Wireman et al v. The City of Orange Beach
Plaintiff: Larry Wireman and Turquoise Properties, LLC
Defendant: The City of Orange Beach
Case Number: 1:2020cv00005
Filed: January 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Sonja F Bivins
Referring Judge: Kristi K DuBose
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Order Setting Motion Deadline re: #15 MOTION to Dismiss. Plaintiff response due by 3/6/2020. Defendant reply due by 3/20/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 02/14/2020. (nah)
February 10, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #15 MOTION to Dismiss Referred to Judge Sonja F. Bivins. (nah)
February 10, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss filed by The City of Orange Beach. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Brief Supporting Motion to Dismiss) (Walker, David)
February 6, 2020 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Larry Wireman, Turquoise Properties, LLC. All Defendants (Anderson, Kristopher)
February 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ENDORSED ORDER granting #9 Defendant's unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or otherwise respond (10 additional days). Signed by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 2/3/20.(gcp)
January 30, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, to Judge DuBose (nah)
January 30, 2020 Filing 12 This action has been transferred from the docket of Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins and is now assigned to the docket of Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose and Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins. To insure that your pleadings are referred to the proper Judge and Magistrate Judge with as little delay as possible, please use the letter suffix KD-B after the case number on all future pleadings. (mpp)
January 30, 2020 MOTION REFERRED: #9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint - Referred to Judge Sonja F. Bivins. (mpp)
January 30, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by David F. Walker on behalf of The City of Orange Beach (Walker, David)
January 30, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew John Rutens on behalf of The City of Orange Beach (Rutens, Andrew)
January 30, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, filed by The City of Orange Beach. (Wettermark, Lawrence)
January 9, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel E. Harrell on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Harrell, Daniel)
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Service Order entered 1/8/2020. Plaintiff to notify the Court the action taken to effect service and the results thereof. Service order deadline set to 2/17/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 1/8/20. (mpp) Copies to counsel
January 8, 2020 Filing 6 Notice of Assignment to Magistrate Judge for trial. (Attachments: #1 Request for Reassignment) (mpp)
January 7, 2020 Filing 5 Document endorsed NOTED by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins: Corporate Disclosure Statement #3 filed by Turquoise Properties, LLC, Larry Wireman (Bivins, Sonja)
January 7, 2020 REFERRAL OF #3 Corporate Disclosure Statement to Judge Bivins. (mpp)
January 6, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to The City of Orange Beach. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (srd)
January 6, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Plaintiffs Turquoise Properties, LLC, Larry Wireman. (Anderson, Kristopher)
January 6, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew McDonnell Couch on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Couch, Matthew)
January 3, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number AALSDC-2541763, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Deed - Inst. No. 1230121, #2 Exhibit B - Deed - Inst. No. 1230122, #3 Summons for issuance, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Anderson, Kristopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wireman et al v. The City of Orange Beach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Wireman
Represented By: Kristopher O. Anderson
Represented By: Daniel E. Harrell
Represented By: Matthew McDonnell Couch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Turquoise Properties, LLC
Represented By: Kristopher O. Anderson
Represented By: Daniel E. Harrell
Represented By: Matthew McDonnell Couch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City of Orange Beach
Represented By: Lawrence M. Wettermark
Represented By: David F. Walker
Represented By: Andrew John Rutens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?