McLaurin et al v. The Terminix International Company, LP et al
Plaintiff: Ann McLaurin and Lynne Fitzgerald
Defendant: The Terminix International Company, LP and Terminix International, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00553
Filed: August 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey U Beaverstock
Referring Judge: Bert W Milling
2 Judge: William H Steele
Nature of Suit: Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
Cause of Action: 9:9
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2019 REFERRAL OF #17 Reply Brief, to Judge Beaverstock. (cmj)
September 27, 2019 Filing 17 REPLY Brief filed by Plaintiffs Lynne Fitzgerald, Ann McLaurin re: #14 MOTION to Confirm Arbitration Award and Enter Final Judgment, #16 Response to Motion Reply In Support of Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award and Entry of Judgment Thereon filed by Lynne Fitzgerald, Ann McLaurin. (Milam, Adam)
September 26, 2019 REFERRAL OF #16 Response to Motion to Judge Beaverstock. (cmj)
September 25, 2019 Filing 16 RESPONSE to Motion re: #14 MOTION to Confirm Arbitration Award and Enter Final Judgment filed by Terminix International, Inc., The Terminix International Company, LP. (Bell, Michael)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Order Setting Motion Deadline re: #14 MOTION to Confirm Arbitration Award and Enter Final Judgment filed by Ann McLaurin, Lynne Fitzgerald Responses due by 9/25/2019 Replies due by 10/2/2019. Signed by District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock on 9/11/19. (cmj)
September 11, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #14 MOTION to Confirm Arbitration Award and Enter Final Judgment to Judge Beaverstock (cmj)
September 10, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Confirm Arbitration Award and Enter Final Judgment filed by Lynne Fitzgerald, Ann McLaurin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Mandatory Arbitration Provision, #2 Exhibit 2 - Arbitration Award) (Milam, Adam)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER entered Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/21/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr on 9/6/19. (cmj)
September 6, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Haley Andrews Cox on behalf of Terminix International, Inc., The Terminix International Company, LP (Cox, Haley)
September 6, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, to Confirm Arbitration Award and Grant Final Judgment and Notice of Intention to File Motion to Vacate by Terminix International, Inc., The Terminix International Company, LP. (Bell, Michael)
August 26, 2019 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint 2nd Amended Affidavit of Service served on The Terminix International Company, LP on August 21, 2019, filed by Lynne Fitzgerald, Ann McLaurin. (Milam, Adam)
August 26, 2019 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint Amended Affidavit of Service served on The Terminix International, Inc. on August 21, 2019, filed by Lynne Fitzgerald, Ann McLaurin. (Milam, Adam)
August 26, 2019 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint AMENDED AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE served on Terminix International Inc. on August 21, 2019, filed by Lynne Fitzgerald, Ann McLaurin. (Milam, Adam)
August 26, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint served on Jennifer Lockwood / CT Corp. System on August 21, 2019, filed by Lynne Fitzgerald, Ann McLaurin. (Milam, Adam)
August 26, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint served on Jennifer Lockwood / CT Corp. System on August 21, 2019, filed by Lynne Fitzgerald, Ann McLaurin. (Milam, Adam)
August 19, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Terminix International, Inc. and The Terminix International Company, LP. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (srd)
August 19, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by Lynne Fitzgerald, Ann McLaurin (Milam, Adam)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Service Order entered 8/19/2019. Plaintiff to notify the Court the action taken to effect service and the results thereof. Service order deadline set to 9/30/2019. Signed by District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock on 08/19/2019. (srd) (Main Document 3 replaced on 8/19/2019) (srd).
August 16, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas F. Campbell on behalf of Lynne Fitzgerald, Ann McLaurin (Campbell, Thomas)
August 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT To Confirm Arbitration Award and Grant Final Judgment against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number CALSDC-2460306, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Arbitration Award) (Milam, Adam) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/19/2019: #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (srd).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McLaurin et al v. The Terminix International Company, LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ann McLaurin
Represented By: Adam Matthew Milam
Represented By: Thomas F. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynne Fitzgerald
Represented By: Adam Matthew Milam
Represented By: Thomas F. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Terminix International Company, LP
Represented By: Haley Andrews Cox
Represented By: Michael L. Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terminix International, Inc.
Represented By: Haley Andrews Cox
Represented By: Michael L. Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?