Blake Marine Group, LLC v. EPIC Alabama Recyclers, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Blake Marine Group, LLC
Defendant: NOBLE AMOS RUNNER and EPIC Alabama Recyclers, LLC
Not Yet Classified: U.S. Maritime Security
Case Number: 1:2019cv00468
Filed: August 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Sonja F Bivins
Referring Judge: Callie V S Granade
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 46:31341
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2019 REFERRAL OF #22 Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement to Judges Granade & Bivins. (tot)
September 30, 2019 Filing 22 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendants EPIC Alabama Recyclers, LLC, EPIC Alabama Shipyards LLC identifying Corporate Parent EPIC Alabama Shipyards LLC for EPIC Alabama Recyclers, LLC.. (Hurley, Grady)
September 24, 2019 Filing 21 Document endorsed NOTED by Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade: Corporate Disclosure Statement #20 filed by EPIC Alabama Recyclers, LLC (APG)
September 24, 2019 Filing 20 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendants EPIC Alabama Recyclers, LLC, Oakridge Energy Partners identifying Corporate Parent Oakridge Energy Partners for EPIC Alabama Recyclers, LLC.. (Hurley, Grady)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Endorsed Order GRANTING Dft EPIC Alabama Recyclers, LLC's #15 MOTION for Extension to Plead Without Prejudice. Answer due from EPIC Alabama Recyclers, LLC on or before 10/9/2019. Signed by Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 9/13/19. (tot)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ENDORSED ORDER granting Doc. #17 Motion for Grady S. Hurley to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 9/13/2019. (bld)
September 12, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #17 MOTION and APPLICATION for Grady S. Hurley to Appear Pro Hac Vice referred to Judge Sonja F. Bivins. (tot)
September 12, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION and APPLICATION for Grady S. Hurley to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney affirms that a certificate of good standing that complies with #S.D. Ala. GenLR 83.3(d) is attached. ( Filing fee $ 75, Receipt number AALSDC-2474889, Online Credit Card Payment) filed by EPIC Alabama Recyclers, LLC, NOBLE AMOS RUNNER. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Hurley, Grady)
September 11, 2019 Filing 16 Statement of Interest filed by EPIC Alabama Recyclers, LLC . (Attachments: #1 Verification and Declaration) (Rebarchak, James)
September 9, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #15 CLAIM & MOTION for Extension of Time to Plead Without Prejudice referred to Judge Sonja F. Bivins. (tot)
September 9, 2019 Filing 15 CLAIM and MOTION for Extension of Time to Plead Without Prejudice filed by EPIC Alabama Recyclers, LLC. (Attachment: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Rebarchak, James) Modified on 9/9/2019 (tot).
August 29, 2019 Filing 14 USMS Confirmation of Delivery of #13 Order for Publication of Notice of Action and Arrest. Document delivered 8/29/19. (tot)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER FOR PUBLICATION OF NOTICE OF ACTION AND ARREST, public notice of the action & arrest is to be given by the USM once a week for 3 consecutive weeks in the Press-Register for the following dates: 9/6, 9/13 & 9/20/19. Signed by Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 8/29/19. (Attachment: #1 Notice of Action Against and Arrest of Vessel) (2 cert. copies hand-delivered to the USMS on 8/29/19) (tot)
August 28, 2019 REFERRAL OF #12 MOTION to Order Publication of Action and Arrest to Judge Granade. (tot)
August 27, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Service by Publication by Blake Marine Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Notice of Action Against and Arrest of Vessel) (Crutchfield, Blane)
August 27, 2019 Filing 11 RETURN OF SERVICE of USM 285 served 8/9/2019 as to Noble Amos Runner, IMO No. 8756306 (meh)
August 27, 2019 Filing 10 RETURN OF SERVICE of USM 285 served 8/9/2019 as to Noble Amos Runner, IMO No. 8756306 (meh)
August 22, 2019 Answer due from EPIC Alabama Recyclers, LLC pursuant to FRCP 12(a) - See Doc. #9 . (tot)
August 22, 2019 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on EPIC Alabama Recyclers, LLC on 08/19/2019, filed by Blake Marine Group, LLC. (Stockman, Norman)
August 14, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to EPIC Alabama Recyclers, LLC. (NOTE TO COUNSEL: The Summons has been issued. Please print copies necessary for service.) (tot)
August 14, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by Blake Marine Group, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Summons) (Stockman, Norman)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER APPOINTING SUBSTITUTE CUSTODIAN, the USM shall surrender possession of the vessel NOBLE AMOS RUNNER to the Substitute Custodian as set out. U.S. Maritime Security is appointed as Substitute Custodian of said vessel as set out. All Marshal's costs to be paid prior to the release of the vessel. Signed by Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 8/8/19. (2 cert. copies hand-delivered to USMS on 8/8/19) (tot) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/9/2019: #1 USMS Confirmation of Delivery) (tot).
August 8, 2019 Filing 5 WARRANT of Arrest of Vessel issued as vessel NOBLE AMOS RUNNER. (2 cert. copies hand-delivered to USMS on 8/8/19) (tot) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/9/2019: #1 USMS Confirmation of Delivery) (tot).
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF ARREST re: Plf's #2 Motion for Issuance of Warrant of Arrest. Clerk is ORDERED to issue a Warrant of Arrest against the vessel NOBLE AMOS RUNNER as set out. Signed by Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 8/8/19. (2 cert. copies hand-delivered to USMS on 8/8/19) (tot) Modified on 8/8/2019 (tot). (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/9/2019: #1 USMS Confirmation of Delivery) (tot).
August 8, 2019 REFERRAL OF #3 MOTION to Appoint Substitute Custodian to Judge Granade. (tot)
August 8, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Substitute Custodian filed by Blake Marine Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Text of Proposed Order Order Appointing Substitute Custodian) (Stockman, Norman)
August 8, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Order of Arrest filed by Blake Marine Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order of Arrest, #2 Text of Proposed Order Warrant for Arrest) (Stockman, Norman)
August 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Verified) against EPIC Alabama Recyclers, LLC, NOBLE AMOS RUNNER ( Filing fee $400 receipt number AALSDC-2448327, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Blake Marine Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Stockman, Norman) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/9/2019: #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (tot).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blake Marine Group, LLC v. EPIC Alabama Recyclers, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blake Marine Group, LLC
Represented By: Blane H. Crutchfield
Represented By: Norman Matt Stockman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NOBLE AMOS RUNNER
Represented By: Grady S. Hurley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EPIC Alabama Recyclers, LLC
Represented By: Grady S. Hurley
Represented By: James Rebarchak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: U.S. Maritime Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?