Yeager et al v. Advanced Disposal Services Alabama, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Ramona Yeager and Barry Yeager
Defendant: Advanced Disposal Services Mobile Transfer Station, LLC, Advanced Disposal Services Alabama, LLC and Mr. Bult's, Inc
Case Number: 1:2019cv01040
Filed: December 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Kristi K DuBose
Referring Judge: Katherine P Nelson
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Order setting telephonic scheduling conference for 2/6/2020 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson. See call in information in order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 01/29/2020. (nah)
January 28, 2020 REFERRAL OF #19 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting to Judge Nelson. (nah)
January 27, 2020 Filing 19 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (Hebson, Ryan)
January 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ENDORSED ORDER granting #16 #17 Motions to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorneys Ashley Lyn Crank and Richard Marshall Thayer terminated as counsel of record for Mr. Bult's, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 1/14/2020. (ctn)
January 14, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #17 MOTION for Richard M. Thayer to Withdraw as Attorney Referred to Judge Katherine P. Nelson. (nah)
January 13, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION for Richard M. Thayer to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Mr. Bult's, Inc. (Crank, Ashley)
January 13, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #16 MOTION for Ashley L. Crank to Withdraw as Attorney Referred to Judge Katherine P. Nelson. (nah)
January 13, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION for Ashley L. Crank to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Mr. Bult's, Inc. (Crank, Ashley)
December 17, 2019 Filing 15 Document endorsed NOTED by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose: Corporate Disclosure Statement #13 filed by Mr. Bult's, Inc. The review did not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest, which would require disqualification or recusal in this action. (khc)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT-ONLY ORDER on #13 , #2 Disclosure Statements filed by Mr. Bult's, Inc. A review does not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require recusal in this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 12/16/2019. (ctn)
December 13, 2019 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Mr. Bult's, Inc. (Thayer, Richard)
December 13, 2019 Filing 12 Document endorsed NOTED by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose: Corporate Disclosure Statement, #4 filed by Advanced Disposal Services Mobile Transfer Station, LLC, Corporate Disclosure Statement #2 filed by Mr. Bult's, Inc, Corporate Disclosure Statement, #3 filed by Advanced Disposal Services Alabama, LLC. Review of the corporate disclosure statements has been completed. The review did not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest, which would require disqualification or recusal in this action. (khc)
December 11, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Advanced Disposal Services Mobile Transfer Station, LLC. (Hebson, Ryan)
December 11, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Advanced Disposal Services Alabama, LLC. (Hebson, Ryan)
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER entered. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 1/27/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 12/11/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (nah)
December 11, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by James C. Gray, III on behalf of Mr. Bult's, Inc (Gray, James)
December 11, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Mr. Bult's, Inc. (Crank, Ashley)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT-ONLY ORDER on #4 , #3 Disclosure Statements filed by Advanced Disposal Services Mobile Transfer Station, LLC and Advanced Disposal Services Alabama, LLC. The statements substantively comply with S.D. Ala. CivLR 7.1, and a review does not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require recusal in this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 12/9/2019. (ctn)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT-ONLY ORDER re: #2 Disclosure Statement filed by Mr. Bult's, Inc: The disclosure statement does not satisfy the requirements of S.D. Ala. CivLR 7.1, which are broader than those of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 advisory committees note to 2002 adoption ("Rule 7.1 does not prohibit local rules that require disclosures in addition to those required by Rule 7.1."). Mr. Bult's, Inc. is ORDERED to file an amended or supplemental disclosure statement that satisfies S.D. Ala. CivLR 7.1 no later than Fri. 12/13/2019 (form available at: https://www.alsd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms). Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 12/6/2019. (ctn)
December 6, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendants Advanced Disposal Services Mobile Transfer Station, LLC, Advanced Disposal Services South, LLC, Advanced Disposal Services, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Advanced Disposal Services South, LLC, Other Affiliate Advanced Disposal Services, Inc. for Advanced Disposal Services Mobile Transfer Station, LLC.. (Hebson, Ryan)
December 6, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendants Advanced Disposal Services Alabama, LLC, Advanced Disposal Services Alabama Holdings, LLC, Advanced Disposal Services South, LLC, Advanced Disposal Services, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Advanced Disposal Services Alabama Holdings, LLC, Other Affiliate Advanced Disposal Services South, LLC, Other Affiliate Advanced Disposal Services, Inc. for Advanced Disposal Services Alabama, LLC.. (Hebson, Ryan)
December 5, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendants Mr. Bult's, Inc, Mr. Bult's, Inc identifying Corporate Parent Mr. Bult's, Inc for Mr. Bult's, Inc.. (Crank, Ashley)
December 5, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL , filed by Mr. Bult's, Inc. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 46031052137, Fee Paid at Intake) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit Exhibit F) (Crank, Ashley)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yeager et al v. Advanced Disposal Services Alabama, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ramona Yeager
Represented By: William Bradford Kittrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barry Yeager
Represented By: William Bradford Kittrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advanced Disposal Services Mobile Transfer Station, LLC
Represented By: Rik Stanford Tozzi
Represented By: Ryan James Hebson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advanced Disposal Services Alabama, LLC
Represented By: Rik Stanford Tozzi
Represented By: Ryan James Hebson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Bult's, Inc
Represented By: Ashley Lyn Crank
Represented By: Richard Marshall Thayer
Represented By: James C. Gray, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?