Draughter v. Alabama State Port Authority
Plaintiff: Phillip Draughter, Jr.
Defendant: Alabama State Port Authority
Case Number: 1:2019cv00609
Filed: September 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Phillip Draughter, Jr. Alabama State Port Authority served on 10/17/2019, answer due 11/7/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit US Postal Return Receipt Card) (Williams, Ronnie)
September 18, 2019 Filing 3 This action has been transferred from the docket of and is now assigned to the docket of TFM-M. To insure that your pleadings are referred to the proper Judge and Magistrate Judge with as little delay as possible, please use the letter suffix TFM-M after the case number on all future pleadings. (mpp)
September 5, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Alabama State Port Authority. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (srd)
September 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Alabama State Port Authority ( Filing fee $400 receipt number AALSDC-2470154, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Phillip Draughter, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EEOC Notice of Rights, #2 Exhibit Summons) (Williams, Ronnie) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/5/2019: #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (srd).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Draughter v. Alabama State Port Authority
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alabama State Port Authority
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phillip Draughter, Jr.
Represented By: Ronnie L. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?