Myers et al v. Top Tier Scooby, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Dionne Meyers, Brian Meyers, Dionne Myers and Brian Myers
Defendant: Top Tier Scooby, LLC, Top Tier Watersports, Fraisher, LLC and Top Tier Beach, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00414
Filed: July 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: William E Cassady
Referring Judge: Terry F Moorer
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2019 Filing 14 Document endorsed NOTED by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady: Corporate Disclosure Statement #13 filed by Top Tier Beach, LLC, Top Tier Scooby, LLC, Top Tier Watersports, Fraisher, LLC (Cassady, William)
September 16, 2019 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendants Fraisher, LLC, Top Tier Beach, LLC, Top Tier Scooby, LLC, Top Tier Watersports. (Hails, Edward)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING #5 Motion & Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Beth E. Abramson as set out. Signed by District Judge Terry F. Moorer on 9/9/19. (tot)
September 9, 2019 Filing 11 Blank Disclosure Statement E-Mailed to Counsel for Defendants Fraisher, LLC, Top Tier Beach, LLC, Top Tier Scooby, LLC, Top Tier Watersports. Disclosure Statements Due 9/16/2019. Please list members of LLC. (tot)
September 6, 2019 Filing 10 DEFENDANTS' ANSWER to #3 Amended Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Fraisher, LLC, Top Tier Beach, LLC, Top Tier Scooby, LLC, Top Tier Watersports. (Hails, Edward)
August 27, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed for Top Tier Watersports by Dionne Myers, Brian Myers. Top Tier Watersports served on 8/16/2019, answer due 9/6/2019 (Sterbcow, Paul)
August 27, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed for Defendant Top Tier Scooby, LLC by Dionne Myers, Brian Myers. Top Tier Scooby, LLC served on 8/16/2019, answer due 9/6/2019 (Sterbcow, Paul)
August 27, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed for Defendant Top Tier Beach, LLC by Dionne Myers, Brian Myers. Top Tier Beach, LLC served on 8/16/2019, answer due 9/6/2019 (Sterbcow, Paul)
August 27, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed for Defendant Fraisher, LLC by Dionne Myers, Brian Myers. Fraisher, LLC served on 8/16/2019, answer due 9/6/2019 (Sterbcow, Paul)
August 9, 2019 REFERRAL OF #5 MOTION and APPLICATION for Beth E. Abramson to Appear Pro Hac Vice to Judge Moorer. (tot)
August 9, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION and APPLICATION for Beth E. Abramson to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney affirms that a certificate of good standing that complies with #S.D. Ala. GenLR 83.3(d) is attached. ( Filing fee $ 75, Receipt number AALSDC-2449466, Online Credit Card Payment) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing EDLA, #2 Certificate of Good Standing LASC) (Abramson, Beth)
July 29, 2019 Filing 4 Summonses Issued as to Top Tier Scooby, LLC, Top Tier Beach, LLC, Fraisher, LLC, Top Tier Watersports. (Note to Counsel: The Summonses have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service.) (mab)
July 26, 2019 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons) (Sterbcow, Paul)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order, directing Clerk to seal #1 Complaint based on the reference to the minors; and ORDERING Plaintiffs to file a redacted, amended complaint that corrects the deficiencies as set forth in order by 7/31/2019. Signed by District Judge Terry F. Moorer on 07/23/2019. (mab)
July 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number AALSDC-2435613, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons) (Sterbcow, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Myers et al v. Top Tier Scooby, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Top Tier Scooby, LLC
Represented By: Arthur Grady Williams, IV
Represented By: Edward Barrett Hails
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Top Tier Watersports
Represented By: Arthur Grady Williams, IV
Represented By: Edward Barrett Hails
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fraisher, LLC
Represented By: Arthur Grady Williams, IV
Represented By: Edward Barrett Hails
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Top Tier Beach, LLC
Represented By: Arthur Grady Williams, IV
Represented By: Edward Barrett Hails
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dionne Meyers
Represented By: Paul M. Sterbcow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Meyers
Represented By: Paul M. Sterbcow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dionne Myers
Represented By: Paul M. Sterbcow
Represented By: R. Edward Massey, Jr.
Represented By: Beth Elster Abramson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Myers
Represented By: Paul M. Sterbcow
Represented By: R. Edward Massey, Jr.
Represented By: Beth Elster Abramson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?