Coker v. Instant Checkmate, LLC. et al
Plaintiff: Stephen Dixon Coker, Jr.
Defendant: Truthfinder, LLC., Instant Checkmate, Inc., Instant Checkmate, LLC. and Truthfinder, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00736
Filed: October 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Sonja F Bivins
Referring Judge: Terry F Moorer
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER, GRANTING #12 Plaintiff's Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time for Plaintiff to respond to Defendants' #10 Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay or Dismiss Proceedings and #11 Alternative Motion to Dismiss. Responses due by 12/3/2019. Replies due by 12/17/2019. Motions to be taken under submission on 12/17/2019.. Signed by District Judge Terry F. Moorer on 11/14/2019. (mab)
November 13, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #12 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time for Plaintiff to respond to Defendants Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay or Dismiss Proceedings Referred to Judge Terry F. Moorer. (mab)
November 12, 2019 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time for Plaintiff to respond to Defendants Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay or Dismiss Proceedings filed by Stephen Dixon Coker, Jr. (Riemer, Kenneth)
November 1, 2019 REFERRAL OF #10 MOTION to Compel Arbitration & MOTION Stay or Dismiss Proceedings, #11 Alternative MOTION to Dismiss to Judge Moorer. (tot)
October 31, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss Alternative Motion to Dismiss filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3) (Moon, Stacy)
October 31, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Compel Arbitration & MOTION to Stay or Dismiss Proceedings filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Andrew Johnson, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B) (Moon, Stacy). (Added MOTION to Stay, MOTION to Dismiss on 11/1/2019) (tot).
October 11, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE by All Defendants re #7 Notice of Removal, Notice of Amended Notice of Removal (Eason, Leslie)
October 11, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendants Instant Checkmate, Inc., Instant Checkmate, LLC., Truthfinder, Inc., Truthfinder, LLC.. (Eason, Leslie)
October 11, 2019 Filing 7 Amended NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Circuit Court of Mobile County Alabama, case number 02-CV-902479.00. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A) (Eason, Leslie) Modified on 11/4/2019 (tot).
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT-ONLY ORDER: Defendants' #5 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File an Answer is GRANTED. Defendants may file an answer or other response no later than Thursday, October 31, 2019. Signed by District Judge Terry F. Moorer on 10/10/19. (tot)
October 9, 2019 REFERRAL OF #5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Judge Moorer. (tot)
October 9, 2019 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Motion for Extension of Time filed by All Defendants. (Eason, Leslie)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order DIRECTING Defendants to amend #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Truthfinder, Inc., Instant Checkmate, LLC., Truthfinder, LLC., Instant Checkmate, Inc. on or before 10/22/2019 as set out. Signed by District Judge Terry F. Moorer on 10/08/2019. (srd)
October 4, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by All Defendants re #1 Notice of Removal, Notice of Notice of Removal (Eason, Leslie)
October 4, 2019 Filing 2 Blank Disclosure Statement Form E-Mailed to Counsel for Defendants Instant Checkmate, Inc., Instant Checkmate, LLC., Truthfinder, Inc., Truthfinder, LLC.; Disclosure Statements Due 10/11/2019. Please list members of LLC. (tot)
October 3, 2019 Answer due from Instant Checkmate, Inc., Instant Checkmate, LLC., Truthfinder, Inc., Truthfinder, LLC. pursuant to FRCP 81(c)(2). (tot)
October 3, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants Notice of Removal from Circuit Court of Mobile County, Alabama, case number 02-CV-2019-902479.00. ( Filing fee $ 400, Receipt number AALSDC-2486873, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Complaint) (Eason, Leslie) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/4/2019: #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (tot).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coker v. Instant Checkmate, LLC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Truthfinder, LLC.
Represented By: Leslie K. Eason
Represented By: Stacy L. Moon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Instant Checkmate, Inc.
Represented By: Leslie K. Eason
Represented By: Stacy L. Moon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Instant Checkmate, LLC.
Represented By: Leslie K. Eason
Represented By: Stacy L. Moon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Truthfinder, Inc.
Represented By: Leslie K. Eason
Represented By: Stacy L. Moon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Dixon Coker, Jr.
Represented By: Kenneth J. Riemer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?