Diamond v. Hose O Weaver and Son
Plaintiff: Corey L. Diamond
Defendant: Hose O Weaver and Son
Case Number: 1:2019cv00918
Filed: October 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Callie V S Granade
Referring Judge: P Bradley Murray
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE Make and Offer by Corey L. Diamond (mab)
December 16, 2019 Filing 10 JUDGMENT that this action is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, prior to service of process, because Plf has failed to allege in his complaint that he has exhausted his administrative remedies before the EEOC as to Plf's claim of discrimination as set out. Signed by Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 12/16/2019. (copy mailed to Plf on 12/16/19) (srd)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER ADOPTING #3 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS as set out. Signed by Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 12/16/2019. (copy mailed to Plf on 12/16/19). (srd)
December 9, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Proceed filed by Corey L. Diamond. (Referred to J/Granade on 12/12/19) (tot)
December 5, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE re: #6 Notice (Make an Offer) by Corey L. Diamond. (Referred to J/Granade on 12/10/19) (tot)
November 26, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE - Make a Offer by Corey L. Diamond; referred to Senior Judge Granade (mab)
November 20, 2019 Filing 5 Objection re: #3 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS filed by Corey L. Diamond. Referred to Judge Granade. (skb)
November 20, 2019 Filing 4 Objection re: #3 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS filed by Corey L. Diamond. Referred to Judge Granade. (skb)
November 8, 2019 Filing 3 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #1 Complaint and #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Corey L. Diamond. It is RECOMMENDED that this action be DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, prior to service as set out. Objections to R&R due 14 days from the date of service of this document. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 11/08/2019. (srd) Copy to Plaintiff.
October 28, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Corey L. Diamond. Referred to Judge P. Bradley Murray (PSU). (skb)
October 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Hose O Weaver and Son filed by Corey L. Diamond. (skb) Referred to MJ/Murray (PSU).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Diamond v. Hose O Weaver and Son
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hose O Weaver and Son
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Corey L. Diamond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?