Rangeline Lender LLC v. High Nob-Rangeline, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Rangeline Lender LLC
Defendant: Jack R. McCoy Revocable Trust U/A/D February 16, 2005, Winifred B. McCoy Revocable Trust U/A/D April 22, 2008, David B. Bosworth, High Nob-Rangeline, LLC and Jack Robert McCoy
Case Number: 1:2020cv00207
Filed: April 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Callie V S Granade
Referring Judge: P Bradley Murray
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT-ONLY ORDER: #4 Notice of Plaintiff Rangeline Lender LLC's Efforts to Effect Service Upon Defendants is NOTED. Signed by Senior Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 5/27/2020. (mab)
May 18, 2020 REFERRAL OF #4 Notice of Plaintiff Rangeline Lender, LLC's Efforts to Effect Service Upon Defendants to Judge Granade. (tot)
May 18, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE by Rangeline Lender LLC Efforts to Effect Service Upon Defendants (Hoffmann, Jonathan)
April 8, 2020 Filing 3 Service Notice entered 4/8/2020. Plaintiff to notify the Court the action taken to effect service and the results thereof. Service order deadline set to 5/18/2020. (tot)
April 7, 2020 Filing 2 Summonses Issued as to David B. Bosworth, High Nob-Rangeline, LLC, Jack R. McCoy Revocable Trust U/A/D February 16, 2005, Jack Robert McCoy, Winifred B. McCoy Revocable Trust U/A/D April 22, 2008. (Note to Counsel: The Summonses have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service.) (mab)
April 3, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against High Nob-Rangeline, LLC, Jack R. McCoy, David B. Bosworth, Winifred B. McCoy, and Jack Robert McCoy ( Filing fee $400 receipt number AALSDC-2597188, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Rangeline Lender LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits) (Quistorff, Gabriel) Modified on 4/6/2020 (mab).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rangeline Lender LLC v. High Nob-Rangeline, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack R. McCoy Revocable Trust U/A/D February 16, 2005
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Winifred B. McCoy Revocable Trust U/A/D April 22, 2008
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David B. Bosworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: High Nob-Rangeline, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack Robert McCoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rangeline Lender LLC
Represented By: Gabriel J. Quistorff
Represented By: Jonathan P Hoffmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?