Oppenheimer v. Stringfellow et al
Plaintiff: David Oppenheimer
Defendant: Edward T. Stringfellow and Weeks Bay Plantation, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01127
Filed: December 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Bert W Milling
Referring Judge: William H Steele
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2020 Filing 18 Document endorsed NOTED by District Judge William H. Steele: Corporate Disclosure Statement #17 filed by Weeks Bay Plantation, Inc.; Edward T. Stringfellow. (Steele, William)
February 20, 2020 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendants Edward T. Stringfellow, Weeks Bay Plantation, Inc., Weeks Bay Plantation, Inc., Weeks Bay Plantation, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Weeks Bay Plantation, Inc. for Edward T. Stringfellow, Weeks Bay Plantation, Inc... (Minus, Joseph)
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING #12 Motion for Dana A. LeJune to Appear Pro Hac Vice, as supplemented #15 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr on 2/20/2020. (clr)
February 19, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE by David Oppenheimer re #12 MOTION and APPLICATION for Dana A. LeJune to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney affirms that a certificate of good standing that complies with #S.D. Ala. G Cert Good Standing TX So. District (Lejune, Dana)
February 19, 2020 REFERRAL OF #15 Notice of Filing (Other) to Judge Milling. (cmj)
February 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER entered Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 4/3/2020.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr on 2/18/20. (cmj)
February 14, 2020 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Edward T. Stringfellow, Weeks Bay Plantation, Inc.. (Minus, Joseph)
February 11, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #12 MOTION and APPLICATION for Dana A. LeJune to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Referred to Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr. (cmj)
February 10, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION and APPLICATION for Dana A. LeJune to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney affirms that a certificate of good standing that complies with #S.D. Ala. GenLR 83.3(d) is attached. ( Filing fee $ 75, Receipt number AALSDC-2567911, Online Credit Card Payment) filed by David Oppenheimer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificates of Good Standing) (Lejune, Dana)
February 6, 2020 Answer due from Edward T. Stringfellow on 2/18/2020; Weeks Bay Plantation, Inc. on 2/18/2020 per doc. 11. (cmj)
February 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ENDORSED ORDER granting #10 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 2/5/2020. (Steele, William)
February 5, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint to Judge Steele (cmj)
February 4, 2020 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, filed by Edward T. Stringfellow, Weeks Bay Plantation, Inc.. (Minus, Joseph)
January 8, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by David Oppenheimer. Edward T. Stringfellow served on 1/7/2020, answer due 1/28/2020 (Potts, Charles)
January 8, 2020 Filing 8 Alias Summons Issued as to Edward T. Stringfellow. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (cmj)
January 7, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by David Oppenheimer (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Civil Summons to Edward T Stringfellow) (Potts, Charles)
January 3, 2020 Filing 6 AO 121 Copyright form mailed to Copyright Office per 17 USC 508 (cmj)
January 3, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by David Oppenheimer. Weeks Bay Plantation, Inc. served on 1/2/2020, answer due 1/23/2020 (Potts, Charles)
December 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Service Order entered 12/26/2019. Plaintiff to notify the Court the action taken to effect service and the results thereof. Service order deadline set to 2/10/2020.. Signed by District Judge William H. Steele on 12/26/19. (cmj)
December 26, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Edward T. Stringfellow, Weeks Bay Plantation, Inc.. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (cmj)
December 26, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by David Oppenheimer (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Summons to Stringfellow, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Summons to Weeks Bay) (Potts, Charles)
December 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Edward T. Stringfellow, Weeks Bay Plantation, Inc. ( Filing fee $400 receipt number AALSDC-2537931, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by David Oppenheimer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - the Work, #2 Exhibit 2 - Register of Copyrights, #3 Exhibit 3 - infringed rights, #4 Exhibit 4 - C&D letter) (Potts, Charles) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/26/2019: #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (cmj).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oppenheimer v. Stringfellow et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Oppenheimer
Represented By: Charles J. Potts
Represented By: Dana Lejune
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward T. Stringfellow
Represented By: Joseph J. Minus, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weeks Bay Plantation, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph J. Minus, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?