Containers, Inc. v. The Can Man, LLC. et al
Plaintiff: Containers, Inc.
Defendant: Hunter Rodriguez and The Can Man, LLC.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00150
Filed: March 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: William E Cassady
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 8, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas M. O'Hara on behalf of All Defendants (O'Hara, Thomas)
May 8, 2020 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Hunter Rodriguez, The Can Man, LLC.. (Watkins, Jason)
April 16, 2020 Remark: Copy of Order (Doc. #13 ) mailed to The Can Man at the address mentioned in the Court's Order. (eec)
April 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Order re: #7 Answer to Complaint filed by The Can Man, LLC., The Court holds the Motion for Entry of Default (Doc. #6 ) in abeyance until May 18, 2020. Defendants are instructed to seek counsel to represent the company in this matter. Defendant Rodriguez is also encouraged to seek counsel for himself as well but is not required to have counsel represent his personal interests in this case.( Miscellaneous deadline set for 5/18/2020.) Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 4/16/2020. (eec)
April 16, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady: Motion Hearing (by telephone) held on 4/16/2020 re #6 MOTION for Entry of Default filed by Containers, Inc. (Digital Court Recording; Courtroom ) (eec)
April 14, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexa Stabler-Adams on behalf of Containers, Inc. (Stabler-Adams, Alexa)
April 13, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear filed by Containers, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Adams, James)
April 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order re: 8 Order on Motion for Entry of Default,, ( Telephone Conference set for 4/16/2020 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady.) To access the conference, the parties shall use the following numbers: CALL IN 877-873-8018 ACCESS CODE 3291819. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 4/8/2020. Copy of Endorsed Order and Notice mailed to The Can Man, LLC (eec)
April 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ENDORSED ORDER taking under advisement #6 Motion for Entry of Default. The record reflects that a response to the Complaint was filed by Hunter Rodriguez on behalf of The Can Man, LLC on April 6, 2020 (Doc. 7). Accordingly, the Clerk is directed to withhold entry of default until further order of the Court. A telephone conference shall be set up to discuss the import of the April 6, 2020 filing. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 4/8/20. (Cassady, William)
April 8, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Entry of Default filed by Containers, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit In support of Motion for Entry of Default, #2 Text of Proposed Order ENTRY OF DEFAULT) (Adams, James)
April 6, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by The Can Man, LLC.. (eec)
March 26, 2020 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Ex. A-C for The Can Man, LLC and Hunter Rodriguez served on Hunter Rodriguez on 03/16/2020, filed by Containers, Inc.. (Adams, James)
March 11, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Hunter Rodriguez, The Can Man, LLC.. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (eec)
March 11, 2020 Filing 3 Notice of Assignment to Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady for trial. (eec)
March 10, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by Containers, Inc. (Adams, James)
March 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Hunter Rodriguez, The Can Man, LLC. ( Filing fee $400 receipt number AALSDC-2584792, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Containers, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Adams, James) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/11/2020: #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (eec).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Containers, Inc. v. The Can Man, LLC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Containers, Inc.
Represented By: James Hunter Adams
Represented By: Alexa Stabler-Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hunter Rodriguez
Represented By: Jason R. Watkins
Represented By: Thomas M. O'Hara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Can Man, LLC.
Represented By: Jason R. Watkins
Represented By: Thomas M. O'Hara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?