Steiner Shipyard, Inc. v. M/V THE REVIVAL
Plaintiff: Steiner Shipyard, Inc.
Defendant: M/V THE REVIVAL, Spear Point Shipping, Ltd. and Edral Adams
Case Number: 1:2019cv00506
Filed: August 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Terry F Moorer
Referring Judge: Katherine P Nelson
Nature of Suit: Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2019 Filing 23 RETURN OF SERVICE of USM 285 served 9/3/2019 as to Mobile Press Register (meh)
September 6, 2019 Filing 22 RETURN OF SERVICE of USM 285 served 9/5/2019 as to Lagniappe (meh)
September 3, 2019 Filing 21 USMS Confirmation of Delivery of #20 Order for Publication of Notice of Action and Arrest (w/Notice attached). Document delivered 9/3/19. (tot)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER FOR PUBLICATION OF NOTICE OF ACTION AND ARREST, Plf's #17 Motion to Order Publication of Action and Arrest is GRANTED. The attached Notice is approved & is to be given to the USM for publication once a week for three consecutive weeks in the Press-Register on 9/6, 9/13 & 9/20/19, & the Lagniappe on 9/11, 9/18 & 9/25/19. Signed by District Judge Terry F. Moorer on 8/30/19. (Attachment: #1 Notice of Action Against and Arrest of Vessel) (tot) (hand-delivered cert. copy to USMS on 9/3/19) (Modified on 9/3/2019 (tot).
August 29, 2019 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Steiner Shipyard, Inc.. Edral Adams served on 8/26/2019, answer due 9/16/2019 (Crutchfield, Blane)
August 29, 2019 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Steiner Shipyard, Inc.. Spear Point Shipping, Ltd. served on 8/26/2019, answer due 9/16/2019 (Crutchfield, Blane)
August 28, 2019 REFERRAL OF #17 MOTION to Order Publication of Action & Arrest to Judge Moorer. (tot)
August 28, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Order Publication of Action and Arrest by Steiner Shipyard, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Notice of Action Against and Arrest of Vessel) (Crutchfield, Blane) Modified on 8/28/2019 (tot).
August 27, 2019 Filing 16 RETURN OF SERVICE of USM 285 served 8/13/2019 as to M/V The Revival (meh)
August 27, 2019 Filing 15 RETURN OF SERVICE of USM 285 served 8/13/2019 as to M/V The Revival (meh)
August 21, 2019 Filing 14 RETURN OF SERVICE of USM 285 served 8/13/2019 as to M/V The Revival (meh).
August 21, 2019 Filing 13 RETURN OF SERVICE of USM 285 served 8/13/2019 as to M/V The Revival (meh).
August 21, 2019 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to Edral Adams, Spear Point Shipping, Ltd. (NOTE TO COUNSEL: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service.) (tot)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT-ONLY ORDER on #9 Disclosure Statement filed by Steiner Shipyard, Inc. A review does not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require recusal in this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 8/20/2019. (ctn)
August 19, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by Steiner Shipyard, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons) (Crutchfield, Blane)
August 19, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Plaintiff Steiner Shipyard, Inc.. (Crutchfield, Blane)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT-ONLY ORDER: Steiner Shipyard, Inc. is ORDERED to file a disclosure statement in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 (applicable to "nongovernmental corporate" parties) and S.D. Ala. CivLR 7.1 (applicable to "[a]ll non-governmental artificial entities appearing as parties") no later than Fri. 8/23/2019 (form available at: https://www.alsd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms). Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 8/16/2019. (ctn)
August 9, 2019 Filing 7 USMS Confirmation of Delivery re: #4 Order of Arrest, #5 Warrant for Arrest of Vessel, & #6 Order Appointing Substitute Custodian. (tot)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER APPOINTING SUBSTITUTE CUSTODIAN re: #3 Motion to Appoint Substitute Custodian. The USM for the SDAL shall surrender possession of the vessel M/V THE REVIVAL to the Substitute Custodian as set out. Steiner Shipyard, Inc. is appointed as Substitute Custodian as set out. Signed by District Judge Terry F. Moorer on 8/9/19. (2 cert. copies hand-delivered to USMS on 8/9/19) (tot)
August 9, 2019 Filing 5 WARRANT for Arrest of Vessel issued as to M/V THE REVIVAL. (2 originals hand-delivered to USMS on 8/9/19) (tot)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF ARREST, Plf's #2 Motion for Issuance of Warrant of Arrest is GRANTED. The Clerk is ORDERED to issue a Warrant of Arrest against the M/V THE REVIVAL as set out. Signed by District Judge Terry F. Moorer on 8/9/19. (2 cert. copies hand-delivered to USMS on 8/9/19) (tot)
August 9, 2019 REFERRAL OF #3 MOTION to Appoint Substitute Custodian to Judge Moorer. (tot)
August 9, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Substitute Custodian by Steiner Shipyard, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Crutchfield, Blane)
August 9, 2019 REFERRAL OF #2 MOTION for Issuance of Warrant in rem to Judge Moorer. (tot)
August 9, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Issuance of Warrant in rem by Steiner Shipyard, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Warrant for Arrest of Vessel) (Crutchfield, Blane)
August 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against M/V THE REVIVAL ( Filing fee $400 receipt number AALSDC-2448856, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Steiner Shipyard, Inc.. (Crutchfield, Blane) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/9/2019: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (tot).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Steiner Shipyard, Inc. v. M/V THE REVIVAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M/V THE REVIVAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spear Point Shipping, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edral Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steiner Shipyard, Inc.
Represented By: Blane H. Crutchfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?