Wireman et al v. Park National Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Judy Wireman and Larry Wireman
Defendant: SE Property Holdings, LLC, Park National Corporation and Southeast Property Solutions, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv01068
Filed: December 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Sonja F Bivins
Referring Judge: Terry F Moorer
Nature of Suit: Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 21, 2020 REFERRAL OF #11 Reply to Response to Motion to Judge Moorer. (tot)
January 17, 2020 Filing 11 REPLY to Response to Motion #7 filed by Park National Corporation, SE Property Holdings, LLC, Southeast Property Solutions, LLC. (Speegle, Jerome)
January 10, 2020 REFERRAL OF #10 Response in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss to Judge Moorer. (tot)
January 10, 2020 Filing 10 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint and Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss filed by Judy Wireman, Larry Wireman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3) (Eaton, Franklin)
December 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT-ONLY ORDER, GRANTING #8 Plaintiffs' Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response to Defendants' #7 MOTION to Dismiss. Plaintiffs' response is due by 1/10/2020. Defendants' reply is due by 1/17/2020. Signed by District Judge Terry F. Moorer on 12/27/2019. (mab)
December 27, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to #7 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint and Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss; Referred to Judge Terry F. Moorer. (mab)
December 27, 2019 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #7 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint and Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss filed by Judy Wireman, Larry Wireman. (Eaton, Franklin)
December 19, 2019 REFERRAL OF #7 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint & Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss to Judge Moorer. (tot)
December 18, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint and Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Unpublished Cases Cited in Brief, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A) (Speegle, Jerome)
December 18, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendants SE Property Holdings, LLC, Park National Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Park National Corporation for SE Property Holdings, LLC.. (Speegle, Jerome)
December 18, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendants Park National Corporation, SE Property Holdings LLC identifying Corporate Parent SE Property Holdings LLC for Park National Corporation.. (Speegle, Jerome)
December 18, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendants Southeast Property Solutions, LLC, Robert J. Meyers identifying Other Affiliate Robert J. Meyers for Southeast Property Solutions, LLC.. (Speegle, Jerome)
December 12, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by All Defendants of Notice of Filing Notice of Removal in State Court (Speegle, Jerome)
December 12, 2019 Filing 2 Blank Disclosure Statement Form E-Mailed to Counsel for Defendants Park National Corporation, SE Property Holdings, LLC, Southeast Property Solutions, LLC; Disclosure Statements Due 12/19/2019. Please list members of LLC. (tot)
December 11, 2019 Answer due from Park National Corporation, SE Property Holdings, LLC, Southeast Property Solutions, LLC pursuant to FRCP 81(c)(2). (tot)
December 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL ( Filing fee $ 400, Receipt number AALSDC-2527764, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Speegle, Jerome) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/12/2019: #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (tot).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wireman et al v. Park National Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judy Wireman
Represented By: Franklin Hollis Eaton, Jr.
Represented By: Christopher Adam Callaghan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Wireman
Represented By: Franklin Hollis Eaton, Jr.
Represented By: Christopher Adam Callaghan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SE Property Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Jerome E. Speegle
Represented By: Jennifer S. Holifield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Park National Corporation
Represented By: Jerome E. Speegle
Represented By: Jennifer S. Holifield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southeast Property Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Jerome E. Speegle
Represented By: Jennifer S. Holifield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?