Oppenheimer v. Robison et al
Plaintiff: David Oppenheimer
Defendant: Blue Runner Realty, LLC, Ivacationonline.com, LLC, Craig Daniel Robison, Joseph Francis Godar and Katherine Anne Robison
Case Number: 1:2020cv00152
Filed: March 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Terry F Moorer
Referring Judge: Katherine P Nelson
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 30, 2020 REFERRAL OF #7 Notice of Status of Service of Summons and Complaint to Judge Moorer. (mab)
April 30, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Status of Service of Summons and Complaint, filed by David Oppenheimer (Starnes, James)
April 15, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Blue Runner Realty, LLC, Joseph Francis Godar, Ivacationonline.com, LLC, Craig Daniel Robison, Katherine Anne Robison. (NOTE TO COUNSEL: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service.) (tot)
April 15, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons by David Oppenheimer (Starnes, James)
April 8, 2020 Filing 4 AO 121 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright mailed to Register of Copyrights on 4/8/2020. (tot)
March 12, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits by David Oppenheimer (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit G, #2 Exhibit Exhibit H, #3 Exhibit Exhibit I) (Starnes, James)
March 12, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits by David Oppenheimer re: #1 Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit B, #2 Exhibit Exhibit C, #3 Exhibit Exhibit D, #4 Exhibit Exhibit E) (Starnes, James)
March 12, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number AALSDC-2586217, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by David Oppenheimer. (Starnes, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oppenheimer v. Robison et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Runner Realty, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ivacationonline.com, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig Daniel Robison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Francis Godar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katherine Anne Robison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Oppenheimer
Represented By: James H. Starnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?