Jackson v. Saul
Plaintiff: Sylvia O. Jackson
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Case Number: 1:2019cv00524
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Katherine P Nelson
Referring Judge: William H Steele
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2019 Filing 7 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to Office of the Regional Chief Counsel. Acknowledgement filed by Sylvia O. Jackson. (Lassiter, Byron)
August 29, 2019 Filing 6 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to U.S. Attorney General. Acknowledgement filed by Sylvia O. Jackson. (Lassiter, Byron)
August 29, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sylvia O. Jackson. Andrew M. Saul served on 8/15/2019, answer due 11/13/2019. (Lassiter, Byron)
August 16, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Holly Lee Wiseman on behalf of Andrew M. Saul (Wiseman, Holly)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER entered; Answer due within 90 days after service; Plaintiff's Brief due 30 days thereafter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 08/13/2019. (srd)
August 13, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Andrew M. Saul, U.S. Attorney General & U.S. Attorney's Office. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (srd)
August 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew M. Saul ( Filing fee $400 receipt number AALSDC-2455795, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Sylvia O. Jackson. (Attachments: #1 Summons - U.S. Atty, #2 Summons - U.S. Atty General, #3 Summons - OGC) (Lassiter, Byron) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/13/2019: #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (srd).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Represented By: Holly Lee Wiseman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sylvia O. Jackson
Represented By: Byron A. Lassiter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?