Sawyer v. Cooper Tire & Rubber Company et al
Plaintiff: Sheri Sawyer
Defendant: Cooper Tire & Rubber Company and Joseph Daniel Coggin
Case Number: 1:2020cv00234
Filed: April 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Kristi K DuBose
Referring Judge: P Bradley Murray
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion to Stay the Rule 26(f) meeting and report. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 06/05/2020. (nah)
June 5, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #13 Joint MOTION to Stay Rule 26(F) Meeting and Report Referred to Judge P. Bradley Murray. (nah)
June 5, 2020 Filing 13 Joint MOTION to Stay Rule 26(F) Meeting and Report filed by Cooper Tire & Rubber Company. (Mattei, Blair)
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Order Setting Motion Deadline re: #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Cooper Tire & Rubber Company and #11 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Sheri Sawyer. Responses due by 6/22/2020; Replies due by 7/2/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 05/26/2020. (nah)
May 22, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #11 MOTION to Remand to State Court Referred to Judge P. Bradley Murray. (nah)
May 21, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Sheri Sawyer. (Erdberg, Jaime)
May 19, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction & #9 Evidentiary Material - Referred to Judge P. Bradley Murray. (tgw)
May 18, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Cooper Tire & Rubber Company. (gifford, Kriston)
May 18, 2020 Filing 9 Evidentiary Material to #10 Motion to Dismiss filed by Cooper Tire & Rubber Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of N.Schwieterman) (gifford, Kriston) Modified on 5/19/2020 (tgw).
April 27, 2020 Filing 8 Document endorsed NOTED by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose: Corporate Disclosure Statement #6 filed by Cooper Tire & Rubber Company. Review of the corporate disclosure statement pursuant to S.D. Ala. Civ. L.R. 7.1 has been completed. The review did not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest, which would require disqualification or recusal in this action. (khc)
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER on #6 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Cooper Tire & Rubber Company. A review does not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require recusal in this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 04/24/2020. (nah)
April 24, 2020 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Cooper Tire & Rubber Company. (Johnson, Andrew)
April 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER entered. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 6/8/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 04/23/2020. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Copy of Order mailed to Defendant Coggin and Attorneys Mark Erdberg and Wesley Ball) (nah)
April 23, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Blair G. Mattei on behalf of Cooper Tire & Rubber Company (Mattei, Blair)
April 23, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael E. Upchurch on behalf of Cooper Tire & Rubber Company (Upchurch, Michael)
April 22, 2020 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint by Cooper Tire & Rubber Company. (Johnson, Andrew)
April 22, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL ( Filing fee $ 400, Receipt number AALSDC-2605313, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Cooper Tire & Rubber Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit State Court File, #3 Exhibit Notice of Filing Notice of Removal) (Johnson, Andrew) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/22/2020: #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (meh).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sawyer v. Cooper Tire & Rubber Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cooper Tire & Rubber Company
Represented By: Andrew Burns Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Daniel Coggin
Represented By: Andrew Burns Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheri Sawyer
Represented By: Mark Erdberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?