Young v. Credence Resource Management, LLC
Plaintiff: Lakeisha Young
Defendant: Credence Resource Management, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00418
Filed: July 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey U Beaverstock
Referring Judge: Bert W Milling
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:0045
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2019 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Credence Resource Management LLC on 9/11/19. Waiver of Service due by 10/11/2019. Certified Mail 70180680000106629226. (cmj)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and directing Clerk to serve Notice of Lawsuit and waiver via certified mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr on 9/10/19. (order and pro se guide mailed to plaintiff) (cmj)
September 4, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Lakeisha Young. Referred to Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr. (cmj) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/5/2019: #1 Letter from Dept of Veternas Affairs) (cmj).
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order denying #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Lakeisha Young. Plaintiff is granted leave to file another IFP by 9/27/19. ( IFP deadline set for 9/27/2019.). Signed by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr on 8/27/19. (Attachments: #1 IFP Motion) (copy of order and IFP mailed to plaintiff) (cmj)
July 23, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Lakeisha Young - Referred to Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr. (nah)
July 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Credence Resource Management, LLC, filed by Lakeisha Young. (nah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Young v. Credence Resource Management, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lakeisha Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credence Resource Management, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?