Heads v. Paradigm Investment Group, LLC
Plaintiff: Veronica Heads
Defendant: Paradigm Investment Group, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv00284
Filed: May 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Bert W Milling
Referring Judge: Terry F Moorer
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2020 REFERRAL OF #9 Response to #4 Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, Stay Pending Arbitration and to Compel Arbitration to Judge Moorer. (mab)
July 15, 2020 Filing 9 RESPONSE to #4 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, Stay Pending Arbitration and to Compel Arbitration, filed by Veronica Heads. (Michel, Anthony)
June 25, 2020 Filing 7 Document endorsed NOTED by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr: Corporate Disclosure Statement #6 filed by Paradigm Investment Group, LLC (clr)
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order re: Dft Paradigm Investment Group, LLC's #4 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, Stay Pending Arbitration and to Compel Arbitration. Plf is to file response by 7/15/2020. Dft shall have until 7/23/2020 to file any reply that it wishes to file. Signed by District Judge Terry F. Moorer on 6/23/2020. (tot)
June 23, 2020 REFERRAL OF #4 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, Stay Pending Arbitration and to Compel Arbitration, #5 Brief in Support of Motion to Judge Moorer. (tot)
June 23, 2020 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant Paradigm Investment Group, LLC. (Thompson, Joshua)
June 23, 2020 Filing 5 Brief filed by Paradigm Investment Group, LLC re #4 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, Stay Pending Arbitration and to Compel Arbitration Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, Stay Pending Arbitration and to Compel Arbitration. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Thompson, Joshua)
June 23, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, MOTION to Stay Pending Arbitration and MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Paradigm Investment Group, LLC. (Thompson, Joshua). (Added MOTION to Stay, MOTION to Compel Arbitration on 6/23/2020) (tot).
June 3, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Veronica Heads. Paradigm Investment Group, LLC served on 6/2/2020, answer due 6/23/2020 (Michel, Anthony)
May 26, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Paradigm Investment Group, LLC. (NOTE TO COUNSEL: The Summons has been issued. Please print copies necessary for service.) (tot)
May 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Paradigm Investment Group, LLC ( Filing fee $400 receipt number AALSDC-2619485, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Veronica Heads. 90 day Rule 4m deadline set for 8/20/2020. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Summons) (Michel, Anthony)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Heads v. Paradigm Investment Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Veronica Heads
Represented By: Anthony David Michel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paradigm Investment Group, LLC
Represented By: Joshua Stephen Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?