Granite State Insurance Company v. New Way Out, Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Granite State Insurance Company
Defendant: Next Level Residential Services, LLC, New Way Out, Corporation, French Residential Facilities, Inc. and Crossroads Residential Facilities, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00848
Filed: October 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Bert W Milling
Referring Judge: William H Steele
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2019 REFERRAL OF #14 Response to Order, to Judge Steele. (cmj)
December 13, 2019 Filing 15 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Crossroads Residential Facilities, Inc., Next Level Residential Services, LLC, New Way Out, Corporation, French Residential Facilities, Inc.. (Benton, Thomas)
December 13, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE TO ORDER re: #12 Order to Show Cause by Crossroads Residential Facilities, Inc., French Residential Facilities, Inc., New Way Out, Corporation, Next Level Residential Services, LLC filed by Crossroads Residential Facilities, Inc., French Residential Facilities, Inc., New Way Out, Corporation, Next Level Residential Services, LLC. (Benton, Thomas)
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER entered Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 1/27/2020.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr on 12/13/19. (cmj)
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE why default should not be entered against defendants Show Cause Response due by 12/13/2019.. Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 12/11/19. (cmj)
December 11, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Crossroads Residential Facilities, Inc., New Way Out, Corporation, Next Level Residential Services, LLC, French Residential Facilities, Inc.. (Benton, Thomas)
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The defendants are extended an additional 20 days, through and including 12/3/2019, by which to file and serve their response to the complaint. Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 11/27/2019. (nah)
November 27, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Judge Steele (nah)
November 26, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by All Defendants. (Benton, Thomas)
November 26, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas H. Benton, Jr on behalf of All Defendants (Benton, Thomas)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER denying #6 Motion to Dismiss or remand without prejudice, as set out. Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 11/13/19. (cmj)
November 13, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #6 MOTION to Dismiss referred to Judge Steele. (mbp)
November 12, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss or in the alternative, Motion to Remand filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Settlement documents and Court Orders, #2 Exhibit Full Policy) (Yates, Judson)
November 8, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Granite State Insurance Company. Next Level Residential Services, LLC served on 10/23/2019, answer due 11/13/2019 (Crunk, Michelle)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Service Order entered 10/21/2019. Plaintiff to notify the Court the action taken to effect service and the results thereof. Service order deadline set to 12/2/2019.. Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 10/21/19. (cmj)
October 21, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Crossroads Residential Facilities, Inc., French Residential Facilities, Inc., New Way Out, Corporation, Next Level Residential Services, LLC. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (cmj)
October 17, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Plaintiff Granite State Insurance Company. (Crunk, Michelle)
October 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Crossroads Residential Facilities, Inc., French Residential Facilities, Inc., New Way Out, Corporation, Next Level Residential Services, LLC ( Filing fee $400 receipt number AALSDC-2495143, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Granite State Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 SUMMONS - NWO, #3 SUMMONS - FRENCH, #4 SUMMONS - CROSSROADS, #5 SUMMONS - NEXT LEVEL) (Crunk, Michelle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Granite State Insurance Company v. New Way Out, Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Next Level Residential Services, LLC
Represented By: Judson Yates
Represented By: Thomas H. Benton, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Way Out, Corporation
Represented By: Judson Yates
Represented By: Thomas H. Benton, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: French Residential Facilities, Inc.
Represented By: Judson Yates
Represented By: Thomas H. Benton, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crossroads Residential Facilities, Inc.
Represented By: Judson Yates
Represented By: Thomas H. Benton, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Granite State Insurance Company
Represented By: Michelle Leigh Crunk
Represented By: John W. Dodson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?