Winborn v. Ascendium Education Solutions, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Wanda Winborn
Defendant: Pioneer Credit Recovery, Inc., Central Research Inc., The Sallie Mae Trust for Education, University of Phoenix, Inc. and Ascendium Education Solutions, Inc.
Debtor: Navient Corporation f/n/a SLM Corporation
Case Number: 1:2020cv00101
Filed: February 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey U Beaverstock
Referring Judge: Sonja F Bivins
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Student Loan
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 24, 2020 Filing 22 Document endorsed NOTED by District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock: Notice of Voluntary Dismissal #21 filed by Wanda Winborn. Defendants Central Research, Inc., University of Phoenix, Inc., Navient Corporation, Pioneer Credit Recovery, Inc., The Sallie Mae Trust for Education, and Ascendium Education Solutions, Inc. are dismissed from this action without prejudice. (jil)
March 24, 2020 REFERRAL OF #21 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal to Judge Beaverstock. (cmj)
March 23, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Wanda Winborn (Jackson, Sidney)
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ENDORSED ORDER granting #19 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Defendants University of Phoenix, Inc., Navient Corporation, Pioneer Credit Recovery, Inc., The Sallie Mae Trust for Education, and Ascendium Education Solutions, Inc. shall file replies in support of their respective motions to dismiss not later than 4/3/2020. Signed by District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock on 03/19/2020. (jil)
March 19, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #19 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #10 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint, #9 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint and Brief in Support to Judge Beaverstock (cmj)
March 19, 2020 Filing 19 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #10 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint, #9 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint and Brief in Support filed by Ascendium Education Solutions, Inc., Navient Corporation f/n/a SLM Corporation, Pioneer Credit Recovery, Inc., The Sallie Mae Trust for Education, University of Phoenix, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Ragan, Adam)
March 13, 2020 REFERRAL OF #18 Response, #17 Response to Judge Beaverstock. (cmj)
March 13, 2020 Filing 18 RESPONSE to #9 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint and Brief in Support filed by Wanda Winborn. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit) (Jackson, Sidney)
March 13, 2020 Filing 17 RESPONSE to #10 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by Wanda Winborn. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit) (Jackson, Sidney)
March 2, 2020 Filing 16 Document endorsed NOTED by District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock: Corporate Disclosure Statement #12 filed by University of Phoenix, Inc. A review does not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require recusal in this action. (jil)
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ENDORSED ORDER granting Doc. #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Adam C. Ragan. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 2/28/20. (ktw)
February 28, 2020 REFERRAL OF #14 Notice (Other), to Judge Bivins. (cmj)
February 28, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE by Ascendium Education Solutions, Inc., Navient Corporation f/n/a SLM Corporation, Pioneer Credit Recovery, Inc., The Sallie Mae Trust for Education re #8 MOTION and APPLICATION for Adam C. Ragan to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney affirms that a certificate of good standing that complies with #S.D. Ala. Ge (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Ragan, Adam)
February 28, 2020 Filing 13 Document endorsed NOTED by District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock: Corporate Disclosure Statement #3 filed by The Sallie Mae Trust for Education, Corporate Disclosure Statement #4 filed by Pioneer Credit Recovery, Inc., Corporate Disclosure Statement #2 filed by Navient Corporation f/n/a SLM Corporation, and Corporate Disclosure Statement #5 filed by Ascendium Education Solutions, Inc. A review does not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require recusal in this action. (jil)
February 28, 2020 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant University of Phoenix, Inc.. (Tidmore, Ethan)
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Order Setting Motion Deadline re: #10 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by University of Phoenix, Inc. and #9 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint and Brief in Support filed by Navient Corporation f/n/a SLM Corporation, Ascendium Education Solutions, Inc., Pioneer Credit Recovery, Inc., The Sallie Mae Trust for Education. Responses due by 3/13/2020; Replies due by 3/20/2020; Motion to be taken under submission on 3/21/2020. Signed by District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock on 2/28/20. (cmj)
February 28, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #10 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint, #9 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint and Brief in Support to Judge Beaverstock (cmj)
February 27, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by University of Phoenix, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (Ruzic, Emily)
February 27, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint and Brief in Support filed by Ascendium Education Solutions, Inc., Navient Corporation f/n/a SLM Corporation, Pioneer Credit Recovery, Inc., The Sallie Mae Trust for Education. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H) (Ortega, Juan)
February 27, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #8 MOTION and APPLICATION for Adam C. Ragan to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney affirms that a certificate of good standing that complies with #S.D. Ala. Ge Referred to Judge Sonja F. Bivins. (cmj)
February 27, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION and APPLICATION for Adam C. Ragan to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney affirms that a certificate of good standing that complies with #S.D. Ala. GenLR 83.3(d) is attached. ( Filing fee $ 75, Receipt number BALSDC-2577571, Online Credit Card Payment) filed by Ascendium Education Solutions, Inc., Navient Corporation f/n/a SLM Corporation, Pioneer Credit Recovery, Inc., The Sallie Mae Trust for Education. (Ragan, Adam)
February 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ENDORSED ORDER granting #6 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint and Discovery. Defendant Central Research, Inc. shall respond to Plaintiff's Complaint and Discovery not later than 3/24/2020. Signed by District Judge Jeffrey U. Beaverstock on 02/27/2020. (jil)
February 27, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery to Judge Beaverstock (cmj)
February 27, 2020 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery filed by Central Research Inc.. (Eason, Leslie)
February 26, 2020 Answer due from Ascendium Education Solutions, Inc., Navient Corporation f/n/a SLM Corporation, Pioneer Credit Recovery, Inc., The Sallie Mae Trust for Education pursuant to FRCP 12(a). (cmj)
February 20, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendants Ascendium Education Solutions, Inc., Ascendium Education Group, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Ascendium Education Group, Inc. for Ascendium Education Solutions, Inc... (Ortega, Juan)
February 20, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendants Pioneer Credit Recovery, Inc., Navient Corporation f/n/a SLM Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Navient Corporation f/n/a SLM Corporation for Pioneer Credit Recovery, Inc... (Ortega, Juan)
February 20, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendants The Sallie Mae Trust for Education, Navient Corporation f/n/a SLM Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Navient Corporation f/n/a SLM Corporation for The Sallie Mae Trust for Education.. (Ortega, Juan)
February 20, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Debtors Navient Corporation f/n/a SLM Corporation, Navient Solutions, LLC, Pioneer Credit Recovery, Inc., The Sallie Mae Trust for Education identifying Corporate Parent The Sallie Mae Trust for Education, Other Affiliate Navient Solutions, LLC, Other Affiliate Pioneer Credit Recovery, Inc. for Navient Corporation f/n/a SLM Corporation.. (Ortega, Juan)
February 20, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL ( Filing fee $ 400, Receipt number BALSDC-2574617, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by The Sallie Mae Trust for Education, Ascendium Education Solutions, Inc., Navient Corporation f/n/a SLM Corporation, Pioneer Credit Recovery, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Civil Cover Sheet) (Ortega, Juan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Winborn v. Ascendium Education Solutions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pioneer Credit Recovery, Inc.
Represented By: Juan Carlos Ortega
Represented By: Adam C. Ragan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central Research Inc.
Represented By: Leslie K. Eason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Sallie Mae Trust for Education
Represented By: Juan Carlos Ortega
Represented By: Adam C. Ragan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of Phoenix, Inc.
Represented By: Emily Myers Ruzic
Represented By: Ethan Tyler Tidmore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ascendium Education Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Juan Carlos Ortega
Represented By: Adam C. Ragan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: Navient Corporation f/n/a SLM Corporation
Represented By: Juan Carlos Ortega
Represented By: Adam C. Ragan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wanda Winborn
Represented By: Sidney W. Jackson, III
Represented By: Christian W. Harben
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?