Silverstein v. Weather Shield Mfg., Inc.
Plaintiff: Jerry Silverstein
Defendant: Weather Shield Mfg., Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00735
Filed: October 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Kristi K DuBose
Referring Judge: Katherine P Nelson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2019 REFERRAL OF #14 Reply Brief to Judge Nelson. (nah)
November 27, 2019 Filing 14 REPLY Brief filed by Plaintiff Jerry Silverstein re: #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Jerry Silverstein. (Holifield, Jennifer)
November 20, 2019 REFERRAL OF #13 Response in Opposition to Motion to Remand to Judge Nelson. (nah)
November 20, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Weather Shield Mfg., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit) (Jester, William)
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Order Setting Motion Deadline re: #8 MOTION to Remand. Defendant is ORDERED to respond by 11/20/2019. Plaintiff is ORDERED to reply to the response by 11/27/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 11/06/2019. (nah)
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ENDORSED ORDER granting in part [7, 9] Motion to Suspend Scheduling Order as follows: The Preliminary Scheduling Order is VACATED. The Court will enter a new preliminary scheduling order in due course, if appropriate, after disposition of the motion to remand (doc. 8). Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 11/6/2019. (Anthony, Porcha)
November 1, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #3 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Jerry Silverstein. (Holifield, Jennifer)
October 25, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #7 MOTION to Suspend Scheduling Order, #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court, #9 Amended MOTION to Suspend Scheduling Order - Referred to Judge Katherine P. Nelson. (nah)
October 25, 2019 Filing 9 Amended MOTION Motion to Suspend Scheduling Order filed by Jerry Silverstein. (Holifield, Jennifer)
October 25, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Jerry Silverstein. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Holifield, Jennifer)
October 25, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION Motion to Suspend Scheduling Order filed by Jerry Silverstein. (Holifield, Jennifer)
October 18, 2019 Filing 6 Document endorsed NOTED by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose: Corporate Disclosure Statement #2 filed by Weather Shield Mfg., Inc., Corporate Disclosure Statement #5 filed by Weather Shield Mfg., Inc. Review of the corporate disclosure statements pursuant to S.D. Ala. Civ. L.R. 7.1 has been completed. The review did not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest, which would require disqualification or recusal in this action. (khc)
October 16, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Weather Shield Mfg., Inc.. (Jester, William)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER entered. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 11/15/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 10/02/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (nah)
October 1, 2019 Filing 3 Weather Shield's ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Plaintiff against Jerry Silverstein by Weather Shield Mfg., Inc.. (Jester, William)
October 1, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Weather Shield Mfg., Inc.. (Jester, William)
October 1, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Weather Shield Mfg., Inc. from Circuit Civil Court, case number 02-cv-2019-900737. ( Filing fee $ 400, Receipt number AALSDC-2485876, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Weather Shield Mfg., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit) (Jester, William) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/2/2019: #6 Civil Cover Sheet) (nah).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Silverstein v. Weather Shield Mfg., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weather Shield Mfg., Inc.
Represented By: William David Jester
Represented By: Alexis Leigh Cham Kessler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Silverstein
Represented By: Jennifer S. Holifield
Represented By: Jerome E. Speegle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?