Berges v. Walker et al
Plaintiff: Laurie Berges
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, Mississippi Farm Bureau Casualty Insurance Company and Kevin Walker
Case Number: 1:2019cv00604
Filed: September 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: P Bradley Murray
Referring Judge: William H Steele
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Withdraw (which the Court construes as a motion to remand). This action is remanded to the Circuit Court of Mobile County, Alabama. Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 9/17/19. (cmj)
September 13, 2019 REFERRAL OF #7 Response to Motion, #8 Response to Motion to Judge Steele. (cmj)
September 12, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE to Motion re: #5 MOTION to Withdraw #1 Notice of Removal, and Consent to Remand filed by Laurie Berges. (Moore, Frederick)
September 12, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE to Motion re: #5 MOTION to Withdraw #1 Notice of Removal, and Consent to Remand filed by Mississippi Farm Bureau Casualty Insurance Company. (Mullen, Harry)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Setting Motion Deadline re: #5 MOTION to Withdraw #1 Notice of Removal filed by Kevin Walker Responses due by 9/16/2019. Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 9/12/19. (cmj)
September 11, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #5 MOTION to Withdraw #1 Notice of Removal, and Consent to Remand to Judge Steele (cmj)
September 11, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Withdraw #1 Notice of Removal, and Consent to Remand filed by Kevin Walker. (Mudano, Mitchell)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by defendants why this action should not be remanded for lack of jurisdiction. Show Cause Response due by 9/12/2019. Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 9/5/19. (cmj)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER entered Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/21/2019.. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 9/4/19. (cmj)
September 4, 2019 Filing 2 Defendant's Answer and Affirmative Defenses ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Kevin Walker. (Cochran, J.)
September 4, 2019 Answer due from Mississippi Farm Bureau Casualty Insurance Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company and Kevin Walker pursuant to FRCP 12(a). (cmj)
September 3, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Kevin Walker from Circuit Court of Mobile County, case number 2019-901703. ( Filing fee $ 400, Receipt number AALSDC-2469284, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Kevin Walker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Cochran, J.) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/4/2019: #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (cmj).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Berges v. Walker et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Mark R. Ulmer
Represented By: Harry B. Mullen
Represented By: Mitchell Sebastian Mudano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mississippi Farm Bureau Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Mark R. Ulmer
Represented By: Harry B. Mullen
Represented By: Mitchell Sebastian Mudano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Walker
Represented By: Mark R. Ulmer
Represented By: Harry B. Mullen
Represented By: Mitchell Sebastian Mudano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laurie Berges
Represented By: Frederick James Moore, III
Represented By: Stephen Charles Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?