Smith v. Saul
Plaintiff: Derek T. Smith
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Case Number: 1:2020cv00288
Filed: May 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey U Beaverstock
Referring Judge: P Bradley Murray
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 16, 2020 Answer due from Andrew M. Saul on 9/1/2020 pursuant to FRCP 12(a). (cmj)
June 15, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to defendants. USA served 6/1/2020, answer due 9/1/2020 (Attachments: #1 summons issued Chief Counsel, #2 summons issued US Atty) (Holland, Laura) Modified on 6/16/2020 (cmj).
June 3, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Oliver McDonald on behalf of Andrew M. Saul (McDonald, Oliver)
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER entered; Answer due within 90 days after service; Plaintiff's Brief due 30 days thereafter.. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 5/27/20. (cmj)
May 27, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Andrew M. Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (cmj)
May 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew M. Saul ( Filing fee $400 receipt number AALSDC-2620747, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by Derek T. Smith. 90 day Rule 4m deadline set for 8/25/2020. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons) (Holland, Laura)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derek T. Smith
Represented By: Laura Holland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Represented By: Oliver McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?