Kirksey v. Saul
Plaintiff: Debra A. Kirksey
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Case Number: 1:2019cv00526
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Sonja F Bivins
Referring Judge: William H Steele
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2019 Filing 10 RETURN OF SERVICE of summons and complaint served 8/26/19 as to USAG (cmj)
August 29, 2019 Filing 9 RETURN OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint served 8/26/2019 as to United States Attorney General (meh)
August 21, 2019 Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint served 8/19/2019 as to SSA (meh)
August 19, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by U.S. Attorney's Office. U.S. Attorney's Office served on 8/16/2019, answer due 11/14/2019. (srd)
August 19, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Holly Lee Wiseman on behalf of Andrew M. Saul (Wiseman, Holly)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER entered; Answer due within 90 days after service; Plaintiff's Brief due 30 days thereafter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 08/15/2019. (srd)
August 15, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Andrew M. Saul, U.S. Attorney General & U.S. Attorney's Office. (srd) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/15/2019: #1 Cert Mail Receipts) (srd).
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ENDORSED ORDER granting Doc. #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 8/14/2019. (bld)
August 14, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis - Referred to Judge Sonja F. Bivins. (tgw)
August 14, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Debra A. Kirksey. (Lassiter, Byron)
August 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew M. Saul ( IFP.), filed by Debra A. Kirksey. (Attachments: #1 Summons - U.S. Atty, #2 Summons - U.S. Atty General, #3 Summons - OGC) (Lassiter, Byron) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/14/2019: #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (tgw).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kirksey v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra A. Kirksey
Represented By: Byron A. Lassiter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Represented By: Holly Lee Wiseman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?