Bradford v. Comerica Bank
Plaintiff: Eddie Bradford
Defendant: Comerica Bank
Case Number: 1:2019cv00708
Filed: September 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: P Bradley Murray
Referring Judge: William H Steele
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1693ef
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice pursuant to Notice of Dismissal. Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 10/24/19. (cmj)
October 23, 2019 REFERRAL OF #5 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal to Judge Steele. (cmj)
October 23, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Eddie Bradford (Crump, Judson)
October 4, 2019 Return of Service Executed Comerica Bank served on 10/2/2019, answer due 10/23/2019. (See image at doc. 4) (cmj)
October 4, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Eddie Bradford re #3 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint, (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (Crump, Judson)
September 27, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Comerica Bank. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (cmj)
September 27, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by Eddie Bradford (Crump, Judson)
September 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Comerica Bank ( Filing fee $400 receipt number AALSDC-2482456, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Eddie Bradford. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C) (Crump, Judson) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/26/2019: #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (cmj).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bradford v. Comerica Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eddie Bradford
Represented By: Judson Eric Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Comerica Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?