A.F. of L.-A.G.C. Building Trades Welfare Plan et al v. K. Power, Inc.
Plaintiff: Andy Mills, A.F. of L.-A.G.C. Building Trades Pension Plan, Allen Steadham, Robert Lee Bailey, Wayne Jennings, A.F. of L.-A.G.C. Building Trades Welfare Plan, Timothy Milller, International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 653, Allen Smith and Robert Lee Bailey, Jr.
Defendant: K. Power, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00559
Filed: August 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Sonja F Bivins
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER re: #8 Motion to Dismiss - Plaintiffs' claims against Defendant K. Power, Inc., are DISMISSED, without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 10/11/19. (mpp) Copies to counsel
October 11, 2019 MOTION REFERRED: #8 MOTION to Dismiss - Referred to Judge Sonja F. Bivins. (mpp)
October 11, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss filed by All Plaintiffs. (Loper, Thomas)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - Plaintiffs are hereby to SHOW CAUSE on or before October 15, 2019, why a request for entry of default has not been made; otherwise, the case will be dismissed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 10/2/19. (mpp) Copies to counsel
September 9, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 653, Andy Mills, Wayne Jennings, A.F. of L.-A.G.C. Building Trades Pension Plan, A.F. of L.-A.G.C. Building Trades Welfare Plan, Robert Lee Bailey, Jr, Timothy Milller. K. Power, Inc. served on 8/30/2019, answer due 9/20/2019 (Loper, Thomas)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Service Order entered 8/28/2019. Plaintiff to notify the Court the action taken to effect service and the results thereof. Service order deadline set to 10/4/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 8/28/19. (mpp) Copy to Pltf.
August 27, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to K. Power, Inc. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (srd)
August 22, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by All Plaintiffs (Loper, Thomas)
August 22, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Assignment to Magistrate Judge for trial. (Attachments: #1 Request for Reassignment Form) (mpp)
August 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Receipt number filing fee 400 receipt #AALSDC-2462138, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Loper, Thomas) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/27/2019: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (srd).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: A.F. of L.-A.G.C. Building Trades Welfare Plan et al v. K. Power, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andy Mills
Represented By: Kimberly C. Walker
Represented By: Thomas Matthew Loper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A.F. of L.-A.G.C. Building Trades Pension Plan
Represented By: Kimberly C. Walker
Represented By: Thomas Matthew Loper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allen Steadham
Represented By: Kimberly C. Walker
Represented By: Thomas Matthew Loper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Lee Bailey
Represented By: Kimberly C. Walker
Represented By: Thomas Matthew Loper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wayne Jennings
Represented By: Kimberly C. Walker
Represented By: Thomas Matthew Loper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A.F. of L.-A.G.C. Building Trades Welfare Plan
Represented By: Kimberly C. Walker
Represented By: Thomas Matthew Loper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Milller
Represented By: Kimberly C. Walker
Represented By: Thomas Matthew Loper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: International Union of Operating Engineers, Local 653
Represented By: Kimberly C. Walker
Represented By: Thomas Matthew Loper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allen Smith
Represented By: Kimberly C. Walker
Represented By: Thomas Matthew Loper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Lee Bailey, Jr.
Represented By: Kimberly C. Walker
Represented By: Thomas Matthew Loper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. Power, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?