Johnson Sr v. BP Exploration & Production, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Gary Allen Johnson, Sr.
Defendant: BP Exploration & Production Inc and BP America Production Company
Case Number: 1:2020cv00233
Filed: April 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey U Beaverstock
Referring Judge: William E Cassady
2 Judge: P Bradley Murray
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2020 Notice of Appearance Pro Hac Vice by Anthony Aloneftis. Pursuant to the Case Management Order entered in 19-cv-5000-KD-MU-C only the pro hac vice fee is being paid. I certify that documentation has been previously filed in 1:20-cv-00161. ( Filing fee $ 75, Receipt number AALSDC-2627422, Online Credit Card Payment.) (Aloneftis, Anthony)
April 27, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Harlan I. Prater, IV on behalf of All Defendants (Prater, Harlan)
April 27, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Amber Nicole Hall on behalf of All Defendants (Hall, Amber)
April 27, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Wesley B. Gilchrist on behalf of All Defendants (Gilchrist, Wesley)
April 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Omnibus Order Modifying BELO Case Management Order re: (1 in 1:19-cv-05000-KD-MU-C). Signed by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 09/04/2019. (srd)
April 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 BELO Case Management Order. Signed by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 05/29/2019. Signed by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 05/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Protective Order, #2 HIPAA Order, #3 Aurthorization) (srd)
April 21, 2020 Filing 7 Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:19-cv-14708. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
April 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDERED that the instant matter is hereby TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Alabama. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 4/21/2020. (NEF: Sect J)(caa) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/21/2020.]
April 20, 2020 Filing 5 Statement by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc. Regarding Venue (Reid, Devin) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/21/2020.]
January 21, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc..Attorney Devin C. Reid added to party BP America Production Company(pty:dft), Attorney Devin C. Reid added to party BP Exploration & Production, Inc.(pty:dft).(Reid, Devin) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/21/2020.]
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL PROCEEDINGS CASE MANAGEMENT ORDERS NO.1 AND AMENDED ORDER NO.2. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 1/30/2015. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 BELO Settlement Agreement)(cg) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/21/2020.]
December 20, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Carl Barbier and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (ess) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/21/2020.]
December 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8039144) filed by Gary Allen Johnson Sr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Election Not to Mediate, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Nathan Lee Nelson added to party Gary Allen Johnson Sr(pty:pla).(Nelson, Nathan) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/21/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson Sr v. BP Exploration & Production, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Allen Johnson, Sr.
Represented By: Nathan Lee Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP Exploration & Production Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP America Production Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?