Daw v. GA West
Plaintiff: Woodrow Daw
Defendant: GA West
Case Number: 1:2019cv00525
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: P Bradley Murray
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2019 Filing 12 Document endorsed NOTED by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray: A review of the Corporate Disclosure Statement #11 filed by Defendant G.A. West & Co., Inc. reveals no reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require disqualification or recusal in this action. (lto)
September 25, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant GA West. (Benton, Thomas)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER entered. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 11/7/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 9/24/2019. (eec)
September 23, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by GA West. (Hamilton, William)
September 19, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Hart Benton, III on behalf of GA West (Benton, Thomas)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ENDORSED ORDER granting #6 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading. Good cause having been shown for a brief extension, Defendant G.A. West & Co., Inc.'s responsive pleading is due on or before 9/23/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 9/10/19. (lto)
September 9, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, filed by GA West. (Hamilton, William)
September 9, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by William Craig Hamilton on behalf of GA West (Hamilton, William)
August 28, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Woodrow Daw. GA West served on 8/19/2019, answer due 9/9/2019 (Attachments: #1 Appendix Certified Mail Return) (Fonteneau, Kira)
August 15, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to GA West. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (eec)
August 15, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Assignment to Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray for trial. (eec)
August 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against GA West ( Filing fee $400 receipt number AALSDC-2458245, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Woodrow Daw. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Conflict Page, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B) (Fonteneau, Kira)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Daw v. GA West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Woodrow Daw
Represented By: Kira Yalon Fonteneau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GA West
Represented By: Thomas Hart Benton, III
Represented By: William Craig Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?