Dickinson v. Mobile County, Alabama et al
Plaintiff: Joshua Dickinson
Defendant: Noah Price "Trey&quot Oliver, III, Sam Cochran and Mobile County, Alabama
Case Number: 1:2019cv00706
Filed: September 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey U Beaverstock
Referring Judge: Sonja F Bivins
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2019 REFERRAL OF #30 Amended Complaint to Judge Beaverstock. (cmj)
November 12, 2019 Filing 30 AMENDED COMPLAINT Second Amended Complaint against All Defendants, filed by Joshua Dickinson. (Brewster, Henry)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #24 Motion to Amend Complaint. The Amended Complaint is due by 11/15/19. Defendants shall file a response by 11/29/19. The Motion to Dismiss #17 is moot. Signed by District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock on 11/12/19. (mbp)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ENDORSED ORDER denying without prejudice Plaintiff's Motion for Expedited Discovery #15 for the reasons stated on the record during the conference conducted via telephone on November 8, 2019. As discussed during the telephone conference, Plaintiff's counsel shall seek the requested discovery through the avenues available under the Alabama Open Records Act no later than November 12, 2019. Defendants Sheriff Sam Cochran and Warden Noah Oliver are directed to tender a response to said request no later than November 27, 2019. To the extent necessary, Plaintiff is granted leave to renew his request no later than December 2, 2019. If Plaintiff renews his request, he shall set forth the efforts undertaken by him and/or his counsel to obtain the requested information.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 11/8/2019. (Bivins, Sonja)
November 8, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Aubrey Patrick Dungan on behalf of Mobile County, Alabama (Dungan, Aubrey)
November 8, 2019 REFERRAL OF #25 Response in Opposition to Motion to Judge Bivins. (cmj)
November 8, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins: Telephone Conference held on 11/8/2019. Court rules on pending motion - order to follow.DCR Digital Audio Recording. (mpp)
November 7, 2019 Filing 25 RESPONSE in Opposition re #15 MOTION to Expedite Discovery and Preserve Evidence filed by Sam Cochran, Noah Price "Trey" Oliver, III. (Linder, Michael)
November 7, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION to Amend Complaint #2 Amended Complaint filed by Joshua Dickinson. (Brewster, Henry)
November 7, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits to Plaintiff's Motion to Amend Complaint by Joshua Dickinson (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Brewster, Henry)
November 7, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #24 MOTION to Amend Complaint #2 Amended Complaint; ref to Judge Beaverstock (cmj)
November 7, 2019 REFERRAL OF #23 Notice of Filing Exhibits to Judge Beaverstock. (cmj)
November 4, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Jay M. Ross on behalf of Mobile County, Alabama (Ross, Jay)
November 1, 2019 Filing 21 Brief filed by Joshua Dickinson re #15 MOTION to Expedite Discovery and Preserve Evidence in Support filed by Joshua Dickinson. (Brewster, Henry)
November 1, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits to Plaintiff's Brief in Support of his Motion to Expedite Discovery and Document Preservation by Joshua Dickinson (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Brewster, Henry)
November 1, 2019 REFERRAL OF #21 Brief, #20 Notice of Filing Exhibits to Judge Bivins. (cmj)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Order Setting Motion Deadline re: #17 Motion to Dismiss and Brief filed by Sam Cochran, Noah Price "Trey" Oliver, III. Responses due by 11/12/2019 Replies due by 11/19/2019. Motion to be taken under submission on 11/20/2019.. Signed by District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock on 10/30/19. (cmj)
October 30, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Mark Linder, Jr on behalf of Sam Cochran, Noah Price "Trey" Oliver, III (Linder, Michael)
October 29, 2019 Filing 17 Brief filed by Sam Cochran, Noah Price "Trey" Oliver, III and Motion to Dismiss. (Carbo, K.)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ENDORSED ORDER deferring ruling on Plaintiff's Motion to Expedite Discovery #15 . Pursuant to S.D. Ala Civ LR 7, Plaintiff is directed to file a brief citing legal authority for the relief requested. Said brief is to be filed by November 1, 2019. Any response in opposition shall be filed no later than November 7, 2019. This action is hereby set for a telephone conference before the undersigned Magistrate Judge on November 8, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. Call-in information will be sent to counsel via email. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 10/29/2019. (Bivins, Sonja)
October 29, 2019 Set Telephone Conference for 11/8/2019 10:00 AM with Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins. Call in information will be sent via email. (cmj)
October 29, 2019 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Noah Price "Trey" Oliver, III (see image at doc. 17); ref to Judge Beaverstock (cmj)
October 29, 2019 REFERRAL OF #14 Notice of Filing Exhibits to Judge Bivins. (cmj)
October 29, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #15 MOTION to Expedite Discovery and Preserve Evidence Referred to Judge Sonja F. Bivins. (cmj)
October 29, 2019 REFERRAL OF #17 Brief to Judge Beaverstock. (cmj)
October 28, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Expedite Discovery and Preserve Evidence filed by Joshua Dickinson. (Brewster, Henry)
October 28, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits to Plaintiff's Motion for Expedited Discovery and Preservation of Documents by Joshua Dickinson (Brewster, Henry)
October 18, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Neal C. Townsend on behalf of Mobile County, Alabama (Townsend, Neal)
October 18, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Henry F. Sherrod, III on behalf of Joshua Dickinson (Sherrod, Henry)
October 17, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by K. Paul Carbo, Jr on behalf of Sam Cochran, Noah Price "Trey" Oliver, III (Carbo, K.)
October 16, 2019 Filing 10 This action has been transferred from the docket of Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins and is now assigned to the docket of District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock and Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins. To insure that your pleadings are referred to the proper Judge and Magistrate Judge with as little delay as possible, please use the letter suffix JB-B after the case number on all future pleadings. (mpp)
October 11, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joshua Dickinson. Noah Price "Trey" Oliver, III served on 10/7/2019, answer due 10/28/2019 (Brewster, Henry)
October 11, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joshua Dickinson. Mobile County, Alabama served on 9/30/2019, answer due 10/21/2019 (Brewster, Henry)
October 11, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joshua Dickinson. Sam Cochran served on 9/30/2019, answer due 10/21/2019 (Brewster, Henry)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Service Order entered 9/27/2019. Plaintiff to notify the Court the action taken to effect service and the results thereof. Service order deadline set to 11/8/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 9/27/19. (mpp) Copies to counsel
September 27, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Sam Cochran, Mobile County, Alabama, Noah Price "Trey" Oliver, III. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (mpp)
September 26, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by Joshua Dickinson (Brewster, Henry)
September 26, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Assignment to Magistrate Judge for trial. (Attachments: #1 Request for Reassignment Form) (mpp) Copy to Pltf
September 25, 2019 Filing 2 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Sam Cochran, Mobile County, Alabama, Noah Price "Trey" Oliver, III, filed by Joshua Dickinson. (Brewster, Henry)
September 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Sam Cochran, Mobile County, Alabama, Noah Price "Trey" Oliver, III ( Filing fee $400 receipt number AALSDC-2481888, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Joshua Dickinson. (Brewster, Henry) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/27/2019: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (mpp).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dickinson v. Mobile County, Alabama et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noah Price "Trey&quot Oliver, III
Represented By: K. Paul Carbo, Jr.
Represented By: Michael Mark Linder, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sam Cochran
Represented By: K. Paul Carbo, Jr.
Represented By: Michael Mark Linder, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mobile County, Alabama
Represented By: Aubrey Patrick Dungan
Represented By: Neal C. Townsend
Represented By: Jay M. Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Dickinson
Represented By: Henry H. Brewster
Represented By: Henry F. Sherrod, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?