Blackburn v. City of Orange Beach, AL
Plaintiff: Daniel G. Blackburn
Defendant: City of Orange Beach, AL
Case Number: 1:2020cv00028
Filed: January 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Sonja F Bivins
Referring Judge: Kristi K DuBose
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER entered. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 4/2/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 02/18/2020. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (nah)
February 17, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by City of Orange Beach, AL. (Rutens, Andrew)
February 6, 2020 Filing 4 Document endorsed NOTED by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose: Corporate Disclosure Statement #3 filed by City of Orange Beach, AL. Review of the corporate disclosure statement has been completed. The review did not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest, which would require disqualification or recusal in this action. (khc)
January 16, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant City of Orange Beach, AL. (Rutens, Andrew)
January 16, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE by City of Orange Beach, AL of Filing Index of Pleadings (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index of Pleadings) (Rutens, Andrew)
January 16, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL ( Filing fee $ 400, Receipt number AALSDC-2551412, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by City of Orange Beach, AL. (Rutens, Andrew) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/16/2020: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (nah).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blackburn v. City of Orange Beach, AL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Orange Beach, AL
Represented By: David F. Walker
Represented By: Andrew John Rutens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel G. Blackburn
Represented By: Daniel Grant Blackburn, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?