Inchcape Shipping Services, Inc. v. M/Y BRAMBLE et al
Plaintiff: Inchcape Shipping Services, Inc.
Defendant: M/Y BRAMBLE, Bramble Historic Epic Companies, LLC and Orinoco Natural Resources, LLC
Not Yet Classified: Global Maritime Security
Intervenor Plaintiff: JP's Marine Services, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00434
Filed: August 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Office: Mobile Office
Presiding Judge: Sonja F Bivins
Referring Judge: Terry F Moorer
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2019 Filing 24 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Inchcape Shipping Services, Inc.. Orinoco Natural Resources, LLC served on 9/23/2019, answer due 10/14/2019 (Kavanagh, John)
September 27, 2019 Filing 23 Admiralty Warrant Issued by Clerk re: Complaint for Intervention as to M/Y BRAMBLE, and delivered to USMS for service. (jlr)
September 26, 2019 Filing 22 Intervenor COMPLAINT against B/Y BRAMBLE & Orinoco Natural Resources, LLC filed by JP's Marine Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A) (Miller, M.) Modified on 9/26/2019 (tot).
September 23, 2019 Filing 21 Proof of Publication filed by Inchcape Shipping Services, Inc.. Last publication date September 18, 2019. (Kavanagh, John)
September 18, 2019 Filing 20 Summons Issued as to Orinoco Natural Resources, LLC. (Note to Counsel: The Summons has been issued. Please print copies necessary for service.) (mab)
September 17, 2019 Answer to Amended Complaint due from Bramble Historic Epic Companies, LLC pursuant to FRCP 15(a)(3). (mab)
September 17, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by Inchcape Shipping Services, Inc. (Kavanagh, John)
September 17, 2019 Filing 18 AMENDED COMPLAINT /First Amended Verified Complaint against Orinoco Natural Resources, LLC, filed by Inchcape Shipping Services, Inc.. (Kavanagh, John)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Order, GRANTING #16 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Verified Complaint, and directing Plaintiff to file amended complaint by 9/20/2019. Signed by District Judge Terry F. Moorer on 9/16/2019. (mab)
September 16, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #16 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Verified Complaint Referred to Judge Terry F. Moorer. (mab)
September 16, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Amend Complaint #1 Complaint, filed by Inchcape Shipping Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit First Amended Verified Complaint) (Kavanagh, John)
September 6, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Inchcape Shipping Services, Inc.. Bramble Historic Epic Companies, LLC served on 8/19/2019, answer due 9/9/2019 (Kavanagh, John)
August 28, 2019 Filing 14 USMS Confirmation of Delivery of #13 Order Approving Notice & Publication. Document delivered 8/28/19. (tot)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER APPROVING NOTICE AND PUBLICATION, Plf's #12 Motion to Approve Notice and Authorize Publication of Same is GRANTED. The form & content of the "Notice of Action In Rem and Arrest of Vessel" is aproved. Public notice of the action & arrest to be published in the Lagniappe for the following dates: 9/4, 9/11, 9/18/19. Signed by District Judge Terry F. Moorer on 8/2719. (Attachment: #1 Notice of Action in Rem and Arrest of Vessel) (2 certified copies of Order w/Notice hand-delivered to USMS on 8/28/19) (tot)
August 27, 2019 REFERRAL OF #12 MOTION to Approve Notice & Authorize Publication to Judge Moorer. (tot)
August 27, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Approve Notice and Authorize Publication of Same by Inchcape Shipping Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice of Action in Rem and Arrest of Vessel, #2 Text of Proposed Order Approving Notice and Publication) (Kavanagh, John) Modified on 8/28/2019 (tot).
August 27, 2019 Filing 11 RETURN OF SERVICE of USM 285 served 8/2/2019 as to Captain/MY Bramble @ Epic Shipyard (meh)
August 27, 2019 Filing 10 RETURN OF SERVICE of USM 285 served 8/2/2019 as to Global Maritime Security (meh)
August 16, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Bramble Historic Epic Companies, LLC. (NOTE TO COUNSEL: The Summons has been issued. Please print copies necessary for service.) (tot)
August 15, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by Inchcape Shipping Services, Inc. (Kavanagh, John)
August 9, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Plaintiff Inchcape Shipping Services, Inc.. (Kavanagh, John)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING #3 Motion to Appoint Substitute Custodian. Global Maritime Security appointed. Signed by District Judge Terry F. Moorer on 8/2/19. (tot) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/2/2019: #1 USMS Confirmation of Delivery) (tot).
August 2, 2019 Filing 5 Admiralty Warrant Issued as to M/Y BRAMBLE. (2 cert. copies hand-delivered to USMS on 8/2/19) (tot) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/2/2019: #1 USMS Confirmation of Delivery) (tot).
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion for Order of Arrest as set out. Signed by District Judge Terry F. Moorer on 8/2/19. (2 cert. copies hand-delivered to USMS on 8/2/19) (tot) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/2/2019: #1 USMS Confirmation of Delivery) (tot).
August 2, 2019 REFERRAL OF #3 MOTION to Appoint Substitute Custodian to Judge Moorer. (tot)
August 2, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Substitute Custodian by Inchcape Shipping Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of John Saltzman, #2 Text of Proposed Order Appointing Substitute Custodian) (Kavanagh, John)
August 2, 2019 REFERRAL OF #2 MOTION for Issuance of Arrest Warrant to Judge Moorer. (tot)
August 2, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Issuance of Arrest Warrant by Inchcape Shipping Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Order of Arrest, #2 Supplement Warrant for Arrest In Rem) (Kavanagh, John)
August 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bramble Historic Epic Companies, LLC, M/Y BRAMBLE ( Filing fee $400 receipt number AALSDC-2445084, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Inchcape Shipping Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Invoices) (Kavanagh, John) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/2/2019: #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (tot).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Inchcape Shipping Services, Inc. v. M/Y BRAMBLE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M/Y BRAMBLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bramble Historic Epic Companies, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orinoco Natural Resources, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Global Maritime Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Inchcape Shipping Services, Inc.
Represented By: John P. Kavanagh, Jr.
Represented By: Blake T. Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: JP's Marine Services, LLC
Represented By: M. Kathleen Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?