Grow v. Transamerica Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Hercilia H. Grow
Defendant: Transamerica Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv00630
Filed: September 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: William E Cassady
Referring Judge: Kristi K DuBose
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order re: #3 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Hercilia H. Grow, #7 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting filed by Hercilia H. Grow, ( Motion Hearing and Scheduling Conference set for 11/19/2019 02:30 PM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 3A, 155 St. Joseph Street, Mobile, AL 36602 before Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady.). Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 10/30/3019. (eec)
October 29, 2019 REFERRAL OF #8 Response in Opposition to Motion to Remand to Judge Cassady. (nah)
October 29, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE in Opposition re #3 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Transamerica Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Declaration of Lance Cary)) (Latta, Forrest)
October 29, 2019 REFERRAL OF #7 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting to Judge Cassady. (nah)
October 28, 2019 Filing 7 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (Grow, Winston)
October 28, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Taylor Barr Johnson on behalf of Transamerica Life Insurance Company (Johnson, Taylor)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ENDORSED ORDER taking under advisement #3 Motion to Remand to State Court; taking under advisement #4 Motion to Supplement. Any response to these motions by the removing party shall be filed not later than October 30, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 10/16/19. (Cassady, William)
October 11, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #4 MOTION to Supplement and Amend to Motion to Remand for An Award of Attorney's Fees Referred to Judge William E. Cassady. (nah)
October 11, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Supplement and Amend to Motion to Remand for An Award of Attorney's Fees filed by Hercilia H. Grow. (Grow, Winston)
October 11, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #3 MOTION to Remand to State Court Referred to Judge William E. Cassady. (nah)
October 10, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Hercilia H. Grow. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit Exhibit 15) (Grow, Winston)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER entered. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/28/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 09/13/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (nah)
September 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Transamerica Life Insurance Company from Mobile County Circuit Court, case number CV-2018-902419. ( Filing fee $ 400, Receipt number AALSDC-2474283, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Transamerica Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (state court file), #2 Exhibit B (email), #3 Exhibit C (email), #4 Exhibit D (email), #5 Exhibit E (email), #6 Exhibit F (Walker depo), #7 Exhibit G (hrng tran), #8 Exhibit H (discovery resp)) (Latta, Forrest) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/13/2019: #9 Civil Cover Sheet) (nah).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grow v. Transamerica Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hercilia H. Grow
Represented By: Gregory Edward Vaughan
Represented By: John Grow, II
Represented By: Winston R. Grow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transamerica Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Chris Burkhalter
Represented By: Forrest S. Latta
Represented By: Taylor Barr Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?