The DCH Health Care Authority v. Purdue Pharma, L.P.
Plaintiff: The DCH Health Care Authority, The Healthcare Authority of Clarke County, Alabama, BBH, Affinity Hospital, LLC, Gadsden Regional Medical Center, LLC, The Healthcare Authority for Baptist Health, Triad of Alabama, LLC, WBMC, LLC, Gilliard Health Services, Inc., Foley Hospital Corporation, BBH CBMC, LLC, QHG of Enterprise, Inc., BBH SBMC, LLC, BBH BMC, LLC, Crestwood Healthcare, L.P., BBH PBMC, LLC, Evergreen Medical Center, LLC and Medical West Hospital Authority
Defendant: Kroger, Purdue Pharma, L.P., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Abbott Laboratories, Beverly Sackler, Vanessa Weatherspoon, Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Mark Timney, Specgx, LLC, Abbott Laboratories, Inc., Allergan Finance, LLC, Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Mortimer D. A. Sackler, Purdue Pharma, Inc., Henry Schein, Inc., Mallinckrodt, LLC, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Wal-Mart Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., Assertio Therapeutics, Inc., Jonathan Sackler, H.D. Smith, LLC, Theresa Sackler, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Actavis LLC, Allergan PLC, Allergan Sales, LLC, Cardinal Health, Inc., Mitchell "Chip&quot Fisher, The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc., Craig Landau, Kathe Sackler, Walgreen Co., Inc., Richard Sackler, Walgreen Eastern Co, Inc., CVS Health Corporation, Mallinckrodt PLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Kroger Limited Partnership II, Lyndsie Fowler, John Stewart, Par Pharmaceutical, Inc., Ilene Sackler Lefcourt, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, CVS Indiana, L.L.C., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Rite Aid of Alabama, Inc., Joe Read, Rebecca Sterling, The Kroger Co., Noramco, Inc., Joe Coggins, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Chris Hargrove, Cephalon, Inc., David Sackler, Russell Gasdia, Allergan USA, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Brandon Hassenfuss, Amneal Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Anda, Inc., Par Pharmaceuticals Companies, Inc. and Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00756
Filed: October 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: William E Cassady
Referring Judge: William H Steele
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 21:841
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Remand to the Circuit Court of Conecuh County; denying #10 Motion to Stay all as set out in order. Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 12/2/19. (cmj)
November 21, 2019 REFERRAL OF #40 Notice of Second Amended Bankruptcy Court Order to Judge Steele. (cmj)
November 21, 2019 Filing 40 NOTICE by Joe Coggins, Mitchell "Chip" Fisher, Lyndsie Fowler, Chris Hargrove, Brandon Hassenfuss, Joe Read, Rebecca Sterling, Vanessa Weatherspoon Notice of Second Amended Bankruptcy Court Order Extending Injunction Against Continuation of These Proceedings as to Related Parties to Debtor Purdue Pharma L.P. and Affiliated Debtors (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Woods, Ricardo)
November 19, 2019 REFERRAL OF #39 Reply to Response to Motion to Judge Steele. (cmj)
November 19, 2019 Filing 39 REPLY to Response to Motion #10 for Temporary Stay filed by Kroger Limited Partnership II, The Kroger Co.. (Blanton, Sela)
November 14, 2019 Filing 38 Document endorsed NOTED by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady: Corporate Disclosure Statement #30 filed by Medical West Hospital Authority, Corporate Disclosure Statement #18 filed by BBH CBMC, LLC, Corporate Disclosure Statement #23 filed by Foley Hospital Corporation, Corporate Disclosure Statement #24 filed by Gadsden Regional Medical Center, LLC, Corporate Disclosure Statement #27 filed by Triad of Alabama, LLC, Corporate Disclosure Statement #20 filed by BBH SBMC, LLC, Corporate Disclosure Statement #25 filed by Gadsden Regional Medical Center, LLC, Corporate Disclosure Statement #21 filed by Affinity Hospital, LLC, Corporate Disclosure Statement #31 filed by The DCH Health Care Authority, Corporate Disclosure Statement #26 filed by QHG of Enterprise, Inc., Corporate Disclosure Statement #19 filed by BBH PBMC, LLC, Corporate Disclosure Statement, #36 filed by Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc., Rite Aid of Alabama, Inc., Corporate Disclosure Statement #29 filed by Gilliard Health Services, Inc., Corporate Disclosure Statement #16 filed by BBH BMC, LLC, Corporate Disclosure Statement #32 filed by The Healthcare Authority for Baptist Health, Corporate Disclosure Statement #28 filed by Evergreen Medical Center, LLC, Corporate Disclosure Statement #22 filed by Crestwood Healthcare, L.P., Corporate Disclosure Statement, #15 filed by WBMC, LLC, Corporate Disclosure Statement #17 filed by BBH CBMC, LLC, Corporate Disclosure Statement #33 filed by The Healthcare Authority of Clarke County, Alabama (Cassady, William)
November 14, 2019 Filing 37 Document endorsed NOTED by District Judge William H. Steele: Corporate Disclosure Statement #36 filed by Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc., Rite Aid of Alabama, Inc. (Steele, William)
November 13, 2019 Filing 36 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendants Rite Aid of Alabama, Inc., Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc., Rite Aid Corporation, Rite Aid Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Rite Aid Corporation for Rite Aid of Alabama, Inc., Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc... (Irvine, George)
November 13, 2019 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by George R. Irvine, III on behalf of Rite Aid of Alabama, Inc., Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc. (Irvine, George)
November 13, 2019 Filing 34 Documents endorsed NOTED by District Judge William H. Steele: Corporate Disclosure Statement #30 filed by Medical West Hospital Authority; Corporate Disclosure Statement #18 filed by BBH CBMC, LLC; Corporate Disclosure Statement #23 filed by Foley Hospital Corporation; Corporate Disclosure Statement #24 filed by Gadsden Regional Medical Center, LLC; Corporate Disclosure Statement #27 filed by Triad of Alabama, LLC; Corporate Disclosure Statement #20 filed by BBH SBMC, LLC; Corporate Disclosure Statement #25 filed by Gadsden Regional Medical Center, LLC; Corporate Disclosure Statement #21 filed by Affinity Hospital, LLC; Corporate Disclosure Statement #31 filed by The DCH Health Care Authority; Corporate Disclosure Statement #26 filed by QHG of Enterprise, Inc.; Corporate Disclosure Statement #19 filed by BBH PBMC, LLC; Corporate Disclosure Statement #29 filed by Gilliard Health Services, Inc.; Corporate Disclosure Statement #16 filed by BBH BMC, LLC; Corporate Disclosure Statement #32 filed by The Healthcare Authority for Baptist Health; Corporate Disclosure Statement #28 filed by Evergreen Medical Center, LLC; Corporate Disclosure Statement #22 filed by Crestwood Healthcare, L.P.; Corporate Disclosure Statement #15 filed by WBMC, LLC; Corporate Disclosure Statement #17 filed by BBH CBMC, LLC; Corporate Disclosure Statement #33 filed by The Healthcare Authority of Clarke County, Alabama. (Steele, William)
November 13, 2019 Filing 33 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Plaintiff The Healthcare Authority of Clarke County, Alabama. (King, Robert)
November 13, 2019 Filing 32 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Plaintiff The Healthcare Authority for Baptist Health. (King, Robert)
November 13, 2019 Filing 31 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Plaintiff The DCH Health Care Authority. (King, Robert)
November 13, 2019 Filing 30 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Plaintiff Medical West Hospital Authority. (King, Robert)
November 13, 2019 Filing 29 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Plaintiff Gilliard Health Services, Inc.. (King, Robert)
November 13, 2019 Filing 28 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Plaintiffs Evergreen Medical Center, LLC, Gilliard Health Services, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Gilliard Health Services, Inc. for Evergreen Medical Center, LLC.. (King, Robert)
November 13, 2019 Filing 27 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Plaintiffs Triad of Alabama, LLC, Community Health Systems, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Community Health Systems, Inc. for Triad of Alabama, LLC.. (King, Robert)
November 13, 2019 Filing 26 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Plaintiffs QHG of Enterprise, Inc., Community Health Systems, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Community Health Systems, Inc. for QHG of Enterprise, Inc... (King, Robert)
November 13, 2019 Filing 25 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Plaintiffs Gadsden Regional Medical Center, LLC, Community Health Systems, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Community Health Systems, Inc. for Gadsden Regional Medical Center, LLC.. (King, Robert)
November 13, 2019 Filing 24 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Plaintiffs Gadsden Regional Medical Center, LLC, Community Health Systems, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Community Health Systems, Inc. for Gadsden Regional Medical Center, LLC.. (King, Robert)
November 13, 2019 Filing 23 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Plaintiffs Foley Hospital Corporation, Community Health Systems, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Community Health Systems, Inc. for Foley Hospital Corporation.. (King, Robert)
November 13, 2019 Filing 22 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Plaintiffs Crestwood Healthcare, L.P., Community Health Systems, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Community Health Systems, Inc. for Crestwood Healthcare, L.P... (King, Robert)
November 13, 2019 Filing 21 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Plaintiffs Affinity Hospital, LLC, Community Health Systems, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Community Health Systems, Inc. for Affinity Hospital, LLC.. (King, Robert)
November 13, 2019 Filing 20 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Plaintiffs BBH SBMC, LLC, Tenet Healthcare Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Tenet Healthcare Corporation for BBH SBMC, LLC.. (King, Robert)
November 13, 2019 Filing 19 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Plaintiffs BBH PBMC, LLC, Tenet Healthcare Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Tenet Healthcare Corporation for BBH PBMC, LLC.. (King, Robert)
November 13, 2019 Filing 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Plaintiffs BBH CBMC, LLC, Tenet Healthcare Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Tenet Healthcare Corporation for BBH CBMC, LLC.. (King, Robert)
November 13, 2019 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Plaintiffs BBH CBMC, LLC, Tenet Healthcare Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Tenet Healthcare Corporation for BBH CBMC, LLC.. (King, Robert)
November 13, 2019 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Plaintiffs BBH BMC, LLC, Tenet Healthcare Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Tenet Healthcare Corporation for BBH BMC, LLC.. (King, Robert)
November 13, 2019 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Plaintiffs WBMC, LLC, Tenet Healthcare Corporation, Tenet Healthcare Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Tenet Healthcare Corporation, Corporate Parent Tenet Healthcare Corporation for WBMC, LLC.. (King, Robert)
November 13, 2019 REFERRAL OF #14 Response in Opposition to Motion,, #13 Reply Brief,,,, to Judge Steele. (cmj)
November 12, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 MOTION to Stay filed by Affinity Hospital, LLC, BBH, BBH BMC, LLC, BBH CBMC, LLC, BBH PBMC, LLC, BBH SBMC, LLC, Crestwood Healthcare, L.P., Evergreen Medical Center, LLC, Foley Hospital Corporation, Gadsden Regional Medical Center, LLC, Gilliard Health Services, Inc., Medical West Hospital Authority, QHG of Enterprise, Inc., The DCH Health Care Authority, The Healthcare Authority for Baptist Health, The Healthcare Authority of Clarke County, Alabama, Triad of Alabama, LLC, WBMC, LLC. (King, Robert)
November 8, 2019 Filing 13 REPLY Brief filed by Plaintiffs Affinity Hospital, LLC, BBH, BBH BMC, LLC, BBH CBMC, LLC, BBH PBMC, LLC, BBH SBMC, LLC, Crestwood Healthcare, L.P., Evergreen Medical Center, LLC, Foley Hospital Corporation, Gadsden Regional Medical Center, LLC, Gilliard Health Services, Inc., Medical West Hospital Authority, QHG of Enterprise, Inc., The DCH Health Care Authority, The Healthcare Authority for Baptist Health, The Healthcare Authority of Clarke County, Alabama, Triad of Alabama, LLC, WBMC, LLC re: #6 Emergency MOTION to Remand Emergency MOTION to Remand to State Court , #11 Response to Motion, #10 MOTION to Stay filed by Affinity Hospital, LLC, BBH, BBH BMC, LLC, BBH CBMC, LLC, BBH PBMC, LLC, BBH SBMC, LLC, Crestwood Healthcare, L.P., Evergreen Medical Center, LLC, Foley Hospital Corporation, Gadsden Regional Medical Center, LLC, Gilliard Health Services, Inc., Medical West Hospital Authority, QHG of Enterprise, Inc., The DCH Health Care Authority, The Healthcare Authority for Baptist Health, The Healthcare Authority of Clarke County, Alabama, Triad of Alabama, LLC, WBMC, LLC. (Copeland, W.)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Order DIRECTING Plaintiffs to file response to #10 MOTION for Temporary Stay filed by The Kroger Co., and Kroger Limited Partnership II, on or before 11/12/2019. Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 11/04/2019. (srd)
November 1, 2019 REFERRAL OF #11 Response to Motion to Judge Steele. (cmj)
November 1, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #10 MOTION to Stay to Judge Steele (cmj)
November 1, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE to Motion re: #6 Emergency MOTION to Remand Emergency MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Kroger Limited Partnership II, The Kroger Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Blanton, Sela)
November 1, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Stay filed by Kroger Limited Partnership II, The Kroger Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H) (Blanton, Sela)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order Setting Motion Deadline re: #6 Emergency MOTION to Remand. Responses due by 11/1/2019; Replies due by 11/8/2019; Motion to be taken under submission on 11/8/2019. Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 10/22/19. (cmj)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting in part #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; Unless the case is sooner transferred to the MDL Court, all defendants are ordered to file and serve their response to the complaint no later than 28 days following resolution of the Courts subject matter jurisdiction and any timely motion to remand. It is otherwise denied, as set out. Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 10/21/19. (cmj)
October 21, 2019 REFERRAL OF #7 Memorandum in Support to Judge Steele. (cmj)
October 21, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #6 Emergency MOTION to Remand Emergency MOTION to Remand to State Court to Judge Steele (cmj)
October 18, 2019 Filing 7 Memorandum in Support re #6 Emergency MOTION to Remand Emergency MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by The DCH Health Care Authority. (King, Robert)
October 18, 2019 Filing 6 Emergency MOTION to Remand , Emergency MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by All Plaintiffs. (King, Robert)
October 17, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint to Judge Steele (cmj)
October 16, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by Amneal Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC. (Walker, Thomas)
October 10, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by John Patrick Strubel on behalf of Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation (Strubel, John)
October 10, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Kroger. (Blanton, Sela)
October 10, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendants Kroger, Kroger identifying Corporate Parent Kroger for Kroger.. (Blanton, Sela)
October 9, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by The Kroger Co. from Circuit Court of Conecuh County, case number 21-CV-2019-000007. ( Filing fee $ 400, Receipt number AALSDC-2490531, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Kroger. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2) (Blanton, Sela) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/10/2019: #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (cmj).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The DCH Health Care Authority v. Purdue Pharma, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kroger
Represented By: Sela Stroud Blanton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma, L.P.
Represented By: Sela Stroud Blanton
Represented By: Blair G. Mattei
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher S. Berdy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher S. Berdy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories
Represented By: John A. McCauley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beverly Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vanessa Weatherspoon
Represented By: Ricardo Andrew Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Sean Morris
Represented By: Eliseo Puig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Timney
Represented By: Jordan Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Specgx, LLC
Represented By: Traci J. Irvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories, Inc.
Represented By: John A. McCauley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Finance, LLC
Represented By: Timothy Knapp
Represented By: Zachary A. Ciullo
Represented By: Michael Finnegan LeFevour
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC
Represented By: Sarah Miller Benoit
Represented By: Thomas E. Walker
Represented By: Joshua A. Klarfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortimer D. A. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: Blair G. Mattei
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry Schein, Inc.
Represented By: Brandon J. Montminy
Represented By: C. Scott Jones
Represented By: John P. McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt, LLC
Represented By: Traci J. Irvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Pharmacy, Inc.
Represented By: Alexandra W. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Inc.
Represented By: Alexandra J. Wolter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd.
Represented By: Adam Teitcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Assertio Therapeutics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H.D. Smith, LLC
Represented By: John Patrick Strubel
Represented By: David L. Brown, Jr.
Represented By: H. Lanier Brown, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theresa Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Sean Morris
Represented By: Eliseo Puig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Represented By: Adam Teitcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Represented By: Timothy Knapp
Represented By: Zachary A. Ciullo
Represented By: Michael Finnegan LeFevour
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Sales, LLC
Represented By: Timothy Knapp
Represented By: Zachary A. Ciullo
Represented By: Michael Finnegan LeFevour
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health, Inc.
Represented By: Enu Mainigi
Represented By: Ashley W. Hardin
Represented By: Steven M. Pyser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitchell "Chip&quot Fisher
Represented By: Ricardo Andrew Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
Represented By: Blair G. Mattei
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories, Inc.
Represented By: Adam Teitcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc.
Represented By: George R. Irvine, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig Landau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathe Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Co., Inc.
Represented By: Anne Stone Sumblin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Eastern Co, Inc.
Represented By: Anne Stone Sumblin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation
Represented By: Alexandra W. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Represented By: Traci J. Irvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: Adam Teitcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Christopher S. Berdy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kroger Limited Partnership II
Represented By: Sela Stroud Blanton
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Nicholson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lyndsie Fowler
Represented By: Ricardo Andrew Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
Represented By: Sean Morris
Represented By: Eliseo Puig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ilene Sackler Lefcourt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation
Represented By: John Patrick Strubel
Represented By: David L. Brown, Jr.
Represented By: H. Lanier Brown, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Indiana, L.L.C.
Represented By: Alexandra W. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher S. Berdy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid of Alabama, Inc.
Represented By: George R. Irvine, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Read
Represented By: Ricardo Andrew Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rebecca Sterling
Represented By: Ricardo Andrew Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Kroger Co.
Represented By: Sela Stroud Blanton
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Nicholson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noramco, Inc.
Represented By: Patrick H. Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Coggins
Represented By: Ricardo Andrew Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals
Represented By: Christopher S. Berdy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Hargrove
Represented By: Ricardo Andrew Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon, Inc.
Represented By: Adam Teitcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russell Gasdia
Represented By: Julie Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan USA, Inc.
Represented By: Timothy Knapp
Represented By: Zachary A. Ciullo
Represented By: Michael Finnegan LeFevour
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
Represented By: Alexandra J. Wolter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon Hassenfuss
Represented By: Ricardo Andrew Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Sarah Miller Benoit
Represented By: Thomas E. Walker
Represented By: Joshua A. Klarfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anda, Inc.
Represented By: Ana M. Francisco
Represented By: Katy E. Koski
Represented By: James W. Matthews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceuticals Companies, Inc.
Represented By: Sean Morris
Represented By: Eliseo Puig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Represented By: Adam Teitcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The DCH Health Care Authority
Represented By: Steven A. Martino
Represented By: W. Lloyd Copeland
Represented By: Robert C. King
Represented By: John Russell Gibson, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Healthcare Authority of Clarke County, Alabama
Represented By: Steven A. Martino
Represented By: Robert C. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BBH
Represented By: Steven A. Martino
Represented By: Robert C. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Affinity Hospital, LLC
Represented By: Steven A. Martino
Represented By: W. Lloyd Copeland
Represented By: Robert C. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gadsden Regional Medical Center, LLC
Represented By: Steven A. Martino
Represented By: W. Lloyd Copeland
Represented By: Robert C. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Healthcare Authority for Baptist Health
Represented By: Steven A. Martino
Represented By: W. Lloyd Copeland
Represented By: Robert C. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Triad of Alabama, LLC
Represented By: Steven A. Martino
Represented By: W. Lloyd Copeland
Represented By: Robert C. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WBMC, LLC
Represented By: Steven A. Martino
Represented By: W. Lloyd Copeland
Represented By: Robert C. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gilliard Health Services, Inc.
Represented By: Steven A. Martino
Represented By: W. Lloyd Copeland
Represented By: Robert C. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Foley Hospital Corporation
Represented By: Steven A. Martino
Represented By: W. Lloyd Copeland
Represented By: Robert C. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BBH CBMC, LLC
Represented By: Steven A. Martino
Represented By: W. Lloyd Copeland
Represented By: Robert C. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: QHG of Enterprise, Inc.
Represented By: Steven A. Martino
Represented By: W. Lloyd Copeland
Represented By: Robert C. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BBH SBMC, LLC
Represented By: Steven A. Martino
Represented By: W. Lloyd Copeland
Represented By: Robert C. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BBH BMC, LLC
Represented By: Steven A. Martino
Represented By: W. Lloyd Copeland
Represented By: Robert C. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crestwood Healthcare, L.P.
Represented By: Steven A. Martino
Represented By: W. Lloyd Copeland
Represented By: Robert C. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BBH PBMC, LLC
Represented By: Steven A. Martino
Represented By: W. Lloyd Copeland
Represented By: Robert C. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evergreen Medical Center, LLC
Represented By: Steven A. Martino
Represented By: W. Lloyd Copeland
Represented By: Robert C. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Medical West Hospital Authority
Represented By: Steven A. Martino
Represented By: W. Lloyd Copeland
Represented By: Robert C. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?