Agee v. BP Exploration & Production, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: David Earl Agee, Jr.
Defendant: BP Exploration & Production Inc and BP America Production Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv00575
Filed: August 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: William E Cassady
Referring Judge: Terry F Moorer
2 Judge: P Bradley Murray
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 BELO Case Management Order. Signed by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 05/29/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Protective Order, # 2 HIPAA Protective Order, # 3 Authorization) (skb)
August 22, 2019 Filing 9 Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:19-cv-01246. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDERED that the instant matter is hereby TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Alabama. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 8/22/2019. (NEF: Sect J)(caa) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 8/22/2019.]
August 19, 2019 Filing 7 Statement by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc. Regarding Venue (Haycraft, Don) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 8/22/2019.]
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED THAT, no later than July 1, 2019, plaintiffs in the attached lists must provide full and complete initial disclosures. Failure to provide the disclosures by the above date will result in an order that plaintiffs and their counsel must appear in person before Judge Barbier to showcause why their cases should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute and/or pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.37(b)(2)(A)(v). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT, as to all of the listed cases in which plaintiffs produce full and complete disclosures in compliance with this order, the deadline by which the parties must submit their venue filing is extended to no later than July 31, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 6/4/19.(ko) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 8/22/2019.]
March 13, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc..Attorney Don Keller Haycraft added to party BP America Production Company(pty:dft), Attorney Don Keller Haycraft added to party BP Exploration & Production, Inc.(pty:dft).(Haycraft, Don) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 8/22/2019.]
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INITIAL PROCEEDINGS CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 1/30/2015. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 BELO Settlement Agreement)(as) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 8/22/2019.]
February 13, 2019 Filing 3 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Complaint. Filing attorney did not properly format the pdf of Civil Cover Sheet. The pdf should not have the purple boxes nor the 3 red buttons at the bottom. When using a FORM, fill in the applicable fields then click the red PRINT button at the bottom to print the document to pdf format. Clerk has taken corrective action. (mp) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 8/22/2019.]
February 11, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Carl Barbier and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (ess) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 8/22/2019.]
February 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7420550) filed by David Earl Agee, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Howard L. Nations added to party David Earl Agee, Jr(pty:pla).(Nations, Howard) (Attachment 1 replaced on 2/13/2019) (mp). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 8/22/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Agee v. BP Exploration & Production, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP Exploration & Production Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP America Production Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Earl Agee, Jr.
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?