Jones v. BP Exploration & Production, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Reno Jones
Defendant: BP Exploration & Production Inc and BP America Production Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv00964
Filed: November 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: William E Cassady
Referring Judge: Terry F Moorer
2 Judge: P Bradley Murray
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1333in
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2019 Notice of Appearance Pro Hac Vice by Howard L. Nations. Pursuant to the Case Management Order entered in 19-cv-5000-KD-MU-C only the pro hac vice fee is being paid. I certify that documentation has been previously filed in 1:19-cv-00169. ( Filing fee $ 75, Receipt number AALSDC-2533553, Online Credit Card Payment.) (Nations, Howard)
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Order, Attorney Nations ORDERED to comply with Paragraph 4 of the Court's BELO CMO not later than 12/31/2019, by filing a notice of pro hac vice appearance, certifying his prior admission, and paying the applicable pro hac vice admission fee. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 12/17/2019. (skb)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER in case 1:18-cv-00533-CG-MU-C; granting (23) Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Clinton Ray South terminated in case 1:19-cv-00102-JB-MU-C. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 11-20-19. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00102-JB-MU-C et al. (lly)
November 18, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Harlan I. Prater, IV on behalf of All Defendants (Prater, Harlan)
November 18, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Wesley B. Gilchrist on behalf of All Defendants (Gilchrist, Wesley)
November 18, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Amber Nicole Hall on behalf of All Defendants (Hall, Amber)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Omnibus Order Modifying BELO Case Management Order re: (1 in 1:19-cv-05000-KD-MU-C). Signed by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 9/4/2019. (skb)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 BELO Case Management Order. Signed by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 05/29/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Protective Order, # 2 HIPAA Protective Order, # 3 Authorization) (skb)
November 13, 2019 Filing 8 Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:19-cv-10284. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Case transferred to Southern District of Alabama. IT IS ORDERED that the instant matter is hereby TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Alabama. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 11/8/2019.(pp)(NEF:HON. CARL J. BARBIER) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/13/2019.]
November 7, 2019 Filing 6 Statement by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc. Regarding Venue (Reid, Devin) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/13/2019.]
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER--IT IS ORDERED THAT, no later than October 2, 2019, plaintiffs in the attached lists must provide full and complete initial disclosures. Failure to provide the disclosures by the above date will result in an order that plaintiffs and their counsel must appear inperson before Judge Barbier to show cause why their cases should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute and/or pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.37(b)(2)(A)(v). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT, as to all of the listed cases in which plaintiffs produce fulland complete disclosures in compliance with this order, the deadline by which the parties must submit their venue filing is extended to no later than October 31, 2019.Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 9/5/19.(ko)(NEF: Sect J) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/13/2019.]
June 7, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc..Attorney Don Keller Haycraft added to party BP America Production Company(pty:dft), Attorney Don Keller Haycraft added to party BP Exploration & Production, Inc.(pty:dft).(Haycraft, Don) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/13/2019.]
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL PROCEEDINGS CASE MANAGEMENT ORDERS No.'s 1 and 2. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 1/30/2015. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 BELO Settlement Agreement)(mp) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/13/2019.]
May 9, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Carl Barbier and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (djg) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/13/2019.]
May 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7631627) filed by Reno Jones. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Howard L. Nations added to party Reno Jones(pty:pla).(Nations, Howard) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/13/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. BP Exploration & Production, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP Exploration & Production Inc
Represented By: Wesley B. Gilchrist
Represented By: Harlan I. Prater, IV
Represented By: Amber Nicole Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP America Production Company
Represented By: Wesley B. Gilchrist
Represented By: Harlan I. Prater, IV
Represented By: Amber Nicole Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reno Jones
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?