Hamton et al v. U.S. Customs & Border Protection
Plaintiff: Tomeka A. Hamton, Ali Hamton, Safi Hamton, Alli Safi and Tomeka A Hampton
Defendant: U.S. Customs & Border Protection
Case Number: 1:2019cv00588
Filed: August 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Bert W Milling
Referring Judge: William H Steele
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued to U.S. Attorney. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (cmj)
October 23, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Tomeka A Hampton, Alli Safi (Stallworth, Leston)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Service Order entered 9/9/2019. Plaintiff to notify the Court the action taken to effect service and the results thereof. Service order deadline set to 10/14/2019.. Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 9/9/19. (cmj)
September 9, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to U.S. Customs & Border Protection and U. S. Attorney General. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (cmj)
September 9, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Filing Summons. (Stallworth, Leston) Modified on 9/9/2019 (cmj).
August 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Safi Hamton ( Filing fee $400 receipt number AALSDC-2466271, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Stallworth, Leston) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/28/2019: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (cmj).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hamton et al v. U.S. Customs & Border Protection
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tomeka A. Hamton
Represented By: Leston Curtiss Stallworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ali Hamton
Represented By: Leston Curtiss Stallworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Safi Hamton
Represented By: Leston Curtiss Stallworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alli Safi
Represented By: Leston Curtiss Stallworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tomeka A Hampton
Represented By: Leston Curtiss Stallworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Customs & Border Protection
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?