Harris v. Housing Authority of City of Prichard
Plaintiff: Lafaye Harris
Defendant: Housing Authority of City of Prichard
Case Number: 1:2019cv00643
Filed: September 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Callie V S Granade
Referring Judge: Bert W Milling
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ENDORSED ORDER granting #8 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; Answer or other response to the complaint due from Housing Authority of City of Prichard not later than 11/19/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr on 11/13/2019. (Milling, Bert)
November 12, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Referred to Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr. (mab)
November 12, 2019 Filing 9 Document endorsed NOTED by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr: Corporate Disclosure Statement #7 filed by Housing Authority of City of Prichard (Milling, Bert)
November 12, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Housing Authority of City of Prichard. (Frederick, Brandi)
November 12, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Housing Authority of City of Prichard. (Frederick, Brandi)
November 12, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard W. Lewis on behalf of Housing Authority of City of Prichard (Lewis, Richard)
October 24, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lafaye Harris. Housing Authority of City of Prichard served on 10/22/2019, answer due 11/12/2019 (srd)
October 18, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Housing Authority of City of Prichard via certified mail. (mab) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/21/2019: #1 Certified Mail Receipt) (mab).
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER, GRANTING #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed without Prepayment of Fees, and directing Clerk to serve Defendant. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr. on 10/17/2019. (copy to Pltf's cnsl) (mab)
September 17, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Referred to Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr. (mab)
September 16, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Lafaye Harris. (Jaffree, Ishmael)
September 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Housing Authority of City of Prichard ( IFP.), filed by Lafaye Harris. (Jaffree, Ishmael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris v. Housing Authority of City of Prichard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lafaye Harris
Represented By: Ishmael Jaffree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Housing Authority of City of Prichard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?