parent may not proceed without a lawyer on her child's behalf, even as her legal guardian); Williams v. Monroe Co. Bd. of Educ., Civ. A. No. 07-0561-CG-B, 2009 WL 1767658, *4 (S.D. Ala. June 23, 2009) (holding that parents who are not attorneys may not bring a pro se action on their childs behalf). Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 5/27/20. (lto)
April 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 202 NOTICE by Estate of Julisa Matute, Estate of Rosalinda Matute, Adrianna Matute, Alfredo Matute, Soila Matute, Julita Perez of Filing Defendants' Designation of Experts (Davis, James)
April 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 201 Notice of Filing Expert Report filed by University of South Alabama. (Boller, Thomas)
April 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 200 ORDER entered re #193 Motion to Substitute Party. The Court DENIES Defendant's Motion to Substitute a Proper Party, without prejudice. Defendants are granted leave to amend their motion to substitute the proper party. Any such amendment must be filed on or before June 16, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 4/17/2020. (eec)
February 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 199 Notice of Filing Responses to Requests for Admissions filed by University of South Alabama. (Boller, Thomas)
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 198 Notice of Filing Interrogatories, Requests for Production of Documents and Requests for Admissions filed by Julita Perez. (Davis, James)
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 197 Order re: #196 MOTION for John S. H. Miner to Withdraw as Attorney filed by M.G., Alicia Brown, A.J., ( Miscellaneous deadline set for 1/21/2020.) A copy of Order mailed to Defendant Alicia Brown as directed. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 1/7/2020. (eec)
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 196 MOTION for John S. H. Miner to Withdraw as Attorney filed by A.J., Alicia Brown, M.G.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Correspondence to Client, #2 Exhibit Correspondence to Client, #3 Exhibit Correspondence to Client, #4 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order to Withdraw) (Miner, John)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 195 RESPONSE to Motion re: #193 MOTION to Substitute Party filed by Arthur W Campbell. (Norton, Mark)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 194 TEXT ONLY ORDER: On November 8, 2019, Defendants Estate and Wrongful Death Beneficiaries of Julisa Matute and Rosalinda Matute filed a Motion to Substitute a Proper Party. Any response or opposition to this motion is ORDERED to be filed on or before November 22, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 11/8/19. (lto)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 193 MOTION to Substitute Party filed by Estate of Julisa Matute, Estate of Rosalinda Matute, Adrianna Matute, Alfredo Matute, Soila Matute, Julita Perez. (Davis, James)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 192 SUGGESTION OF DEATH Upon the Record as to Arthur Campbell by Arthur W Campbell. (Norton, Mark)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 191 NOTICE by Estate of Julisa Matute, Estate of Rosalinda Matute, Adrianna Matute, Alfredo Matute, Soila Matute, Julita Perez of Fling Initial Disclosures (Davis, James)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 190 Notice of Filing Initial Disclosures filed by University of South Alabama. (Boller, Thomas)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 189 ENDORSED ORDER granting #188 Motion for Extension of Time To File Initial Disclosures filed by Defendants Estate of Julisa Matute, Estate of Rosalinda Matute, Soila Matute, Adrianna Matute, Julita Perez, and Alfredo Matute. The deadline for these Defendants to file their intital disclosures is extended to 11/2/19. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 10/28/19. (lto)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 188 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Initial Disclosures filed by Estate of Julisa Matute, Estate of Rosalinda Matute, Adrianna Matute, Alfredo Matute, Soila Matute, Julita Perez. (Davis, James)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 187 SCHEDULING ORDER: Pretrial Conference set for 10/7/2020 10:00 AM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 5A, 155 St. Joseph Street, Mobile, AL 36602 before Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray. Jury Selection set for 10/27/2020 08:45 AM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 5A, 155 St. Joseph Street, Mobile, AL 36602 before Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray. Jury Trial set for 10/28/2020 09:00 AM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 5A, 155 St. Joseph Street, Mobile, AL 36602 before Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray. Discovery cutoff 6/30/2020. Amended Pleadings due by 1/21/2020. Motions due by 7/31/2020. Position Regarding Settlement due by 6/30/2020. There exists implicit consent to the undersigned conducting all proceedings in this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 12/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 Standing Pretrial Order, #2 Consent to Jurisdiction) (eec) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 186 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (Hess, Joshua)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ANSWER to #141 Amended Complaint, by University of South Alabama. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit "A") (Boller, Thomas)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 184 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas R. Boller on behalf of University of South Alabama (Boller, Thomas)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 183 Documents endorsed NOTED by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray: A review of the Corporate Disclosure Statement #4 filed by Plaintiff Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois and the Corporate Disclosure Statement #43 filed by Defendant GEICO General Insurance Company reveals no reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require disqualification or recusal in this action. (lto)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 182 ENDORSED ORDER granting #173 Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois's Motion to Join University of South Alabama as a Defendant for the reasons set forth at the hearing held before the undersigned on September 19, 2019. Pursuant to the Notice of Assignment to United States Magistrate Judge for Trial #159 , any party wishing to have the case reassigned to a United States District Judge for trial and disposition should return the Request for Reassignment to a United States District Judge form which is attached to Document 159 by email to Edwina_Crawford@alsd.uscourts.gov on or before September 26, 2019. Do Not Electronically File the Request. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f), the parties shall file their Joint Report of Parties' Planning Meeting on or before October 3, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 9/19/19. (lto)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 180 NOTICE by Adrianna Matute, Alfredo Matute, Soila Matute, Julita Perez re #179 Notice (Other) Supplemental Statement of the Parties Regarding Oral Argument (Davis, James)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray: Motion Hearing held on 9/19/2019 re #173 MOTION Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois' Motion to Join University of South Alabama as a Defendant filed by Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois. DCR Digital Audio Recording. (srr)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 179 NOTICE by Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois of Joint Statement of the Parties Regarding Scheduling Order (Baker, Joshua)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 178 Order re: #173 MOTION Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois' Motion to Join University of South Alabama as a Defendant filed by Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois, ( Motion Hearing set for 9/19/2019 10:00 AM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 5A, 155 St. Joseph Street, Mobile, AL 36602 before Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray.). Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 9/5/2019. (eec)
September 5, 2019 Filing 177 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Robert Hess on behalf of Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois (Hess, Joshua)
September 5, 2019 Filing 176 REPLY to #173 MOTION Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois' Motion to Join University of South Alabama as a Defendant filed by Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois. (Baker, Joshua)
August 29, 2019 Filing 175 Objection re: #173 MOTION Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois' Motion to Join University of South Alabama as a Defendant filed by Estate of Julisa Matute, Estate of Rosalinda Matute, Adrianna Matute, Alfredo Matute, Soila Matute, Julita Perez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Chancery Court Order certified under Acts of Congress) (Davis, James)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 174 TEXT ORDER: On August 23, 2019, Plaintiff Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois filed a Motion to Join University of South Alabama as a Defendant #173 in this action. Any objection to this motion must be filed on or before September 6, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 8/27/19. (lto)
August 23, 2019 Filing 173 MOTION Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois' Motion to Join University of South Alabama as a Defendant filed by Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois. (Baker, Joshua)
August 12, 2019 Filing 172 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin Alan Rogers on behalf of Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois (Rogers, Kevin)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ENDORSED ORDER granting #170 Motion and Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice filed by Mark E. Norton. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 8/8/19. (lto)
August 8, 2019 Filing 170 MOTION and APPLICATION for Mark E. Norton to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney affirms that a certificate of good standing that complies with #S.D. Ala. GenLR 83.3(d) is attached. ( Filing fee $ 75, Receipt number BALSDC-2448304, Online Credit Card Payment) filed by Arthur W Campbell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Norton, Mark)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ENDORSED ORDER granting #167 Motion and Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice filed by Patrick Taylor Guild. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 8/6/19. (lto)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ENDORSED ORDER granting #166 Motion and Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice filed by John S.H. Miner. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 8/6/19. (lto)
August 6, 2019 Filing 167 MOTION and APPLICATION for Patrick T. Guild to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney affirms that a certificate of good standing that complies with #S.D. Ala. GenLR 83.3(d) is attached. ( Filing fee $ 75, Receipt number AALSDC-2446599, Online Credit Card Payment) filed by Estate of Concepcion Matute. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Good Standing) (Guild, Patrick)
August 6, 2019 Filing 166 MOTION and APPLICATION for John S. H. Miner to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney affirms that a certificate of good standing that complies with #S.D. Ala. GenLR 83.3(d) is attached. ( Filing fee $ 75, Receipt number AALSDC-2446592, Online Credit Card Payment) filed by A.J., Alicia Brown, M.G.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Certificate of Good Standing) (Miner, John)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ENDORSED ORDER granting #164 Motion and Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice filed by James L. Davis, III. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 8/6/19. (lto)
August 6, 2019 Filing 164 MOTION and APPLICATION for James L. (Jim) Davis, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney affirms that a certificate of good standing that complies with #S.D. Ala. GenLR 83.3(d) is attached. ( Filing fee $ 75, Receipt number AALSDC-2446465, Online Credit Card Payment) filed by Estate of Julisa Matute, Estate of Rosalinda Matute, Adrianna Matute, Alfredo Matute, Soila Matute, Julita Perez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Certificate of Good Standing) (Davis, James)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ENDORSED ORDER granting #162 Motion and Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice filed by Gregg A. Caraway. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 8/2/19. (lto)
August 2, 2019 Filing 162 MOTION and APPLICATION for Gregg A. Caraway to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney affirms that a certificate of good standing that complies with #S.D. Ala. GenLR 83.3(d) is attached. ( Filing fee $ 75, Receipt number AALSDC-2445213, Online Credit Card Payment) filed by Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Caraway, Gregg)
August 2, 2019 Filing 161 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua B. Baker on behalf of Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois (Baker, Joshua)
July 24, 2019 Filing 160 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Wayne Martin, Jr on behalf of GEICO General Insurance Company (Martin, Andrew)
July 22, 2019 Filing 159 Notice of Assignment to Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray for trial. (eec)
July 19, 2019 Filing 158 Case transferred in from District of Mississippi Southern; Case Number 1:17-cv-00067. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 157 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting #145 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; Safeco's claims against University of South Alabama are dismissed without prejudice to refiling in a court that has jurisdiction; granting #152 Motion to Change Venue. Clerk of Court directed to Transfer this case to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Alabama. Signed by District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr. on 7/18/2019 (wld) (Main Document 157 replaced on 7/18/2019 to correct Judge's initials only) (wld). [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
July 18, 2019 District Transfer Out to the District of Southern District of Alabama, Mobile Division (wld) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Order transferring Case, document #157, emailed to IT Department to electronically transfer case to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Alabama, Mobile Division. Clerk will docket confirmation email when received from the Southern District of Alabama, Mobile Division. (wld) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
June 18, 2019 Filing 156 Joinder in Document by Estate of Concepcion Matute to #154 Response in Opposition,, filed by Soila Matute, Estate of Rosalinda Matute, Estate of Julisa Matute, Julita Perez, Adrianna Matute, Alfredo Matute (Guild, Patrick) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
May 14, 2019 Filing 155 REPLY to Response to Motion re #152 MOTION to Change Venue (Transfer Venue) filed by Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois (Caraway, Gregg) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
May 7, 2019 Filing 154 Response in Opposition re #153 MEMORANDUM in Support re #152 MOTION to Change Venue (Transfer Venue) filed by Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois (Caraway, Gregg), #152 MOTION to Change Venue (Transfer Venue) by Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Mobile County Complaint, # 2 Exhibit B - Notice of Removal, # 3 Exhibit C - Answer of USA)(Caraway, Gregg) filed by Estate of Julisa Matute, Estate of Rosalinda Matute, Adrianna Matute, Alfredo Matute, Soila Matute, Julita Perez (Davis, James) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
April 29, 2019 Filing 153 MEMORANDUM in Support re #152 MOTION to Change Venue (Transfer Venue) filed by Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois (Caraway, Gregg) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
April 29, 2019 Filing 152 MOTION to Change Venue (Transfer Venue) by Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Mobile County Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit C - Answer of USA)(Caraway, Gregg) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
April 29, 2019 Filing 151 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #150 Response to Motion, filed by Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois (Caraway, Gregg) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
April 29, 2019 Filing 150 RESPONSE to Motion re #145 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Mobile County Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit C - Answer of USA)(Caraway, Gregg) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
April 22, 2019 Filing 149 ANSWER to #141 Amended Complaint, by A.J., Alicia Brown, M.G..(Miner, John) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #148 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #145 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. The response is due by 4/29/2019. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE FROM THE COURT. Signed by District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr., on 4/16/2019. (BR) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
April 15, 2019 Filing 148 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #145 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois (Caraway, Gregg) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
April 4, 2019 Filing 147 ANSWER to #141 Amended Complaint, AND AFFIRMATIVE RESPONSES by Estate of Julisa Matute, Estate of Rosalinda Matute, Adrianna Matute, Alfredo Matute, Soila Matute, Julita Perez.(Davis, James) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
April 1, 2019 Filing 146 ANSWER to #141 Amended Complaint, by GEICO General Insurance Company.(DuBose, Victor) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
April 1, 2019 Filing 145 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by University of South Alabama (Boller, Thomas) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
March 27, 2019 Filing 144 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois. University of South Alabama served on 3/19/2019, answer due 4/9/2019. (Caraway, Gregg) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER Cancelling Case Management Order Deadlines/Hearings per Order #140 entered 3/11/2019. No further written order will issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on 3/26/2019 (SR) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
March 18, 2019 Filing 143 Summons Issued as to University of South Alabama. (wld) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
March 13, 2019 Filing 142 *RESTRICTED* DOCUMENT: Unredacted Amended and Supplemental Complaint for Interpleader by Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Certified Policy of Insurance)(wld) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
March 13, 2019 Filing 141 AMENDED COMPLAINT for Interpleader against A.J., Daryl Bobinger, Alicia Brown, D.A.A.M., Estate of Concepcion Matute, Estate of Julisa Matute, Estate of Rosalinda Matute, GEICO General Insurance Company, M.G., Adrianna Matute, Alfredo Matute, Soila Matute, Julita Perez, R.Q., University of South Alabama, filed by Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Insurance Policy)(Caraway, Gregg) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER granting #139 Motion to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on March 11, 2019 (King, Steve) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
March 4, 2019 Filing 139 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint,,,, by Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Amended Complaint)(Caraway, Gregg) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER granting #127 Motion to Join Party. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on 2/28/2019 (wld) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
February 28, 2019 ***Party University of South Alabama added as a defendant per Order #138. (wld) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
February 22, 2019 Filing 137 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven Paul Savarese, Jr on behalf of GEICO General Insurance Company (Savarese, Steven) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
February 15, 2019 Filing 136 ATTACHMENT re #135 Response in Opposition,, by Estate of Julisa Matute, Estate of Rosalinda Matute, Adrianna Matute, Alfredo Matute, Soila Matute, Julita Perez (Davis, James) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
February 15, 2019 Filing 135 Response in Opposition re #129 RESPONSE in Opposition re #127 MOTION for Joinder #1 Complaint,,,, filed by Estate of Julisa Matute, Estate of Rosalinda Matute, Adrianna Matute, Alfredo Matute, Soila Matute, Julita Perez (Davis, James), #127 MOTION for Joinder #1 Complaint,,,, by Arthur W Campbell (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Probate Claim, # 2 Exhibit B Order)(Norton, Mark) SUPPLEMENTAL OBJECTION filed by Estate of Julisa Matute, Estate of Rosalinda Matute, Adrianna Matute, Alfredo Matute, Soila Matute, Julita Perez (Davis, James) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
February 15, 2019 Docket Annotation as to Doc. #136. L.U.Civ.R. 7(b)(2) requires that all supporting exhibits to a document be denominated by an exhibit letter or number and a meaningful description. Attorney is advised to follow this rule in future filings by including an exhibit letter or number on the exhibit. (wld) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
February 14, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker: TELEPHONIC Status Conference held on 2/14/2019 with attorneys Gregg A. Caraway, Patrick Taylor Guild, James L. Davis III, Mark E. Norton, John S. H. Miner, Steven P. Savarese, Jr. and Victor Arnell DuBose who advised they have no objection to Motions #133 and #134 to reinstate Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois and GEICO General Insurance Company as parties to the case. The Court will therefore grant the motions as agreed. All counsel agreed that there is no need for the Court to conduct another settlement conference at this time. The settlement conference scheduled for February 20, 2019 will be cancelled. (SR) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER Cancelling Settlement Conference set for 2/20/2019 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker. No further order will issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on 2/14/2019 (SR) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #133 Motion for Reinstatement as Party; granting #134 Motion for Reinstatement as Party. By agreement of the parties, Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois and GEICO General Insurance Company are hereby reinstated as parties to this lawsuit. No further written order will issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on February 14, 2019 (King, Steve) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
February 12, 2019 Filing 134 MOTION Reinstatement as Party by GEICO General Insurance Company (DuBose, Victor) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
February 12, 2019 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephone Conference set for 2/14/2019 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker. Counsel for Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois will place the telephone call to Judge Walker's chambers with all necessary counsel on the line. (SR) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
February 4, 2019 Filing 133 MOTION for Reinstatement as Party by Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois (Caraway, Gregg) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
January 31, 2019 NOTICE of Hearing: Settlement Conference set for 2/20/2019 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker. Counsel are instructed to submit to Judge Walker, on or before one week prior to the conference, a memorandum (3 page maximum in PDF format) setting forth a brief explanation of the case, and a candid appraisal of the respective positions, including possible settlement figures. This document is NOT to be exchanged and will be viewed only by the Court. The settlement memoranda should be sent to Judge Walker via e-mail (walker_chambers@mssd.uscourts.gov). PARTIES AND/OR COMPANY REPRESENTATIVES ARE TO BE PRESENT AT THE CONFERENCE. (SR) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
January 31, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker: Telephone Conference held on 1/31/2019 with attorneys Gregg A. Caraway, Patrick Taylor Guild, James L. Davis III, Mark E. Norton, John S. H. Miner and Victor Arnell DuBose. The Estate of Julisa Matute, deceased, filed a claim to a portion of the money interpled in this case. The University of South Alabama Medical Center [USA] filed a probate claim in the Chancery Court of Harrison County, MS, Cause Number 16-cv-1799-3, In The Matter of the Estate of Julisa Matute, deceased, for medical expenses incurred by Julisa Matute at USA.. A Motion #127 to Join USA in this case was filed on January 13, 2019. Prior to ruling on the motion, the Court will conduct an additional settlement conference to be held on February 20, 2019 at 1:30 PM. Attorneys Greg Caraway and Mark Norton agreed to contact counsel for USA and direct them to appear at the settlement conference, with a representative from USA with authority to settle their claim being present at the settlement conference. (SR) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
January 30, 2019 Filing 132 RESPONSE in Opposition re #128 MOTION Enforce Settlement Ruling and Compromise Settlement filed by GEICO General Insurance Company (DuBose, Victor) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
January 29, 2019 Filing 131 Joinder in Document by Arthur W Campbell to #130 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois (Norton, Mark) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
January 28, 2019 Filing 130 RESPONSE in Opposition re #128 MOTION Enforce Settlement Ruling and Compromise Settlement filed by Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Transcript of Settlement Hearing held 09.13.18, #2 Exhibit B - USA's Notice of Appeal)(Caraway, Gregg) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
January 17, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to # 128. Attorney is advised that the case number on all future filings should be 1:17cv67 LG-RHW, not CR. Attorney does not need to re-file the document. (JCH) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
January 16, 2019 Filing 129 RESPONSE in Opposition re #127 MOTION for Joinder #1 Complaint,,,, filed by Estate of Julisa Matute, Estate of Rosalinda Matute, Adrianna Matute, Alfredo Matute, Soila Matute, Julita Perez (Davis, James) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
January 16, 2019 Filing 128 MOTION Enforce Settlement Ruling and Compromise Settlement by Estate of Julisa Matute, Estate of Rosalinda Matute, Adrianna Matute, Alfredo Matute, Soila Matute (Attachments: #1 Attachment Chancery Court Order re: Estate of Rosalinda Matute, #2 Attachment Chancery Court Order re: Estate of Julisa Matute)(Davis, James) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
January 14, 2019 Filing 127 MOTION for Joinder #1 Complaint,,,, by Arthur W Campbell (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Probate Claim, #2 Exhibit B Order)(Norton, Mark) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
January 3, 2019 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephone Conference set for 1/31/2019 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker. Counsel for Estate of Concepcion Matute will place the telephone call to Judge Walker's chambers with all necessary counsel on the line. (SR) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER: The claims of the defendants X.D.B. and Catasha Evans are dismissed for failure to prosecute; and that the Clerk is directed to terminate X.D.B. and Catasha Evans as defendants to this interpleader action. Catasha Evans and X.D.B. (a Minor, by and through his legal guardian, Lillie Breland) terminated. Signed by District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr. on 11/19/18. (RLW) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
November 1, 2018 Filing 125 Joinder in Document by Estate of Julisa Matute, Estate of Rosalinda Matute, Adrianna Matute, Alfredo Matute, Soila Matute, Julita Perez to #123 Response in Opposition, filed by Arthur W Campbell (Davis, James) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
October 26, 2018 Filing 124 (REDACTED)RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by A.J., Alicia Brown, M.G. (Miner, John) Modified on 10/26/2018 (wld). [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
October 25, 2018 Filing 123 (REDACTED)Response in Opposition re #120 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by A.J., Alicia Brown, M.G. (Miner, John) redacted and with corrected Exhibits filed by Arthur W Campbell (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Page 5 of Transcript, #2 Exhibit B Page 9 & 12 of Transcript)(Norton, Mark) Modified on 10/26/2018 (wld). [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
October 25, 2018 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #122. L.U.Civ.R. 7(b)(2) requires that all supporting exhibits to a document be denominated by an exhibit letter or number and a meaningful description. Attorney will re-file the exhibits correctly. Document #122 will be disregarded. (wld) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER re #121 Response in Opposition filed by Arthur W Campbell, #120 Response to Order to Show Cause filed by M.G., Alicia Brown, A.J. The clerk is directed to restrict access of these documents to case participants. The parties are directed to file redacted versions of their respective responses. No further written order will issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on October 25, 2018 (King, Steve) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
October 24, 2018 Filing 122 (DISREGARD)ATTACHMENT re #121 Response in Opposition Exhibit A & B by Arthur W Campbell (Norton, Mark) Modified on 10/25/2018 (wld). [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
October 24, 2018 Filing 121 Response in Opposition re #120 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by A.J., Alicia Brown, M.G. (Miner, John) filed by Arthur W Campbell (Norton, Mark) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
October 22, 2018 ***Staff notes: Document #120 restricted due to minor's names per counsel and Judge Walker's chambers. (wld) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
October 19, 2018 Filing 120 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by A.J., Alicia Brown, M.G. (Miner, John) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
October 15, 2018 Filing 119 NOTICE of Attempted Service of Order to Show Cause by A.J., Alicia Brown, M.G. re #116 Order to Show Cause (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Proof of Attempted Service)(Miner, John) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
October 15, 2018 Filing 118 NOTICE of Service of Order to Show Cause by X.D.B. re #116 Order to Show Cause (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- proof of Service)(Miner, John) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
October 15, 2018 Filing 117 NOTICE of Service of Order to Show Cause by Catasha Evans re #116 Order to Show Cause (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Proof of Service)(Miner, John) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 10/19/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on September 19, 2018 (King, Steve) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
September 14, 2018 NOTICE of Hearing: TELEPHONIC Status Conference set for 11/15/2018 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker. Plaintiff will place the telephone call to Judge Walker's chambers with all necessary counsel on the line. (SR) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
September 13, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker: Settlement Conference held on 9/13/2018. After a lengthy settlement conference the case tentatively settled. The terms of settlement were placed on the record. The settlement is subject to certain defendants being dismissed for failure to attend the settlement conference and various chancery court petitions to approve estates, wrongful death claims and a minor's claim. The Court will set a telephonic status call for November 15, 2018 at 9:00 AM. APPEARANCES: Gregg A. Caraway (counsel for Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois); Patrick Taylor Guild (counsel for Defendant Estate of Concepcion Matute); Daryl Bobinger (Defendant); Soila Matute (Defendant); Adrianna Matute (Defendant); Julita Perez (Defendant); James L. Davis, III (counsel for Defendants Estate of Julisa Matute, Estate of Rosalinda Matute, Soila Matute, Adrianna Matute and Julita Perez); John S. Miner (counsel for Defendants Alicia Brown, X.D.B., Catasha Evans, M.G. and A.J.); Sandra Campbell (spouse of Defendant Arthur W. Campbell); Wilbur Holder (counsel for Sandra Campbell and Defendant Arthur W. Campbell), and Mark E. Norton (counsel for Defendant Arthur W. Campbell). (SR) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #115 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Emily Sarah Fertig terminated. Attorney John S. H. Miner has made an entry of appearance on behalf of defendants A.J., Alicia Brown, Catasha Evans, M.G. and X.D.B. No further written order will issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on September 7, 2018 (King, Steve) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
September 6, 2018 Filing 115 Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Attorney by A.J., Alicia Brown, Catasha Evans, M.G., X.D.B. (Miner, John) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
September 6, 2018 Filing 114 NOTICE of Appearance by John S. H. Miner on behalf of A.J., Alicia Brown, Catasha Evans, M.G., X.D.B. (Miner, John) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
July 19, 2018 NOTICE of Calendar Setting: REMINDER of the settlement conference previously set for 9/13/2018 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker. Counsel are instructed to submit to Judge Walker, on or before one week prior to the conference, a memorandum (3 page maximum in PDF format) setting forth a brief explanation of the case, and a candid appraisal of the respective positions, including possible settlement figures. This document is NOT to be exchanged and will be viewed only by the Court. The settlement memoranda should be sent to Judge Walker via e-mail (walker_chambers@mssd.uscourts.gov). PARTIES AND/OR COMPANY REPRESENTATIVES ARE TO BE PRESENT AT THE CONFERENCE. (SR) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
July 10, 2018 Filing 113 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Julita Perez, Soila Matute, Adriana Matute, Alfredo Matute by Arthur W Campbell (Hatten, Andrew) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
July 3, 2018 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #112: Attorney is advised to include the correct case number and judge assignment of LG-RHW on future filed pleadings. This case was reassigned to Chief District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on 7/26/17. (wld) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
July 2, 2018 Filing 112 NOTICE of Service of Counter-Plaintiffs' Designation of Experts by Estate of Julisa Matute, Estate of Rosalinda Matute, Adrianna Matute, Alfredo Matute, Soila Matute, Julita Perez (Davis, James) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
May 11, 2018 Docket Annotation as to Doc. #111. Incorrect event chosen. This document should have been docketed as a "certificate of service" which can be found under "service of process". Counsel does not need to re-file. (wld) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
May 10, 2018 Filing 111 NOTICE of filing Certificate of Service as to Doc 109 by Arthur W Campbell re #109 Notice of Appearance (Hatten, Andrew) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
May 10, 2018 Docket Annotation as to Doc. #109. Any PDF fillable on-line forms once completed should be electronically converted to PDF by printing to the PDF printer. Save the file with an appropriate name in a folder. E-file the electronically converted PDF form, not the form which was filled in and saved. Clerk has replaced the document with a converted PDF. Counsel does not need to re-file this form; however, this document is not accompanied by a certificate of service. A certificate of service must be attached to a document [Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing, Sec. 4.A.1, Sec. 4.B, and Fed.R.Civ.P. Rule 5(d)(1)]. Attorney is directed to file a certificate as CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE and link it to document #109. (wld) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
May 9, 2018 Filing 110 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Julita Perez, Soila Matute, Adriana Matute, Alfredo Matute by Arthur W Campbell (Hatten, Andrew) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
May 9, 2018 Filing 109 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew A. Hatten on behalf of Arthur W Campbell (Hatten, Andrew) (Main Document 109 replaced on 5/10/2018) (wld). [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
May 3, 2018 Filing 108 NOTICE of Service of Pre-Discovery Disclosure by Arthur W Campbell (Norton, Mark) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
May 2, 2018 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #107: Attorney is advised to include the correct judge assignment of LG-RHW on future filed pleadings. This case was reassigned to Chief District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on 7/26/17. (RLW)[Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
May 1, 2018 Filing 107 NOTICE of Service of Initial Pre-Discovery Disclosure by A.J., Alicia Brown, Catasha Evans, M.G., X.D.B. (Fertig, Emily) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
May 1, 2018 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #105. Incorrect document attached. Counsel should re-file and attach a Notice of Service of Disclosure. (wld) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
April 30, 2018 Filing 106 NOTICE of Service of Disclosure by D.A.A.M., Estate of Concepcion Matute (Guild, Patrick) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
April 30, 2018 Filing 105 **ERROR**Disregard this entry. NOTICE of Service of Rule 26 (a) Initial Disclosure by A.J., Alicia Brown, Catasha Evans, M.G., X.D.B. (Fertig, Emily) Modified on 5/2/2018 (RLW). [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
April 24, 2018 Filing 104 DEFAULT JUDGMENT Signed by District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr. on 4/24/2018 (wld) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
April 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER granting #100 Motion for Default Judgment Signed by District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr. on 4/24/2018 (wld) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
April 24, 2018 *** Party American Medical Response, Inc., Forrest General Health Services, Inc., GPCH-GP, Inc., George Regional Helath & Rehab Center, Mississippi Division of Medicaid, Optum Services, Inc., Kelly J. Tucker, United Healthcare Services,Inc., ACS Emergency Services of Mississippi, P.A. and Accelerated Claims, Inc. terminated. (wld) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
April 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER granting #96 Motion to Dismiss. Ordered that Geico General Insurance Company is dismissed as defendant to this interpleader action. Signed by District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr on 4/13/18. (JCH) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
April 13, 2018 *** Party GEICO General Insurance Company terminated, pursuant to the Order filed on 4/13/18. (JCH) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
April 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 101 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Disclosure due by 4/30/2018. Jury Trial set for a three-week trial calendar beginning on 5/6/2019 09:00 AM in Courtroom 806 (Gulfport) Guirola before District Judge Louis Guirola Jr. Pretrial Conference set for 4/17-18/2019 09:00 AM in Courtroom 806 (Gulfport) Guirola before District Judge Louis Guirola Jr. Discovery due by 10/1/2018. Motions for Amended Pleadings due by 6/1/2018. Motions for Joinder of Parties due by 6/1/2018. Designate Experts Plaintiff Deadline due by 7/2/2018. Designate Experts for Defendant Deadline due by 8/1/2018. Motions due by 10/15/2018. Settlement Conference set for 9/13/2018 09:30 AM in Chambers 870 (Gulfport) Walker before Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker. ADR Report due by 4/10/2019. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 4/17/2019. EDT: 5-7 days. Parties do not consent. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on 4/9/2018 (SR) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
April 9, 2018 Filing 100 MOTION for Default Judgment as to by Arthur W Campbell (Norton, Mark) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
April 9, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker: Telephonic Case Management Conference held on 4/9/2018 with attorneys Gregg A. Caraway, Patrick Taylor Guild, James L. Davis III, Emily Sarah Fertig and Mark E. Norton. (SR) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
April 6, 2018 Filing 99 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to defendants ACS Emergency Services of Mississippi, P.A., Accelerated Claims, Inc., American Medical Response, Inc., Forrest General Health Services, Inc., GPCH-GP, Inc., George Regional Health & Rehab Center, Mississippi Division of Medicaid, Optum Services, Inc., Kelly J. Tucker, United Healthcare Services,Inc. (ASJ) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
April 6, 2018 Filing 98 Amended MOTION for Entry of Default by Arthur W Campbell (Norton, Mark) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
April 5, 2018 Filing 97 MOTION for Entry of Default by Arthur W Campbell (Norton, Mark) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
March 28, 2018 Filing 96 MOTION to Dismiss by GEICO General Insurance Company (DuBose, Victor) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
March 23, 2018 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #95. Counsel should use the correct Judges' initials on future filings. 1:17cv67LG-RHW. Case was reassigned on 7/26/2017. (wld) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
March 22, 2018 Filing 95 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick Taylor Guild on behalf of D.A.A.M., Estate of Concepcion Matute (Guild, Patrick) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
March 14, 2018 Filing 94 NOTICE of Mailing of Order by Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois (Caraway, Gregg) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
March 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER granting #80 Motion for discharge; granting #80 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr. on 3/14/2018 (wld) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
March 14, 2018 Copy of Order #93 provided to Jackie Niven, Financial Manager. (wld) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
March 14, 2018 *** Party Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois terminated. (wld) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
March 1, 2018 Filing 92 Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 4/9/2018 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker. (SR) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
February 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER Modifying #86 Order Setting Mandatory Mediation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on February 22, 2018 (King, Steve) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
February 12, 2018 Filing 90 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Sandra L. Campbell by Estate of Concepcion Matute, Estate of Julisa Matute, Estate of Rosalinda Matute, Adrianna Matute, Alfredo Matute, Soila Matute, Julita Perez (Davis, James) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
January 25, 2018 Filing 89 NOTICE to Take Deposition of SANDRA CAMPBELL by Estate of Concepcion Matute, Estate of Julisa Matute, Estate of Rosalinda Matute, Adrianna Matute, Alfredo Matute, Soila Matute, Julita Perez (Davis, James) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
January 9, 2018 Filing 88 NOTICE of Compliance of Order by Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois re #86 Order (Caraway, Gregg) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
December 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER granting #84 Motion to Dismiss filed by Memorial Hospital at Gulfport and Revclaims, LLC, as unopposed. Signed by District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr., on 12/18/2017. (BR) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
December 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER Setting Mandatory Mediation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on December 18, 2017 (King, Steve) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
December 18, 2017 *** Parties Memorial Hospital at Gulfport and Revclaims, LLC, terminated. (BR) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
December 14, 2017 Docket Annotation as to Doc. #83,84 & 85. Attorney is advised to include the correct judge assignment of LG-RHW on future filed pleadings. This case was reassigned to Judge Guirola and Magistrate Judge Walker on 7/26/2017. (wld) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
December 13, 2017 Filing 85 NOTICE to Take Deposition of ARTHUR CAMPBELL and SANDRA CAMPBELL by Estate of Concepcion Matute, Estate of Julisa Matute, Estate of Rosalinda Matute, Adrianna Matute, Alfredo Matute, Soila Matute, Julita Perez (Davis, James) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
December 13, 2017 Filing 84 Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss by Memorial Hospital at Gulfport, Revclaims, LLC (Buccola, Stephen) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
December 13, 2017 Filing 83 NOTICE of DISCLAIMER by Memorial Hospital at Gulfport, Revclaims, LLC (Buccola, Stephen) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
November 28, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker: Telephonic Case Management Conference held on 11/28/2017 with attorneys Gregg A. Caraway, James L. Davis III, Emily Sarah Fertig, Stephen J. Buccola, Victor Arnell DuBose and Mark E. Norton. Safeco has filed this interpleader action and deposited into the registry of the Court insurance policy limits related to an automobile accident. The insureds alleged negligence resulted in three deaths, additional personal injuries, and numerous claims for property damage and medical expenses. In an attempt to settle the competing claims at an early stage in the proceedings, the Court will not enter a case management order at this time. Rather, the Court will notice a settlement conference to be conducted on February 22, 2018 at 9:30 AM. Prior to the settlement conference, the Court will allow the depositions of Mr. and Mrs. Arthur W. Campbell. Mr. Caraway is directed to submit a proposed order noticing the settlement conference and advising all defendants to appear at the conference or their claims will be deemed waived for failure to participate in Court proceedings. (SR) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
November 27, 2017 Reset Hearings: Telephonic Case Management Conference RESET due to a change in the Court's schedule for 11/28/2017 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker. Counsel will follow the instructions given in the Initial Rule 16(a) Order. (SR) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
November 9, 2017 Reset Hearings: Telephonic Case Management Conference RESET TIME CHANGE ONLY for 11/28/2017 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker. Counsel will follow the instructions given in the Initial Rule 16(a) Order. (SR) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
October 24, 2017 Filing 82 Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 11/28/2017 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker. (SR) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
October 24, 2017 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #81 Motion to Schedule Case Management Conference. The Court will notice a telephonic case management conference. No further written order will issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on October 24, 2017 (King, Steve) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
October 23, 2017 Filing 81 Unopposed MOTION to Schedule Case Management Conference by Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois (Caraway, Gregg) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
October 23, 2017 Filing 80 MOTION for Discharge , MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice by Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois (Caraway, Gregg) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
October 4, 2017 Filing 79 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois. R.Q. served on 9/29/2017, answer due 10/20/2017. (Caraway, Gregg) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
September 18, 2017 Filing 78 Summons Issued as to R.Q. (wld) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
September 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER granting #76 Motion for Extension of Time to Serve Process. Plaintiff is granted 20 days from the date of this order in which to serve process upon Defendant R.Q., a minor by and through his guardian and next friend, Sandra Campbell. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on September 15, 2017. (Joffe, Scherry) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
September 14, 2017 Filing 76 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Process by Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois (Caraway, Gregg) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
September 11, 2017 Filing 75 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois GPCH-GP, Inc. served on 4/27/2017, answer due 5/18/2017. (Caraway, Gregg) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
August 11, 2017 Filing 74 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois Forrest General Health Services, Inc. served on 8/10/2017, answer due 8/31/2017. (Caraway, Gregg) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
August 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER granting #72 Motion to Dismiss the defendant Stone County Hospital, Inc. The defendant Stone County Hospital, Inc., is dismissed with prejudice, with each party to bear its own costs. Signed by C hief District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr., on 8/9/2017. (BR) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
August 9, 2017 Filing 72 Third MOTION to Dismiss Certain Defendant by Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Whitehead Affidavit for Stone County Hospital)(Caraway, Gregg) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
August 9, 2017 *** Party Stone County Hospital, Inc. terminated. (BR) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
August 3, 2017 Filing 71 Summons Issued as to Forrest General Health Services, Inc. (wld) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
August 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER granting #69 Motion to Substitute Party. Forrest General Health Services, Inc. added. MHA Solutions, Inc. terminated Signed by Chief District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr. on 8/2/2017 (wld) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
July 31, 2017 Filing 69 MOTION to Substitute Party by Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois (Caraway, Gregg) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
July 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER granting #67 Motion to Dismiss Certain Defendants. The following defendants are dismissed with prejudice with each party to bear its own costs: Lacy Snow, South Mississippi Emergency Physicians, P.A., SMB Radiology, P.A., Mississippi Farm Bureau Casualty Insurance Company, Brenda Winburn, and Clifford Winburn. Signed by Chief District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr., on 7/31/2017. (BR) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
July 31, 2017 *** Parties Lacey Snow, South Mississippi Emergency Physicians, P.A., Brenda Winburn, Clifford Winburn, Mississippi Farm Bureau Casualty Insurance Company, and SMB Radiology, P.A. terminated. (BR) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
July 28, 2017 Filing 67 Second MOTION to Dismiss Certain Defendants by Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Lacey Snow, #2 Exhibit B - Affidavit of John C. Nelson for South MS Emergency Physicians, #3 Exhibit C - Affidavit of Dena Perkins for SMB Radiology, #4 Exhibit D - Affidavit of Stacy Crosby for MS Farm Bureau, #5 Exhibit E - Affidavit of Brenda Winburn, #6 Exhibit F - Affidavit of Clifford Winburn)(Caraway, Gregg) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
July 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Chief District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr. for all further proceedings. District Judge Halil S. Ozerden no longer assigned to case Signed by Chief District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr. on 7/26/2017 (wld) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
July 26, 2017 Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker. Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo no longer assigned to the case. (wld) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
July 26, 2017 ***Set RHW/Cleared JCG Flag (wld) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
June 13, 2017 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting in part and denying in part #65 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to Serve Process. Based upon the representation of Plaintiff in its Motion concerning its efforts to serve the two remaining Defendants, Plaintiff's deadline for service of process on all Defendants is extended by sixty days to August 14, 2017. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 6/13/2017 (HM) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
June 12, 2017 Filing 65 MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Process by Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois (Caraway, Gregg) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
June 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER granting #55 Motion to Dismiss Certain Defendants. Signed by District Judge Halil S. Ozerden on 6/12/2017.(SY) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
June 12, 2017 *** Party Medical Reimbursements of America, Inc., Mississippi Orthopaedic Institute, PLLC, Progressive Gulf Insurance Company, Wellmark, Inc., West Claims Recovery Services, LLC, American Family Insurance Company and Georgia-Pacific, LLC terminated. (SY) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
June 9, 2017 Filing 63 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois George Regional Helath & Rehab Center served on 6/9/2017, answer due 6/30/2017. (Caraway, Gregg) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
June 8, 2017 Filing 62 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois Clifford Winburn served on 4/5/2017, answer due 4/26/2017. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Notice and Acknowledgment for Service by Mail)(Caraway, Gregg) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
June 8, 2017 Filing 61 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois Brenda Winburn served on 4/5/2017, answer due 4/26/2017. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Notice and Acknowledgment for Service by Mail)(Caraway, Gregg) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
June 8, 2017 Filing 60 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois D.A.A.M. served on 3/30/2017, answer due 4/20/2017. (Caraway, Gregg) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
June 8, 2017 Filing 59 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois Accelerated Claims, Inc. served on 5/23/2017, answer due 6/13/2017. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Notice and Acknowledgment for Service by Mail)(Caraway, Gregg) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
June 8, 2017 Filing 58 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois Lacey Snow served on 3/27/2017, answer due 4/17/2017. (Caraway, Gregg) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
June 8, 2017 Filing 57 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois SMB Radiology, P.A. served on 6/6/2017, answer due 6/27/2017. (Caraway, Gregg) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
June 8, 2017 Filing 56 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois Daryl Bobinger served on 6/5/2017, answer due 6/26/2017. (Caraway, Gregg) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
June 8, 2017 Filing 55 MOTION to Dismiss Certain Defendants by Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Accent and Wellmark Affidavit, #2 Exhibit B - American Family Affidavit, #3 Exhibit C - Georgia Pacific Affidavit, #4 Exhibit D - MRA Affidavit, #5 Exhibit E - MS Ortho Institute Affidavit, #6 Exhibit F - Progressive Insurance Affidavit)(Caraway, Gregg) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
May 23, 2017 Filing 54 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Estate of Julisa Matute, Estate of Concepcion Matute, Adrianna Matute, Alfredo Matute, Soila Matute, Julita Perez, Estate of Rosalinda Matute Arthur W Campbell served on 5/4/2017, answer due 5/25/2017. (Davis, James) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
May 18, 2017 Filing 53 ANSWER to #39 Third Party Complaint, by Arthur W Campbell.(Norton, Mark) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
May 1, 2017 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #40 Plaintiff Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois' Motion to Reconsider. Plaintiff has now briefed the issue of federal subject matter jurisdiction in its Motion for Reconsideration. Plaintiff is therefore not required to file an amended complaint, as previously ordered in Order #25 . NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 5/1/2017 (HM) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
April 29, 2017 Filing 52 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois Soila Matute served on 4/12/2017, answer due 5/3/2017. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Notice and Acknowledgment for Service by Mail)(Caraway, Gregg) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
April 29, 2017 Filing 51 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois Julita Perez served on 4/12/2017, answer due 5/3/2017. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Notice and Acknowledgment for Service by Mail)(Caraway, Gregg) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
April 29, 2017 Filing 50 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois Estate of Rosalinda Matute served on 4/12/2017, answer due 5/3/2017. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Notice and Acknowledgment for Service by Mail)(Caraway, Gregg) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
April 29, 2017 Filing 49 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois Estate of Julisa Matute served on 4/12/2017, answer due 5/3/2017. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Notice and Acknowledgment for Service by Mail)(Caraway, Gregg) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
April 29, 2017 Filing 48 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois Alfredo Matute served on 4/12/2017, answer due 5/3/2017. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Notice and Acknowledgment for Service by Mail)(Caraway, Gregg) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
April 29, 2017 Filing 47 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois Adrianna Matute served on 4/12/2017, answer due 5/3/2017. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Notice and Acknowledgment for Service by Mail)(Caraway, Gregg) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
April 26, 2017 Filing 46 Third Party Summons Issued as to Arthur W Campbell. (wld) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
April 24, 2017 Filing 45 NOTICE of Appearance by Ronald G. Peresich on behalf of Stone County Hospital, Inc. (Peresich, Ronald) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
April 21, 2017 Filing 44 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois Kelly J. Tucker served on 4/10/2017, answer due 5/1/2017. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Notice and Acknowledgment for Service by Mail)(Caraway, Gregg) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
April 20, 2017 Filing 43 Corporate Disclosure Statement by GEICO General Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Berkshire Hathaway, Inc. for GEICO General Insurance Company. (DuBose, Victor) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
April 19, 2017 Filing 42 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Stone County Hospital, Inc. (Whitehead, Michael) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
April 19, 2017 Filing 41 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,, by Stone County Hospital, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "1" - Evans' Authorization & Agreement)(Whitehead, Michael) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
April 17, 2017 Filing 40 MOTION for Reconsideration re #25 Order by Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois (Bailey, Clifford (Ford)) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
April 14, 2017 Filing 39 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Arthur W Campbell, filed by Alfredo Matute, Soila Matute, Julita Perez, Estate of Concepcion Matute, Estate of Julisa Matute, Adrianna Matute, Estate of Rosalinda Matute. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A" - Accident Report)(Davis, James) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
April 14, 2017 Filing 38 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,, for Interpleader by Estate of Concepcion Matute, Estate of Julisa Matute, Estate of Rosalinda Matute, Adrianna Matute, Alfredo Matute, Soila Matute, Julita Perez.(Davis, James) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
April 13, 2017 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting Defendant Georgia Pacific, LLC's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint for Interpleader #37 . Georgia Pacific is granted up to and through May 12, 2017, to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Interpleader Complaint. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 4/13/2017 (HM) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
April 12, 2017 Filing 37 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint for Interpleader by Georgia-Pacific, LLC (Fijman, Mark) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
April 10, 2017 Filing 36 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,, by GEICO General Insurance Company.(DuBose, Victor) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
April 4, 2017 Filing 35 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois X.D.B. served on 3/29/2017, answer due 4/19/2017. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Notice and Acknowledgment for Service by Mail)(Caraway, Gregg) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
April 4, 2017 Filing 34 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois M.G. served on 3/29/2017, answer due 4/19/2017. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Notice and Acknowledgment for Service by Mail)(Caraway, Gregg) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
April 4, 2017 Filing 33 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois Catasha Evans served on 3/29/2017, answer due 4/19/2017. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Notice and Acknowledgment for Service by Mail)(Caraway, Gregg) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
April 4, 2017 Filing 32 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois Alicia Brown served on 3/29/2017, answer due 4/19/2017. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Notice and Acknowledgment for Service by Mail)(Caraway, Gregg) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
April 4, 2017 Filing 31 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois A.J. served on 3/29/2017, answer due 4/19/2017. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Notice and Acknowledgment for Service by Mail)(Caraway, Gregg) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
April 4, 2017 Filing 30 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois Memorial Hospital at Gulfport served on 3/24/2017, answer due 4/14/2017. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Notice and Acknowledgment for Service by Mail)(Caraway, Gregg) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
April 4, 2017 Filing 29 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois Stone County Hospital, Inc. served on 3/24/2017, answer due 4/14/2017. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Notice and Acknowledgment for Service by Mail)(Caraway, Gregg) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
April 4, 2017 Filing 28 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,, by A.J., Alicia Brown, Catasha Evans, M.G., X.D.B..(Fertig, Emily) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
April 3, 2017 Filing 27 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,, by Mississippi Farm Bureau Casualty Insurance Company.(Zachary, Patrick) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
April 3, 2017 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily Sarah Fertig on behalf of A.J., Alicia Brown, Catasha Evans, M.G., X.D.B. (Fertig, Emily) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
April 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER requiring Plaintiff to File an Amended Complaint That Demonstrates Diversity Jurisdiction. Amended complaint due 4/17/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 4/3/2017 (HM) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
April 3, 2017 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #23 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Substitute Party. X.D.B, a minor, by and through his legal guardian, Lillie Breland, is substituted in place of X.D.B., a minor, by and through his mother, Tina Brown. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 4/3/2017 (HM) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
March 31, 2017 Filing 24 Check in the amount of $100,000.00 from Safeco Insurance Company deposited into the registry of the court. Receipt #34643044203. (wld) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
March 31, 2017 Filing 23 Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Party by Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois (Caraway, Gregg) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
March 31, 2017 ***Staff notes: Order #22 emailed to Financial Office in Jackson. (wld) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
March 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #21 Motion to Deposit Funds. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 3/30/2017 (HM) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
March 29, 2017 Filing 21 MOTION to Deposit Funds by Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois (Caraway, Gregg) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
March 25, 2017 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #19: (1) This docket entry should have been linked to #1 Redacted Complaint.Court staff has made the correction; and (2) Upon selecting the word Exhibit from the category box, the word Exhibit or Ex should not be included in the description box. Attorney is not required to re-file, but is advising to follow this process in the future filing of exhibits. (RLW) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
March 24, 2017 Filing 20 Summons Issued as to A.J., Alicia Brown, D.A.A.M., Estate of Concepcion Matute, Estate of Julisa Matute, Estate of Rosalinda Matute, Catasha Evans, M.G., Adrianna Matute, Alfredo Matute, Soila Matute, Julita Perez, X.D.B. (wld) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
March 24, 2017 Filing 19 ANSWER to Complaint #1 Redacted Complaint by Memorial Hospital at Gulfport, Revclaims, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Buccola, Stephen) Modified on 3/25/2017 to create relationship to document #1 (RLW). [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
March 23, 2017 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois United Healthcare Services,Inc. served on 3/22/2017, answer due 4/12/2017. (Caraway, Gregg) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
March 23, 2017 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois Revclaims, LLC served on 3/22/2017, answer due 4/12/2017. (Caraway, Gregg) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
March 23, 2017 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois Progressive Gulf Insurance Company served on 3/22/2017, answer due 4/12/2017. (Caraway, Gregg) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
March 23, 2017 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois Optum Services, Inc. served on 3/22/2017, answer due 4/12/2017. (Caraway, Gregg) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
March 23, 2017 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois Mississippi Farm Bureau Casualty Insurance Company served on 3/22/2017, answer due 4/12/2017. (Caraway, Gregg) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
March 23, 2017 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois Mississippi Division of Medicaid served on 3/22/2017, answer due 4/12/2017. (Caraway, Gregg) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
March 23, 2017 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois Medical Reimbursements of America, Inc. served on 3/22/2017, answer due 4/12/2017. (Caraway, Gregg) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
March 23, 2017 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois Georgia-Pacific, LLC served on 3/22/2017, answer due 4/12/2017. (Caraway, Gregg) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
March 23, 2017 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois GEICO General Insurance Company served on 3/22/2017, answer due 4/12/2017. (Caraway, Gregg) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
March 23, 2017 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois American Medical Response, Inc. served on 3/22/2017, answer due 4/12/2017. (Caraway, Gregg) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
March 23, 2017 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois ACS Emergency Services of Mississippi, P.A. served on 3/22/2017, answer due 4/12/2017. (Caraway, Gregg) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
March 22, 2017 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen J. Buccola on behalf of Memorial Hospital at Gulfport (Buccola, Stephen) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
March 22, 2017 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen J. Buccola on behalf of Revclaims, LLC (Buccola, Stephen) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
March 22, 2017 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregg A. Caraway on behalf of Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois (Caraway, Gregg) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
March 15, 2017 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois (Bailey, Clifford (Ford)) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
March 13, 2017 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to ACS Emergency Services of Mississippi, P.A., Accelerated Claims, Inc., American Family Insurance Company, American Medical Response, Inc., Daryl Bobinger, GEICO General Insurance Company, GPCH-GP, Inc., George Regional Helath & Rehab Center, Georgia-Pacific, LLC, MHA Solutions, Inc., Medical Reimbursements of America, Inc., Memorial Hospital at Gulfport, Mississippi Division of Medicaid, Mississippi Farm Bureau Casualty Insurance Company, Mississippi Orthopaedic Institute, PLLC, Optum Services, Inc., Progressive Gulf Insurance Company, Revclaims, LLC, SMB Radiology, P.A., Lacey Snow, South Mississippi Emergency Physicians, P.A., Stone County Hospital, Inc., Kelly J. Tucker, United Healthcare Services,Inc., Wellmark, Inc., West Claims Recovery Services, LLC, Brenda Winburn, Clifford Winburn. (wld) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
March 13, 2017 Filing 1 REDACTED COMPLAINT against A.J., ACS Emergency Services of Mississippi, P.A., Accelerated Claims, Inc., American Family Insurance Company, American Medical Response, Inc., Daryl Bobinger, Alicia Brown, D.A.A.M., Estate of Concepcion Matute, Estate of Julisa Matute, Estate of Rosalinda Matute, Catasha Evans, GEICO General Insurance Company, GPCH-GP, Inc., George Regional Helath & Rehab Center, Georgia-Pacific, LLC, M.G., MHA Solutions, Inc., Adrianna Matute, Alfredo Matute, Soila Matute, Medical Reimbursements of America, Inc., Memorial Hospital at Gulfport, Mississippi Division of Medicaid, Mississippi Farm Bureau Casualty Insurance Company, Mississippi Orthopaedic Institute, PLLC, Optum Services, Inc., Julita Perez, Progressive Gulf Insurance Company, R.Q., Revclaims, LLC, SMB Radiology, P.A., Lacey Snow, South Mississippi Emergency Physicians, P.A., Stone County Hospital, Inc., Kelly J. Tucker, United Healthcare Services,Inc., Wellmark, Inc., West Claims Recovery Services, LLC, Brenda Winburn, Clifford Winburn, X.D.B. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 14643009058), filed by Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Policy, #2 Redacted List of Defendants, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(wld) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]
March 13, 2017 ***Set JCG and No CMC Flag (wld) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 7/19/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois v. Estate of Concepcion Matute et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GPCH-GP, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julita Perez
Represented By: James L. Davis, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Forrest General Health Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West Claims Recovery Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Gulf Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Regional Helath & Rehab Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estate of Rosalinda Matute
Represented By: James L. Davis, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alfredo Matute
Represented By: James L. Davis, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Memorial Hospital at Gulfport
Represented By: Stephen J. Buccola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brenda Winburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clifford Winburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alicia Brown
Represented By: Emily Sarah Fertig
Represented By: John S. H. Miner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Soila Matute
Represented By: James L. Davis, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catasha Evans
Represented By: Emily Sarah Fertig
Represented By: John S. H. Miner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Revclaims, LLC
Represented By: Stephen J. Buccola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mississippi Division of Medicaid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Family Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mississippi Orthopaedic Institute, PLLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estate of Julisa Matute
Represented By: James L. Davis, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of South Alabama
Represented By: Thomas R. Boller
Represented By: Mary Allie Elizabeth Boller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: South Mississippi Emergency Physicians, P.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medical Reimbursements of America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SMB Radiology, P.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lacey Snow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estate of Concepcion Matute
Represented By: James L. Davis, III
Represented By: Patrick Taylor Guild
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MHA Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: X.D.B.
Represented By: Emily Sarah Fertig
Represented By: John S. H. Miner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.G.
Represented By: Emily Sarah Fertig
Represented By: John S. H. Miner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.J.
Represented By: Emily Sarah Fertig
Represented By: John S. H. Miner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wellmark, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R.Q.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACS Emergency Services of Mississippi, P.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Optum Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Healthcare Services,Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Georgia-Pacific LLC
Represented By: Mark D. Fijman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEICO General Insurance Company
Represented By: Victor Arnell DuBose
Represented By: Steven Paul Savarese, Jr.
Represented By: Andrew Wayne Martin, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adrianna Matute
Represented By: James L. Davis, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mississippi Farm Bureau Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Patrick H. Zachary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D.A.A.M.
Represented By: Patrick Taylor Guild
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stone County Hospital, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Edward Whitehead
Represented By: Ronald G. Peresich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daryl Bobinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Medical Response, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly J. Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Accelerated Claims, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MHA Solutions, Inc. doing business as Forrest General Hospital Systems
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wellmark, Inc. doing business as Wellmark Blue Cross and Blue Shield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GPCH-GP, Inc. doing business as Garden Park Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West Claims Recovery Services, LLC doing business as Accent Cost Containment Solutions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Arthur W Campbell
Represented By: Andrew A. Hatten
Represented By: Mark E. Norton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Sandra Campbell
Represented By: Andrew A. Hatten
Represented By: Mark E. Norton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois
Represented By: Clifford (Ford) K. Bailey, III
Represented By: Gregg A. Caraway
Represented By: Joshua Robert Hess
Represented By: Joshua B. Baker
Represented By: Kevin Alan Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?