SE Property Holdings LLC v. Gaddy et al
Defendant: Gaddy Electric & Plumbing, LLC, Elizabeth Gaddy Rice, SLG Properties LLC, Rembert LLC and Sharon Gaddy
Trustee: Terrie Owens
Appellee: Jerry Dewayne Gaddy
Appellant: SE Property Holdings LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv00201
Filed: April 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Kristi K DuBose
Referring Judge: Katherine P Nelson
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:1334
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 1, 2020 REFERRAL OF #8 Bankruptcy Record on Appeal to Judge DuBose. (nah)
May 29, 2020 Filing 8 Bankruptcy Record on Appeal transmitted by Bankruptcy Court re: #1 Bankruptcy Notice of Appeal. Bankruptcy No. 17-01568 (Todd, Daniel)
May 29, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 1/27/2020 before Judge HENRY A. CALLAWAY. NOTICE: The parties have twenty-one (21) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.. (Todd, Daniel)
May 29, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 6/25/2019 before Judge HENRY A. CALLAWAY. NOTICE: The parties have twenty-one (21) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.. (Todd, Daniel)
May 29, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 6/11/2019 before Judge HENRY A. CALLAWAY. NOTICE: The parties have twenty-one (21) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.. (Todd, Daniel)
May 14, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits as part of the Record on Appeal from Bankruptcy Court - Movant's Exhibits (Part 1 and 2) and Creditor's Exhibits to the January 27, 2020 Hearing on Motion Approve Compromise. 3 binders. (jlr)
May 5, 2020 REFERRAL OF #3 Bankruptcy Record on Appeal to Judge DuBose. (nah)
May 4, 2020 Filing 3 Bankruptcy Record on Appeal transmitted by Bankruptcy Court re: #1 Bankruptcy Notice of Appeal. Bankruptcy No. 17-01568-HAC-7 (Todd, Daniel)
April 8, 2020 Filing 2 Bankruptcy Scheduling Order (nah)
April 3, 2020 REFERRAL OF #1 Bankruptcy Notice of Appeal to Judge DuBose. (nah)
April 2, 2020 Filing 1 Notice of Appeal from Bankruptcy Court filed by SE Property Holdings transmitted to District Court. (Todd, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SE Property Holdings LLC v. Gaddy et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Terrie Owens
Represented By: C. Michael Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gaddy Electric & Plumbing, LLC
Represented By: Clark R. Hammond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Gaddy Rice
Represented By: Clark R. Hammond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SLG Properties LLC
Represented By: Clark R. Hammond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rembert LLC
Represented By: Clark R. Hammond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharon Gaddy
Represented By: Clark R. Hammond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Jerry Dewayne Gaddy
Represented By: Lee Benton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: SE Property Holdings LLC
Represented By: Richard M. Gaal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?