Nutrien Ag Solutions, Inc. v. Dykes
Plaintiff: Nutrien Ag Solutions, Inc.
Defendant: Wayne Dykes
Case Number: 1:2019cv00578
Filed: August 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: P Bradley Murray
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER on #5 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Nutrien Ag Solutions, Inc. A review does not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require recusal in this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 9/9/2019. (eec)
September 6, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nutrien Ag Solutions, Inc.. Wayne Dykes served on 8/26/2019, answer due 9/16/2019 (McGinley, Robert)
September 6, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Plaintiffs Nutrien Ag Solutions, Inc., Nutrien Ltd. identifying Corporate Parent Nutrien Ltd. for Nutrien Ag Solutions, Inc... (McGinley, Robert)
August 26, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Wayne Dykes. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (eec)
August 26, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Assignment to Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray for trial. (eec)
August 23, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by Nutrien Ag Solutions, Inc. (Gaal, Richard)
August 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Wayne Dykes ( Filing fee $400 receipt number AALSDC-2464317, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Nutrien Ag Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EX 1 -Security Agreement, #2 Exhibit EX 2 - UCC Financing Statement, #3 Exhibit EX 3 - UCC-1F, #4 Exhibit EX 4 - Plaintiff's Demand Letter) (Gaal, Richard) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/26/2019: #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (eec).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nutrien Ag Solutions, Inc. v. Dykes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne Dykes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nutrien Ag Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Ransome Reese Hare
Represented By: Robert Ball McGinley, Jr.
Represented By: Richard M. Gaal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?