United States of America et al v. Nouryon Functional Chemicals LLC
Plaintiff: Alabama Department of Environmental Management, State Of Alabama and United States of America
Defendant: Nouryon Functional Chemicals LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00626
Filed: September 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Terry F Moorer
Referring Judge: Katherine P Nelson
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2019 REFERRAL OF #13 Unopposed MOTION to Enter Consent Decree & Memorandum in Support to Judge Moorer. (tot)
October 21, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Consent Decree filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Beers, James)
September 27, 2019 REFERRAL OF #11 Amended Corporate Disclosure Statement to Judge Moorer. (tot)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT-ONLY ORDER on #11 Amended Disclosure Statement filed by Nouryon Functional Chemicals LLC. A review does not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require recusal in this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 9/27/2019. (ctn)
September 26, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendants Nouryon Functional Chemicals LLC, Ignacio Garin, Sheryl Stokes and Donald A. Finlayson, Managers, Nouryon Chemicals LLC, Nouryon USA LLC, Nouryon US Holdings 1 Inc., Nouryon US Holdings 2 Inc., Nouryon US Holdings 3 Inc., Nouryon US Holdings 4 Inc., Nouryon US Holdings 5 Inc., Nouryon US Holdings 6 Inc., Nouryon US Holdings 7 Inc., Nouryon US Holdings 8 Inc., Nouryon US Holdings 9 Inc., Nouryon Surface Chemistry LLC, Nouryon Pulp and Performance Chemicals LLC, Nouryon Salt LLC, Filtrol Corporation, Fort Amanda Specialties LLC identifying Corporate Parent Nouryon Chemicals LLC, Other Affiliate Fort Amanda Specialties LLC, Other Affiliate Nouryon Surface Chemistry LLC, Other Affiliate Nouryon Pulp and Performance Chemicals LLC, Other Affiliate Nouryon Salt LLC, Other Affiliate Filtrol Corporation, Other Affiliate Ignacio Garin, Sheryl Stokes and Donald A. Finlayson, Managers, Other Affiliate Nouryon USA LLC, Other Affiliate Nouryon US Holdings 1 Inc., Other Affiliate Nouryon US Holdings 2 Inc., Other Affiliate Nouryon US Holdings 3 Inc., Other Affiliate Nouryon US Holdings 4 Inc., Other Affiliate Nouryon US Holdings 5 Inc., Other Affiliate Nouryon US Holdings 6 Inc., Other Affiliate Nouryon US Holdings 7 Inc., Other Affiliate Nouryon US Holdings 8 Inc., Other Affiliate Nouryon US Holdings 9 Inc. for Nouryon Functional Chemicals LLC.. (Boyd, Eric)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order, Dft is to re-file a corporate disclosure statement NLT 9/27/2019 listing members of the Dft LLC as set out. Signed by District Judge Terry F. Moorer on 9/25/19. (tot)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT-ONLY ORDER on #8 Disclosure Statement filed by Nouryon Functional Chemicals LLC. A review does not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require recusal in this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 9/20/2019. (ctn)
September 19, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendants Nouryon Functional Chemicals LLC, Nouryon Chemicals LLC, Fort Amanda Specialties LLC, Ignacio Garin, Sheryl Stokes and Donald A. Finlayson, Managers, Nouryon Surface Chemistry LLC, Nouryon Pulp and Performance Chemicals LLC, Nouryon Salt LLC, Filtrol Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Nouryon Chemicals LLC, Corporate Parent Nouryon Pulp and Performance Chemicals LLC, Other Affiliate Fort Amanda Specialties LLC, Other Affiliate Nouryon Surface Chemistry LLC, Other Affiliate Nouryon Salt LLC, Other Affiliate Filtrol Corporation, Other Affiliate Ignacio Garin, Sheryl Stokes and Donald A. Finlayson, Managers for Nouryon Functional Chemicals LLC.. (Boyd, Eric)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as set out. Signed by District Judge Terry F. Moorer on 9/13/19. (tot)
September 12, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven Shawn Sibley filed by Alabama Department of Environmental Management, State Of Alabama. (Sibley, Steven) Modified on 9/12/2019 (tot).
September 12, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Patricia Nicole Beyer on behalf of United States of America (Beyer, Patricia)
September 12, 2019 Filing 4 Blank Disclosure Statement Form E-Mailed to Counsel for Defendant Nouryon Functional Chemicals LLC; Disclosure Statement Due 9/19/2019. Please list members of LLC. (tot)
September 12, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #3 MOTION and APPLICATION for Eric E. Boyd to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney affirms that a certificate of good standing that complies with #S.D. Ala. Gen Referred to Judge Terry F. Moorer. (mab)
September 11, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION and APPLICATION for Eric E. Boyd to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney affirms that a certificate of good standing that complies with #S.D. Ala. GenLR 83.3(d) is attached. ( Filing fee $ 75, Receipt number AALSDC-2473819, Online Credit Card Payment) filed by Nouryon Functional Chemicals LLC. (Boyd, Eric)
September 10, 2019 REFERRAL OF #2 Notice of Settlement/Lodging of Consent Decree to Judge Moorer. (mab)
September 10, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Settlement by United States of America (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Consent Decree) (Beers, James)
September 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nouryon Functional Chemicals LLC, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Beers, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America et al v. Nouryon Functional Chemicals LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alabama Department of Environmental Management
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State Of Alabama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: James W. Beers, Jr.
Represented By: Patricia Nicole Beyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nouryon Functional Chemicals LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?