State Of Alabama v. Shipwrecked Vessel believed to be the Schooner CLOTILDA
Plaintiff: State Of Alabama
Defendant: Shipwrecked Vessel believed to be the Schooner CLOTILDA
Not Yet Classified: Alabama Historical Commission
Case Number: 1:2019cv00423
Filed: July 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Kristi K DuBose
Referring Judge: Katherine P Nelson
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2019 Filing 14 Proof of Publication filed by Alabama Historical Commission, State Of Alabama. Last publication date August 28, 2019. (Kavanagh, John)
August 12, 2019 Filing 13 RETURN OF SERVICE of USM 285 served 8/9/2019 as to LAGNIAPPE (meh).
August 9, 2019 Filing 12 Remark: USMS confirmation of delivery re #11 NOTICE of Action in Rem and Arrest of Vessel (nah) (Main Document 12 replaced on 8/9/2019) (nah).
August 9, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Action in Rem and Arrest of Vessel (Copy to USM) (nah) (Main Document 11 replaced with corrected publication dates on 8/9/2019) (nah).
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Approve Notice and Authorize Publication of Same. Signed by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 08/08/2019. (nah)
August 7, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #9 MOTION to Direct Mode and Manner of Notice and Publication Thereof to Judge DuBose (nah)
August 7, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Direct Mode and Manner of Notice and Publication Thereof by Alabama Historical Commission, State Of Alabama. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice of Action in rem and Arrest of Vessel, #2 Text of Proposed Order Approving Notice and Publication) (Kavanagh, John)
August 2, 2019 Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE of USM-285 served 8/1/2019 as to USDC Southern District of Alabama (skb)
August 2, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE of USM-285 served 8/1/2019 as to USDC Southern District of Alabama (skb)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appoint Custodian. Alabama Historical Commission appointed. Signed by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 08/01/2019. (Copy to USM) (nah)
August 1, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #5 MOTION to Appoint Substitute Custodian to Judge DuBose (nah)
August 1, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Appoint Substitute Custodian by State Of Alabama. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Substitute Custodian, #2 Text of Proposed Order Appointing Substitute Custodian) (Kavanagh, John)
July 31, 2019 Filing 4 Admiralty Warrant Issued as to Shipwrecked Vessel believed to be the Schooner CLOTILDA. (Copies to USM) (nah) (Main Document 4 replaced on 7/31/2019) (nah). (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/1/2019: #1 USM Confirmation of Delivery) (nah).
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Issuance of Arrest Warrant. The Clerk shall issue a Warrant of Arrest as directed. Signed by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 07/31/2019. (nah)
July 31, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #2 MOTION for Issuance of Arrest Warrant to Judge DuBose (nah)
July 30, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Issuance of Arrest Warrant by State Of Alabama. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Artifact #11, Fastener with Hull Plank Fragment, #2 Exhibit B - Proposed Warrant for Arrest In Rem, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Order of Arrest) (Kavanagh, John)
July 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Shipwrecked Vessel believed to be the Schooner CLOTILDA ( Filing fee $400 receipt number AALSDC-2438968, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by State Of Alabama. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Kavanagh, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State Of Alabama v. Shipwrecked Vessel believed to be the Schooner CLOTILDA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shipwrecked Vessel believed to be the Schooner CLOTILDA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State Of Alabama
Represented By: Forrest S. Latta
Represented By: John P. Kavanagh, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Alabama Historical Commission
Represented By: John P. Kavanagh, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?