Caufield v. Comenity Capital Bank
Plaintiff: James E. Caufield and James M. Caufield
Defendant: Comenity Capital Bank
Case Number: 1:2019cv00732
Filed: October 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Sonja F Bivins
Referring Judge: Callie V S Granade
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1666
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by James M. Caufield. Comenity Capital Bank served on 10/8/2019, answer due 10/29/2019 (Riemer, Kenneth)
October 2, 2019 Filing 4 Service Notice entered 10/2/2019. Plaintiff to notify the Court the action taken to effect service and the results thereof. Service order deadline set to 11/15/2019. (tot)
October 2, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Comenity Capital Bank. (NOTE TO COUNSEL: The Summons has been issued. Please print copies necessary for service.) (tot)
October 1, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by James E. Caufield (Riemer, Kenneth)
October 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Comenity Capital Bank ( Filing fee $400 receipt number AALSDC-2485669, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by James M. Caufield. (Riemer, Kenneth) Modified on 10/2/2019 (tot). (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/2/2019: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (tot).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Caufield v. Comenity Capital Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James E. Caufield
Represented By: Kenneth J. Riemer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James M. Caufield
Represented By: Kenneth J. Riemer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Comenity Capital Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?