Dan Bunkering (America) Inc. v. Epic Arapaho et al
Plaintiff: Dan Bunkering (America) Inc.
Defendant: Epic Companies, LLC, Epic Diving & Marine Services LLC and Epic Arapaho
Not Yet Classified: Global Maritime
Case Number: 1:2019cv00415
Filed: July 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Terry F Moorer
Referring Judge: P Bradley Murray
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2019 Filing 16 RETURN OF SERVICE of USM 285 served 7/26/2019 as to Epic Arapaho - Derrick Barge Vessel (meh)
August 2, 2019 Filing 15 CORRECTED RETURN OF SERVICE of USM-285 served 7/24/2019 as to EPIC ARAPAHO (skb)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Order CANCELLING #8 Writ of Arrest and DIRECTING Clerk to close case. This action has been dismissed without prejudice with each party to bear their own attorneys' fees and costs as set out. Signed by District Judge Terry F. Moorer on 07/26/2019. (srd)
July 26, 2019 Filing 13 RETURN OF SERVICE of USM-285 Vessel Arrest as to EPIC ARAPAHO Unexecuted. (skb)
July 26, 2019 REFERRAL OF #12 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal to Judge Moorer. (mab)
July 25, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Dan Bunkering (America) Inc. (Townsend, Neal)
July 24, 2019 Blank Disclosure Statement form e-mailed to Plaintiff Dan Bunkering (America) Inc.; Disclosure Statement Due 7/29/2019. (mab)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appoint Substitute Custodian Global Maritime as further set out. Signed by District Judge Terry F. Moorer on 7/23/19. Copy delivered to USM. (jlr)
July 23, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #9 Emergency MOTION to Appoint Substitute Custodian Referred to Judge Terry F. Moorer. (mab)
July 23, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Order by Dan Bunkering (America) Inc. re: #9 Emergency MOTION to Appoint Substitute Custodian (Townsend, Neal)
July 23, 2019 Filing 9 Emergency MOTION to Appoint Substitute Custodian filed by Dan Bunkering (America) Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration) (Townsend, Neal) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/23/2019: #2 Certificate of Insruance) (mab).
July 22, 2019 Filing 8 Warrant for Arrest of the Vessel Epic Arapaho issued to USM. (mab) Modified on 7/26/2019 (srd). CANCELLED.
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #3 Motion to Permit Cargo and Repair Operations and Movement of Vessel. Signed by District Judge Terry F. Moorer on 07/22/2019. (certified copy to USM) (mab)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER for Issuance of Warrant of Arrest, In Rem, granting #2 Motion for Issuance of Arrest Warrant. Signed by District Judge Terry F. Moorer on 07/22/2019. (certified copy to USM) (mab)
July 22, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Order by Dan Bunkering (America) Inc. re: #3 Emergency MOTION to Shift Vessel and/or Permit Movement (Townsend, Neal)
July 22, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Order by Dan Bunkering (America) Inc. re: #2 Emergency MOTION for Issuance of Arrest Warrant (Townsend, Neal)
July 22, 2019 Filing 3 Emergency MOTION to Shift Vessel and/or Permit Movement by Dan Bunkering (America) Inc.. (Townsend, Neal)
July 22, 2019 Filing 2 Emergency MOTION for Issuance of Arrest Warrant by Dan Bunkering (America) Inc.. (Townsend, Neal)
July 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Epic Arapaho, Epic Companies, LLC, Epic Diving & Marine Services LLC ( Filing fee $400 receipt number AALSDC-2435677, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Dan Bunkering (America) Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1, #2 Exhibit Ex. 2, #3 Exhibit Ex. 3, #4 Exhibit Ex. 4, #5 Exhibit Ex. 5) (Townsend, Neal)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dan Bunkering (America) Inc. v. Epic Arapaho et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dan Bunkering (America) Inc.
Represented By: Neal C. Townsend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Epic Companies, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Epic Diving & Marine Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Epic Arapaho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Global Maritime
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?