Robinson v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Plaintiff: Jamillah Robinson
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00419
Filed: July 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Katherine P Nelson
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER on #15 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. A review does not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require recusal in this action.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 09/05/2019. (Anthony, Porcha)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER entered Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/21/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 9/5/19. (Attachments: #1 consent) (srr)
September 4, 2019 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendants Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo & Company identifying Corporate Parent Wells Fargo & Company for Wells Fargo Bank, N.A... (Powell, James)
September 4, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Powell, James)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ENDORSED ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; Answer due from Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. on 9/5/2019.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 08/20/2019. (Anthony, Porcha)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ENDORSED ORDER granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 08/20/2019. (Anthony, Porcha)
August 14, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION and APPLICATION for James M. Powell to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney affirms that a certificate of good standing that complies with #S.D. Ala. GenLR 83.3(d) is attached. ( Filing fee $ 75, Receipt number AALSDC-2458541, Online Credit Card Payment) filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Powell, James)
August 14, 2019 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Powell, James)
July 31, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jamillah Robinson. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. served on 7/25/2019, answer due 8/15/2019 (Gomez, Octavio)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ENDORSED ORDER granting #2 MOTION for Octavio Gomez to Appear Pro Hac Vice for the Plaintiff, as supplemented #7 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 7/26/2019. (ctn)
July 25, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE by Jamillah Robinson of Filing Certificate of Good Standing (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Gomez, Octavio)
July 23, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Assignment to Magistrate Judge for trial. (Attachments: #1 request for reassignment) (srr)
July 23, 2019 Filing 5 Service Notice entered 7/23/2019. Plaintiff to notify the Court the action taken to effect service and the results thereof. Service deadline set to 9/6/2019. (srr)
July 23, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (srr)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order re: #2 MOTION and APPLICATION for Octavio Gomez to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Jamillah Robinson, the applicant is to supplement the present motion with a Federal Court certificate of good standing by 8/22/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 7/23/19. (srr)
July 23, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION and APPLICATION for Octavio Gomez to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney affirms that a certificate of good standing that complies with #S.D. Ala. GenLR 83.3(d) is attached. ( Filing fee $ 75, Receipt number AALSDC-2436217, Online Credit Card Payment) filed by Jamillah Robinson. (Attachments: #1 Additional Page Regarding question 5, #2 Certificate of Good Standing) (Gomez, Octavio)
July 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. ( Filing fee $400 receipt number AALSDC-2436209, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Jamillah Robinson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Gomez, Octavio)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robinson v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamillah Robinson
Represented By: Octavio Gomez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: James Marion Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?