Tannehill et al v. Wilkie et al
Plaintiff: James W. Tannehill and Robyn L. Tannehill
Defendant: Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC, M&T Bank Corporation, Robert L. Wilkie, Kent Frederic, Brewster and Associates, L.L.C., The Citizens Bank and Sandra Frederic
Case Number: 1:2020cv00105
Filed: February 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: William E Cassady
Referring Judge: Terry F Moorer
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2020 REFERRAL OF #34 Response to Motion to Dismiss, #35 Response to Motion to Dismiss to Judge Cassady. (tot)
April 16, 2020 Filing 35 RESPONSE to #21 MOTION to Dismiss filed by M&T Bank Corporation filed by Robert L. Wilkie. (Jones, Keith)
April 16, 2020 Filing 34 RESPONSE to #22 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Lakeview Loan Servicing filed by Robert L. Wilkie. (Jones, Keith)
April 15, 2020 REFERRAL OF #33 Response in Opposition to #28 Motion to Stay to Judge Cassady. (mab)
April 15, 2020 Filing 33 RESPONSE in Opposition re #28 MOTION to Stay filed by The Citizens Bank. (Richerson, Brantley)
April 15, 2020 REFERRAL OF #32 Response in Opposition to #28 Motion to Stay to Judge Cassady. (mab)
April 15, 2020 Filing 32 RESPONSE in Opposition re #28 MOTION to Stay filed by Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC, M&T Bank Corporation. (Mitchell, Matthew)
April 14, 2020 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron Mathew Wiley on behalf of Kent Frederic, Sandra Frederic (Wiley, Aaron)
April 14, 2020 REFERRAL OF #30 Response in Opposition to #28 Motion to Stay Proceedings to Judge Cassady. #2 (mab)
April 14, 2020 REFERRAL OF #29 Reply #20 Response to #12 Motion to Dismiss to Judge Cassady. (mab)
April 14, 2020 Filing 30 RESPONSE in Opposition re #28 MOTION to Stay Proceedings filed by Brewster and Associates, L.L.C.. (Lunsford, Michael)
April 14, 2020 Filing 29 REPLY to #20 Response to #12 Motion to Dismiss, filed by Kent Frederic, Sandra Frederic. (Nixon, Faith Ann)
April 10, 2020 Filing 28 Opposed MOTION to Stay Proceedings, filed by James W. Tannehill, Robyn L. Tannehill. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support); Referred to Judge William E. Cassady. (mab)
April 9, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #27 MOTION to Strike #23 Response in Opposition to #9 Motion to Dismiss; Referred to Judge William E. Cassady. (mab)
April 9, 2020 Filing 27 MOTION to Strike #23 Response in Opposition to #9 Motion to Dismiss filed by The Citizens Bank. (Richerson, Brantley)
April 8, 2020 REFERRAL OF #26 Limited Response to Frederics' #12 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Claims for Promisory Fraud and Conspiracy to Judge Cassady. (mab)
April 7, 2020 Filing 26 Limited RESPONSE to Frederics' #12 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Claims for Promisory Fraud and Conspiracy filed by Robert L. Wilkie. (Jones, Keith)
April 6, 2020 Filing 25 (Second) RESPONSE in Opposition to Brewster's #5 Motion to Dismiss filed by James W. Tannehill, Robyn L. Tannehill; referred to Judge Cassady (mab)
April 6, 2020 REFERRAL OF #24 Reply to #19 Response to #5 Motion to Dismiss to Judge Cassady. (mab)
April 6, 2020 Filing 24 REPLY to #19 Response in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss filed by Brewster and Associates, L.L.C.. (Lunsford, Michael)
April 3, 2020 Filing 23 RESPONSE in Opposition to #9 Citizen Bank's Motion to Dismiss filed by James W. Tannehill, Robyn L. Tannehill; referred to Judge Cassady (mab)
April 2, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #22 Motions to Dismiss (Docs. #21 & #22 ) Referred to Judge William E. Cassady. (mab)
April 2, 2020 REFERRAL OF #19 Response in Opposition to #5 Motion to Dismiss; and #20 Response in Opposition to #12 Motion to Dismiss to Judge Cassady. (mab)
April 2, 2020 Filing 22 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Corporate Assignment) (Mitchell, Matthew)
April 2, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION to Dismiss filed by M&T Bank Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Corporate Assignment) (Mitchell, Matthew)
April 1, 2020 Filing 20 RESPONSE in Opposition to Defendants Frederic #12 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Claims for Promisory Fraud and Conspiracy, filed by James W. Tannehill, Robyn L. Tannehill. (Attachment: #1 envelope); referred to Judge Cassady (mab)
April 1, 2020 Filing 19 RESPONSE in Opposition to Defendant Brewster's #5 MOTION to Dismiss filed by James W. Tannehill, Robyn L. Tannehil; referred to Judge Cassady (mab)
April 1, 2020 REFERRAL OF #18 Reply to Response to Motion to Dismiss to Judge Cassady. (tot)
April 1, 2020 Filing 18 REPLY to Response to Motion #5 to Dismiss filed by Brewster and Associates, L.L.C.. (Lunsford, Michael)
April 1, 2020 REFERRAL OF #17 Limited Response to Motion to Dismiss to Judge Cassady. (tot)
March 31, 2020 Filing 17 RESPONSE to #9 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Robert L. Wilkie. (Jones, Keith)
March 31, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Keith A. Jones on behalf of Robert L. Wilkie (Jones, Keith)
March 31, 2020 REFERRAL OF #15 Response to #5 MOTION to Dismiss to Judge Cassady. (mab)
March 30, 2020 Filing 15 RESPONSE to #5 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Robert L. Wilkie. (Jones, Keith)
March 26, 2020 Filing 14 Summons Issued as to Robert L. Wilkie c/o of U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General, and mailed to Plaintiffs for service. (mab) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/26/2020: #1 Cover Letter) (mab).
March 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ENDORSED ORDER noted #12 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiffs shall respond to this motion not later than April 7, 2020. Any reply from the moving parties shall be filed on or before April 14, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 3/24/20. (Cassady, William)
March 24, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #12 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Claims for Promisory Fraud and Conspiracy Referred to Judge William E. Cassady. (mab)
March 24, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Claims for Promisory Fraud and Conspiracy, filed by Kent Frederic, Sandra Frederic. (Nixon, Faith Ann) Modified on 3/24/2020 (mab).
March 24, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Kent Frederic, Sandra Frederic. (Nixon, Faith Ann)
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ENDORSED ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; Answer due from M&T Bank Corporation on 4/2/2020; granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; Answer due from Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC on 4/2/2020.; noted #9 Motion to Dismiss. Any response by Plaintiffs to the motion to dismiss (Doc. 9) filed by The Citizens Bank, shall be filed not later than April 2, 2020. If a reply to a response is deemed necessary, it shall be filed no later than April 9, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 3/19/20. (Cassady, William)
March 18, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #9 MOTION to Dismiss Referred to Judge William E. Cassady. (mab)
March 18, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss filed by The Citizens Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit HUD/VA Addendum to Loan Application) (Richerson, Brantley)
March 18, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: Defendants' Motions for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading (Docs. #7 & #8 ); Referred to Judge William E. Cassady. (mab)
March 18, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading re #1 Complaint; Referred to Judge Terry F. Moorer. (mab)
March 18, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, filed by Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC. (Mitchell, Matthew)
March 18, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, filed by M&T Bank Corporation. (Mitchell, Matthew)
March 16, 2020 Filing 6 Document endorsed NOTED by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady: Motion to Dismiss #5 filed by Brewster and Associates, L.L.C. Plaintiffs shall respond to this motion not later than March 30, 2020. Any reply to the response shall be filed no later than April 6, 2020. (Cassady, William)
March 16, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #5 MOTION to Dismiss referred to Judge William E. Cassady. (tot)
March 13, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Brewster and Associates, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Lunsford, Michael)
March 10, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Brantley Trest Richerson on behalf of The Citizens Bank (Richerson, Brantley)
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order, REFERRING action to the Magistrate Judge for consideration and disposition or recommendation on all pretrial matters as may be appropriate. Signed by District Judge Terry F. Moorer on 2/26/2020. (mab)
February 21, 2020 Filing 2 Summonses Issued to Plaintiffs at Intake as to Brewster and Associates, L.L.C., Kent Frederic, Sandra Frederic, Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC, M&T Bank Corporation, The Citizens Bank, Robert L. Wilkie. (mab)
February 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Brewster and Associates, L.L.C., Kent Frederic, Sandra Frederic, Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC, M&T Bank Corporation, The Citizens Bank, Robert L. Wilkie, filed by James W. Tannehill, Robyn L. Tannehill. (Attachment: #1 Receipt for Fee) (mab)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tannehill et al v. Wilkie et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James W. Tannehill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robyn L. Tannehill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M&T Bank Corporation
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert L. Wilkie
Represented By: Keith A. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kent Frederic
Represented By: Faith Ann Pate Nixon
Represented By: Aaron Mathew Wiley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brewster and Associates, L.L.C.
Represented By: Michael R. Lunsford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Citizens Bank
Represented By: Brantley Trest Richerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandra Frederic
Represented By: Faith Ann Pate Nixon
Represented By: Aaron Mathew Wiley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?