In the matter of Fraisher, LLC et al
Petitioner: In the matter of Fraisher, LLC and Top Tier Watersport, LLC
Claimant: Dionne Myers and Brian Myers
Case Number: 1:2019cv00618
Filed: September 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Terry F Moorer
Referring Judge: P Bradley Murray
Nature of Suit: Marine
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING #7 Motion for Beth E. Abramson to Appear Pro Hac Vice as set out. Signed by District Judge Terry F. Moorer on 10/24/19. (tot)
October 8, 2019 REFERRAL OF #10 Notice of Filing Certificate of Good Standing to Judge Moorer. (tot)
October 8, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Filing Certificate of Good Standing by Brian Myers, Dionne Myers re: #7 MOTION and APPLICATION for Beth E. Abramson to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Sterbcow, Paul) Modified on 10/8/2019 (tot).
October 4, 2019 Filing 9 USMS Confirmation of Delivery of #8 Order w/Notice. Document delivered 10/4/19. (tot)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING Pet's #2 Motion for Interim Relief & for Entry of a Concorsus Order as set out. The Letter of Undertaking (Doc. #1 -3) is ACCEPTED & APPROVED. Further prosecution of any action or proceeding against Pets or their property is ENJOINED as set out. Notice shall be issued as set out. Pets are responsible for coordinating w/the USM as to publication dates. The Clerk shall issue notice as set out. Signed by District Judge Terry F. Moorer on 10/4/19. (Attachment: #1 Notice to Claimants of Complaint for Exoneration from or Limitation of Liability) (2 cert. copies hand-delivered to the USM on 10/4/19) (tot)
October 1, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION and APPLICATION for Beth E. Abramson to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney affirms that a certificate of good standing that complies with #S.D. Ala. GenLR 83.3(d) is attached. ( Filing fee $ 75, Receipt number AALSDC-2485526, Online Credit Card Payment) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Sterbcow, Paul)
September 23, 2019 Filing 6 CLAIM in Limitation by Brian Myers & Dionne Myers. (Sterbcow, Paul) Modified on 9/24/2019 (tot).
September 23, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint For Exoneration from or Limitation of Liability by Brian Myers & Dionne Myers. (Sterbcow, Paul) Modified on 9/24/2019 (tot).
September 9, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #2 MOTION Interim Relief and For Entry of a Concursus Order Referred to Judge Terry F. Moorer. (mab)
September 9, 2019 Filing 4 This action has been transferred from the docket of Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray and is now assigned to the docket of District Judge Terry F. Moorer. To insure that your pleadings are referred to the proper Judge and Magistrate Judge with as little delay as possible, please use the letter suffix TFM-MU after the case number on all future pleadings. (eec)
September 9, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #2 MOTION Interim Relief and For Entry of a Concursus Order. Referred to Judge P. Bradley Murray. (eec)
September 9, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Assignment to Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray for trial. (eec)
September 6, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION Interim Relief and For Entry of a Concursus Order filed by In the matter of Fraisher, LLC, Top Tier Watersport, LLC. (Hails, Edward)
September 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Exoneration from or Limitation of Liability ( Filing fee $400 Receipt Number AALSDC-2471400, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Top Tier Watersport, LLC, In the matter of Fraisher, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Release and Arb. Agmt, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Vessel Value, #3 Exhibit C - Executed Lou, #4 Exhibit D - Proposed Concursus Order, #5 Exhibit E - Proposed Notice to Claimants) (Hails, Edward)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In the matter of Fraisher, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: In the matter of Fraisher, LLC
Represented By: Edward Barrett Hails
Represented By: Arthur Grady Williams, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Top Tier Watersport, LLC
Represented By: Edward Barrett Hails
Represented By: Arthur Grady Williams, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Dionne Myers
Represented By: R. Edward Massey, Jr.
Represented By: Paul M. Sterbcow
Represented By: Beth Elster Abramson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Brian Myers
Represented By: R. Edward Massey, Jr.
Represented By: Paul M. Sterbcow
Represented By: Beth Elster Abramson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?