In The Matter of the Complaint of Thomas J. Holt, as Owner of a 2005 30' BAHA Cruisers 300GLE "Pam's Competition II" bearing Hull Identification Number VBH01628E505
Plaintiff: Thomas J. Holt
Case Number: 1:2019cv00634
Filed: September 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey U Beaverstock
Referring Judge: P Bradley Murray
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Approving Stipulation of Value and Costs, directing issuance of notice, and restraining suits. Filing of claims due 12/6/2019.. Signed by District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock on 10/24/19. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Notice to Claimants) (cmj)
October 23, 2019 REFERRAL OF #3 Ad Interim Stipulation to Judge Beaverstock. (cmj)
October 23, 2019 Filing 3 AD INTERIM STIPULATION Amended to Correct Scrivners Error filed by Thomas J. Holt (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Palmer, Brentt)
September 16, 2019 REFERRAL OF #2 Ad Interim Stipulation to Judge Beaverstock. (tgw)
September 13, 2019 Filing 2 AD INTERIM STIPULATION filed by Thomas J. Holt (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Letter of Undertaking) (Palmer, Brentt)
September 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Exoneration from or Limitation of Liability ( Filing fee $400 Receipt Number AALSDC-2476161, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Thomas J. Holt. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Palmer, Brentt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In The Matter of the Complaint of Thomas J. Holt, as Owner of a 2005 30' BAHA Cruisers 300GLE "Pam's Competition II" bearing Hull Identification Number VBH01628E505
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas J. Holt
Represented By: Brentt Earl Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?